Duhn Oil Tool Inc v. Cooper Cameron Corporation
Case Number: 1:2005cv01411
Filed: November 9, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion for Vacatur and DISMISSING Case With Prejudice, signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/14/2014. (Marrujo, C)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 823 TENTATIVE ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Vacatur signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/3/2013. (Jessen, A)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/20/13. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ORDER continuing hearing date and scheduling order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/26/2013 re 814 Order Setting Appeal Bond. (Lundstrom, T)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER TAXING COSTS in the amount of $162,932.34, to be awarded to defendant Cooper Cameron Corporation; order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/19/2012. (Rooney, M)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER: (1) Concluding Defendant Cooper Cameron To Be The Prevailing Party For Cost Recovery; (2) Awarding Costs To Defendant Cooper Cameron; And (3) Concluding The Case Is Not Exceptional For The Purposes Of Attorney's Fees, signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/17/2012. (Fahrney, E)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 788 FINAL JUDGMENT dated 8/17/2012 signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/17/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER DISMISSING, without prejudice, defendant's counterclaims seeking a declaratory judgment as to the unenforceability of the United States Patent Nos. 7,322,407 and 7,416,020; order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/10/2012. (Rooney, M)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 780 SCHEDULING ORDER inviting comments from the parties regarding the allocation of costs and whether costs should be awarded to defendant Cameron as the prevailing party; case management deadline set for 8/10/2012 for receipt of same. In the event the Court concludes that defendant is the prevailing party, the Court requests defendant to file their proposed bill of costs by 8/31/2012 with objections to same due by 9/7/2012. The Court further sets a TELEPHONIC STATUS HEARING re the proposed judgme nt and whether defendant is the prevailing party to be heard on 8/17/2012 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Marilyn L. Huff. The parties are also DIRECTED to file the stipulation regarding the counterclaims by 8/10/2012; order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/31/2012. (Rooney, M)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 779 PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/27/2012. The parties are directed to file any opposition to same within 14 days of today's date.(Rooney, M)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 777 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/27/2012 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Marilyn L. Huff, signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/23/2012. (The parties should contact the Court on or before Thursday, July 26, 2012, at 5:00 p.m. to provide a phone number at which the parties can be reached.)(Kusamura, W)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER GRANTING defendant's Motion for Reconsideration on the Issue of Obviousness of Claim 3, document 764 ; DENYING plaintiff's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Nonobviousness of Claim 3; REINSTATING the jury's verdict of obviousness of Claim 3; and VACATING the damage award; order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/7/2012. (Rooney, M) Modified on 5/8/2012 (Rooney, M).
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 771 SCHEDULING ORDER GRANTING plaintiff leave to file a supplemental brief, if desired, to defendant's response to plaintiff's supplemental brief on damages; case management deadline set for 4/23/2012 for receipt of same; order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/17/2012. (Rooney, M)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 769 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING a hearing on the issues raised in the parties' recent post-trial filings; hearing set for 4/25/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13 of the United States District Court, Southern District of California, before District Judge Marilyn L. Huff; order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/28/2012. (Rooney, M)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 765 SCHEDULING ORDER DIRECTING the parties to submit further briefing addressing the issue of reasonable royalty damages; case management deadline set for 3/23/2012 for receipt of same; order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/13/2012. (Rooney, M)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 762 MEMORANDUM DECISION signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/23/12. (Verduzco, M)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER regarding trial demonstrative documents signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/2/2012. (Rooney, M)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 736 SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/24/2012. The Court VACATES the pre-trial conference currently set for 1/30/2012 and SETS a pre-trial conference on 1/31/2012 at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 13 of the United States District Court, Southern District of California. (Arellano, S.)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER DENYING Motion for Summary Judgment, document 714 , and Motion for Reconsideration, document 715 . The Court directs the parties to meet and confer to set a schedule for expert depositions. If the parties are unable to agree on a schedule, the Court will hold a telephonic status conference on 1/10/2012 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Marilyn L. Huff; order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/21/2011. (Rooney, M)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER GRANTING the parties' joint motion to move the trial venue to San Diego, California, document 721 . The Court Trial is set to commence on 2/15/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13 of the United States District Court, Southern District of California, before the Honorable Marilyn L. Huff; order signed by District Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/21/2011. (Rooney, M)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER re 706 Motion for Entry of Judgment, Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Requiring Retrial on Certain Issues. (Coffman, Lisa)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 674 STIPULATION and ORDER to reschedule the Motion Hearing currently set for 2/14/2011 and ADVANCE to 2/11/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/7/2011. (Kusamura, W)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER RE DEFENDANT CAMERON'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Docket Nos. 528, 531), Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/25/2011. (Arellano, S.)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER GRANTING Request to Seal Exhibits A-G in Support of Cameron's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 (Doc. 584 ), Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/25/2011. (Arellano, S.)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Defendant Cameron's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Lost-Profits Damages (Docs. 319 , 430 ), Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/21/2011. (Arellano, S.)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER re Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool's Motions in Limine, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/18/2011. (Kusamura, W)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Request to Seal Documents in Support of Its Responses to Motions In Limine by Defendant Cameron and Cameron's Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/14/2011. (Marrujo, C)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER RE: Defendant Cameron's Motion in Limine 528 531 signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/12/2011. (Kusamura, W)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER GRANTING request to seal Defendant Cameron's Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/29/2010. (Figueroa, O)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request to Seal Motions In Limine No. 3 and No. 10 and Supporting Documents to Motions In Limine Nos. 1-10, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/17/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MEMORANDUM DECISION GRANTING in Part and Denying in Part Cameron's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Infringement (Docs 445 & 446 ), signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/2/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER GRANTING Request To Seal Documents in Support of Defendant Cameron's Motion For Partial Summary Judgement of No Infringement, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/15/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Court's In-Camera Review of Contested Documents-Exhibits to Vyas Deposition, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/10/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS in Support of Duhn's Opposition to Cameron's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Infringement, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/5/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request to Seal Declaration of James M. Whitelaw re Cameron's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Lost Profits Damages, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/6/2010. (Verduzco, M)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER On Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Motion For Sanctions For Violation Of Scheduling Order, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/5/2010. (Scrivner, E)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 472 AMENDMENTS to FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER 468 and SCHEDULING ORDER following Pretrial Conference 467 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/5/2010. (Kusamura, W)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 467 SCHEDULING ORDER Following Pretrial Conference, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/28/2010. (Motions in Limine to be filed by 12/14/2010, Oppositions due by 12/30/2010, Trial Confirmation/Motions In Limine Hearing continued to 1/7/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, and Jury Trial continued to 1/11/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request to Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Cameron's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of No Lost-Profit Damages and Documents in Support of Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Reply to Motion For Sanctions For Violaiton of Scheduling Order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/15/2010. (Esteves, C)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 456 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Denying Cooper Cameron's 448 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Vacating Oral Argument Set For November 15, 2010 signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/15/2010. (Esteves, C)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Seal Documents in Support of Declaration of James M. Whitelaw in Support of Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Motions for Sanctions for Violation of Scheduling Order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/20/2010. (Figueroa, O)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER GRANTING 430 Defendant Cameron's Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Briefing In Support Of Its 319 Motion Partial Summary Judgment of No Lost Profits Damages, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/30/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER Granting Defendant Cameron's 414 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Duhn Oil's Second Amended Complaint Claims of Contributory and Inducement Infringement signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 06/18/2010. Amended Complaint due by 7/9/2010. (Flores, E)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MEMORANDUM DECISION GRANTING 414 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Claims of Contributory and Inducement Infringement With Leave to Amend, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/9/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER Re: 417 Stipulation to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Claims of Contributory and Inducement Infringement signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/4/2010. (Esteves, C)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER Regarding Defendant Cooper Cameron Corporation's 368 Motion to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc. signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/1/2010. (Esteves, C)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Agreed Discovery ORDER Regarding 386 Motion by Defendant Cameron to Compel Discovery From Plaintiff Duhn Oil signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/17/2010. (Esteves, C)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Memorandum Decision And Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint 377 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/16/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER re: Stipulation to Lodge Exhibits Designated as Attorney's Eyes Only to January 11, 2010 Deposition of Manish Vyas Under Seal Pursunat to the January 13, 2010 Status Conference, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/20/2010. (Kusamura, W)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Cameron's Request for Reconsideration by the District Court of Magistrate Judge's ruling, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/30/2009. (Kusamura, W)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE; ORDER Re Ex Parte Application 381 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/24/2009. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/13/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Esteves, C)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER Re: Stipulation To File Documents Under Seal In Support Of Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Its Second Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/18/2009. (Gaumnitz, R)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER Re: Stipulation to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Opposition to Cooper Cameron Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Lost Profit Damages signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/29/2009. (Figueroa, O)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s 308 Motion to Compel Defendant Cooper Cameron Corporation's Production of Witnesses For Depositions, and Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/15/2009. (Esteves, C)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER Re: Stipulation to File Documents Under Seal In Support of Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Opposition to Cooper Cameron Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Lost-Profits Damages signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/13/2009. (Figueroa, O)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 345 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the continuance of the Motion for Clarification/Reconsideration, document 310 , and CONTINUING it to 12/7/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/2/2009. (Rooney, M)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER Granting Stipulation To File Documents Under Seal In Support Of Defendant Cameron's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Of No Lost Profits Damages 320 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/5/2009. (Scrivner, E)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER RE: Plaitiff's 240 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and Defendant's Busniess Practices regarding the installation and use of its FRAC Assembly, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/1/2009. (Kusamura, W)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER re: Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s ex parte application to extend time for filing Duhn's reply brief in support of its motion for leave to amend its complaint. Duhn's reply brief due 2/17/2009. Order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/12/2009. (Timken, A)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Re: Stipulation To File Documents Under Seal In Support Of Plaintiff Duhn Oil Tool, Inc.'s Motion For Leave To Amend Its Complaint And Request For Jury Trial Regarding Its Proposed Amendment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/14/2009. (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duhn Oil Tool Inc v. Cooper Cameron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?