Curtis v. Kushner et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv00045
Filed: March 15, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 62 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/20/11: The Clerk of the Court SHALL enter judgment and close this case. (CASE CLOSED) (Hellings, J)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Opposition or Statement of No Opposition to Defendant's 62 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/13/2011. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment re 46 , 48 , 54 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/10/2010. (Bradley, A)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 42 Request for Entry of Default; ORDER for Clerk to Enter Default Against Defendant Ernest Vaughn signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/26/2010. (Bradley, A)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why case should not be Dismissed for failure to serve Defendant. Show Cause Response due by 5/6/2009. signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/3/09. (Gil-Garcia, A)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER, MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/7/08. (Lundstrom, T)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/14/06. (Gil-Garcia, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Kushner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?