Robinson v. Tait

Case Number: 1:2006cv00385
Filed: April 20, 2006
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, signed by District Judge David G. Campbell on 10/7/09: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 30 is GRANTED; The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. (CASE CLOSED) (Hellings, J)
July 17, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge David G. Campbell on 7/17/2009. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants 30 motion for summary judgment and 31 supporting evidence by August 14, 2009. Defendant shall file a reply by August 28, 2009. Response: 8/14/2009. Reply: 8/28/2009. (Sondheim, M)
April 15, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER signed by District Judge David G. Campbell on 04/14/2009. The deadline for joining parties, amending pleadings, and filing supplemental pleadings is 60 days from the date of this Order; Deadline for Completion of Fact Discovery due by 8/28/2009; Plaintiff Expert Disclosure due by 6/5/09; Defendants Expert Disclosure due by 7/3/09; Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2009. (Flores, E)
February 20, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to meet and confer by March 13, 2009, and parties shall jointly file the case management report by 3/27/2009 signed by District Judge David G. Campbell on 02/18/2009. (Flores, E)
April 20, 2006 4 Opinion or Order of the Court FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/20/06. (Keeler, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Tait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?