Jacobs v. Sullivan et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv01625
Filed: December 22, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 STIPULATION and ORDER for Voluntary Dismissal of Action with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/10/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER GRANTING Parties' Request for Extension of Time to File Dispositional Documents 279 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/16/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER Vacating June 13, 2017 Order and Directing the Clerk of the Court to Terminate Defendants Adams and Alexander as Parties in This Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) 276 , 277 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/14/17. (Hellings, J)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case 276 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/13/17. (Hellings, J)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER Granting the Parties' Joint Motion to Vacate the Jury Verdict in Accordance with the Global Settlement Agreement, and Granting Stipulation to Extend the Time to Submit Dispositional Documents re 273 , 274 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/17. 30- Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER GRANTING Parties' Request to File a Joint Stipulated Motion to Set Aside the Jury Verdict on or Before April 7, 2017 271 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/31/17. (Case Management Deadline: 4/7/2017)(Martin-Gill, S)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff George E. Jacobs, CDCR# J-48666, for Settlement Conference on March 28, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/28/2017. (Flores, E)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff George E. Jacobs, CDCR# P-32684, for Settlement Conference on March 28, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/27/2017. (Flores, E)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER Amending Portion of November 17, 2016, Directing Parties to File a Status Report by February 1, 2017, and Resetting Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/06/2016. (Flores, E)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 3/28/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/05/2016. (Flores, E)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER APPROVING Stipulation to VACATE and CONTINUE POST-TRIAL MOTION SCHEDULE 261 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/017/2016.(Status Report Deadline: 2/1/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER Setting Deadlines for Filing of Post-Trial Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/04/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER and Receipt for Trial Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/03/2016. (Flores, E)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER APPROVING 225 Stipulation to Modify Pretrial Order to Substitute Dr. Reetika K. Kumar as a Rebuttal Expert Witness signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2016. (Jessen, A)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport George E. Jacobs, CDCR# J-48666 on September 27, 2016 at 8:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER REGARDING Parties' 200 202 Motions in Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/22/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING 205 & 209 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2016. (Jessen, A)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Approving Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Date from September 26, 2016, to September 27, 2016, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/01/2016. Jury Trial set for 9/27/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/22/2016 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Kenneth K. Lee is DENIED, without prejudice. (Crouch, J)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 AMENDMENT to TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Issued March 2, 2016, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/16/2016. (Flores, E)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ADDENDUM to Trial Scheduling ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/3/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/2/2016. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 8/5/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Telephonic Motions In Limine Hearing set for 8/19/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Jury Trial set for 9/26/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Granting Parties' Stipulation to Continue Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/11/2016. Status Conference set for 3/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER appointing counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2015. Attorney, Kenneth Kiyul Lee appointed for Plaintiff, George E. Jacobs, IV. (Lundstrom, T)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER REGARDING Parties' 155 167 168 Motions in Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/7/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Directing Defense Counsel to File a Response to Plaintiff's 178 Notice Filed November 25, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/2015. (Flores, E)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff George E. Jacobs IV, CDCR# J-48666, for Jury Trial on December 14, 2015 at 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/16/2015. (Flores, E)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/9/15. (20-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Vacating September 22, 2015, Trial Date and Re-Setting Trial Date signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/21/2015. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 10/28/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Flores, E)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Until August 14, 2015, to File a Motion for a Continuance of the Trial Date, and Setting Motion for Telephonic Hearing on August 20, 2015, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 9 Before the Undersigned, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/7/15. (Marrujo, C)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/16/15. Telephonic Pretrial Confirmation Hearing set for 8/7/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Telephonic Motions in Limine Hearing set for 9/8/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Jury Trial set for 9/22/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Verduzco, M)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 149 150 Motions for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/02/2015. (Flores, E)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference Call, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/6/2015. (Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.) (Fahrney, E)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 140 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause; ORDER Discharging 127 Order to Show Cause; ORDER Lifting Stay of Trial-Setting Proceedings re 118 ; Notice of Telephonic Status Hearing Before Magistrate Gary S. Austin, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/23/15. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/5/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Gonzalez, R)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. 138 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/16/2015. (Fahrney, E)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Denying 128 Motion to Appoint Counsel for Limited Purpose signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/13/2014. (Flores, E)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT PROCEED TO TRIAL, EITHER CONTINUING TO STAY THE CASE AGAINST DEFENDANT CROTTY UNDER 11 U.S.C. ' 362(a), OR DISMISSING DEFENDANT CROTTY FROM THIS ACTION signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/4/2014. Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2014.(Lundstrom, T)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER for Defense Counsel to Continue Filing Quarterly Status Reports pursuant to Court's Order of April 24, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/26/14. (Verduzco, M)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 114 Requests to Delay Trial Pending Resolution of Defendant Crotty's Bankruptcy Proceedings, and to be Provided with Status Reports; ORDER to Stay Case; ORDER for Defense Counsel to File Quarterly Status Reports Beginning on or About June 1, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/24/2013.
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER For Plaintiff to Advise Court Whether He Wishes to Delay Trial OR Dismiss Defendant Crotty, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/16/12: FOURTEEN DAY DEADLINE. (Hellings, J)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting in part Plaintiff's 85 Motion to Compel Production of Documents; Order for Defendants to Produce Documents Pursuant to Plaintiff's Request for Production No. 13, as Instructed by This Order, within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/27/2012. Discovery due by 10/01/2012. (Flores, E)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's 84 Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Admissions Set One, and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; ORDER for Defendants to Serve Amended Responses to Plaintff's Request for Admissions Set One, as Instructed by this Court, within Forty-Five Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/20/2012. (Flores, E)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER For Defense Counsel To File Status Report Concerning Defendant Crotty Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/2/2012. (Status Report Deadline: 8/6/2012) (Fahrney, E)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting 103 Motion for Extension of Deadline for all Parties to File Dispositive Motions signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/26/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/29/2012. (Flores, E)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 77 Motion for Reconsideration and Resolving Defendants' 82 Motion for a New Scheduling Order; ORDER Extending Deadlines for all Parties to this Action signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/23/2012. Discovery Cut-Off due by 3/5/2012; Dispositive Motions filed by 6/29/2012. (Flores, E)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff by Video Conference or Telephone 70 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/15/11. (Verduzco, M)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Extending Application of Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Alexander signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 07/12/2011. Motions filed by 9/1/2011.(Flores, E)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Addressing Plaintiff's Opposition to Notice of Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/1/11. (Hellings, J)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER STAYING 1 Action as to Defendant Crotty Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(a); ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 55 Motion to Preserve Evidence signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/22/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE Motions, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/29/10: Plaintiff's November 4, 2010 Motion 33 is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a copy of the May 5, 2010 Third Amended Complaint; and Plaintiff's November 18, 2010 Motion for Reconsideration 34 is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Dismissing Certain Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/19/2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?