Dickey v. Ylst
Case Number: 1:2006cv00357
Filed: March 31, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: (1) DENYING Penalty Phase Claims, (2) DENYING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (3) Issuing Certificate of Appealability for Claims I, II(E), II(I), V and XIII and (4) DENYING AS MOOT Petitioner's Motion for Stay, Entry of Partial Judgment and for Certificates of Appealability re 51 [51-1], 145 ; Clerk to Vacate Any and All Scheduled Dates and Substitute Ron Davis as Respondent Warden and Enter Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/12/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SCHEDULING ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/17/2017: It is hereby ordered that on or before April 17, 2017, Petitioner shall file a memorandum of points and authorities addressing 28 U .S.C. § 2254(d) in support of each penalty claim in the petition. On or before June 19, 2017, Respondent shall file a memorandum of points and authorities in opposition. On or before July 19, 2017, Petitioner shall file any reply memorandum of points and authorities. (Valdez, E)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER REGARDING Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/2/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: (1) DENYING Request to Strike Second Amended Answer (Doc. 128 ); (2) DENYING Request for Factual Development (Docs. 116 & 128 ; (3) DENYING Guilt Phase Claims (Docs. 51 , 51 -1); (4) Setting Case Management Conference; and (5) DIRECTING the Court Clerk to Substitute Warden Ron Davis as Respondent, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/13/17. Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. CASE TO REMAIN OPEN.(Marrujo, C)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Directing Clerk to Terminate Respondent's Motion for a More Definite Statement 126 ; ORDER Vacating Hearing Set for November 19, 2014 at 10:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/18/14. (Verduzco, M)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Clarifying Merits Brief Scheduling Order 111 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/21/14. (Gonzalez, R)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Setting Merits Briefing Schedule, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/15/2013.(Case Management Deadline: 4/16/2014 and Filing Deadline: 11/7/2014) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Regarding Merits Briefing of Federal Petition signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/08/2013. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Modifying Appointment of Replacement Counsel to Represent Petitioner, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/20/13. Attorneys Matthew Laurence Weston, Ann-Kathryn Tria for Colin Raker Dickey added. (Verduzco, M)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/18/12. (Hellings, J)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Following Case Management Conference, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/18/12. (Hellings, J)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RESCHEDULING Case Management Conference signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/3/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER APPOINTING Replacement Counsel to Represent Petitioner signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/12/2012. Attorney David A Senior for Colin Raker Dickey added. (Sant Agata, S)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING Request by Petition's Second Counsel to be Relieved and REFERRING Case to Selection Board signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/1/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting Request by Petitioner's Counsel to be Relieved and Referring Case to Selection Board signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 01/23/2012. Attorney Kerry Randall Bensinger terminated from action.(Flores, E)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Following Case Management Conference signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/04/2009. Warden shall lodge the state record by 1/29/2010; Doolins federal petition shall be filed on or before October 5, 2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickey v. Ylst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?