Vieira v. Ylst
Case Number: 1:2005cv01492
Filed: November 22, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM and ORDER (1) DENYING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and (2) Issuing Certificate of Appealability for Claims 2 and 6; ORDER DENYING 107 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and Expansion of the Record; and ORDER Directing Clerk to Substitute Ron Davis as Respondent and Enter Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/5/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DENYING Motion for Hearing 139 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/12/14: Petitioner's counsel are directed to provide him with a copy of this order. (Hellings, J)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER confirming appointment of counsel signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/27/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re Petitioner's Pro Se Submissions for a Hearing on Conflict of Interest Issues signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/25/2012. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the three pro se submissions to Vieira. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying without prejudice Respondent's request to seal documents signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/9/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER of USCA re Richard Vieira. The Petition for the Extraordinary Writ of Mandamus is DENIED. (Sant Agata, S)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER APPOINTING Independent Counsel signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/21/2012. John T. Philipsborn added. (Sant Agata, S)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Request to Modify Briefing Schedule for Phase III of the Litigation signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/19/2011. Petitioner's reply to the Warden's opposition to the petition due by 1/9/2012. Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing due by 1/23/2012. (Jessen, A)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Request to Modify Briefing Schedule for Phase III of the Litigation, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/26/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Revised Briefing Schedule, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/8/2011. (Kusamura, W)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Third Request by Respondent's to modify briefing schedule for Phase III of the litigation signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/1/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CORRECTED ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/10/2011 re 89 Order GRANTING 88 Request to Modify Briefing Schedule for Phase III of the Litigation. (Lundstrom, T)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING 88 Request to Modify Briefing Schedule for Phase III of the Litigation, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 05/06/2011. (Martin, S)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING Respondent's Request to Modify Briefing Schedule for Phase III of the Litigation, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 03/03/2011. (Martin, S)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule for Phase III of the Litigation, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 07/21/2010. (Martin, S)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PHASE III CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/17/2010. February 18, 2010 CMC: VACATED. (Sant Agata, S)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Re: Respondent's Incomplete Answer; Directive To Parties; Commencement Of Phase III Of The Litigation, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/13/2010. (Case Management Deadline: 1/25/2010, Filing Deadline: 1/21/2010, Response due by 2/4/2010) (Scrivner, E)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Re: Petitioner's Pro Se Submissions, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/4/2009. Petitioner's pro se submission received on August 3, 2009 has been returned. Should any matters arise in the course of this case which require the Court's immediate attention, counsel for the parties may submit appropriate motions. (Scrivner, E)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Following Supplemental Phase II Case Management Conference signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/10/2009. (Figueroa, O)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/22/2009 denying 51 Motion to bypass exhaustion and pursue Federal Claims by Richard J. Vieira. (Copy sent to Mr. Vieria). (Lundstrom, T)
November 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and request for appointment of counsel filed by Richard John Vieira and DENYING without prejudice 1 petitioner's requst for a temporary stay of execution. Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/30/05. (Robles, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vieira v. Ylst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?