Demerson v. Warden of SATF et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00250
Filed: April 7, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' 81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim be Denied and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/24/11. Thirty Day Deadline. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DENYING Motion for Release of Legal Property 99 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/8/11. (Hellings, J)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER and MOTION TO DISMISS and MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/9/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Adopting 66 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants from 56 Second Amended Complaint, and REFERRING MATTER back to Magistrate Judge to Initiate Service of Process signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/3/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's First 67 Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/7/2010. Objections to F&R due by 10/28/2010. (Bradley, A)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/31/10: Recommending that this action proceed on the Second Amended Complaint 56 against Defendants Sgt. Curtiss, C/O Renya and C/O Morgan on Plaintiff's execessi ve force claim. Sgt. Curtiss, C/O Renya and C/O Reynoso on Plaintiff's failure to protect claim. Defendants J. Woodford, D. Adams, K. Clark, L. Hense, Captain Diaz, Lieutenant Pineda, Lieutenant Odle, Sergeant Davis, Munoz, Sgt. Padilla, and Medical Technical Assistant Hernandez be dismissed; Objections to F&R due by 10/4/2010, Reply due 10 days after service of the objections. (Hellings, J)
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Judge William M. Wunderlich on 4/6/06. (Robles, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demerson v. Warden of SATF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?