October 30, 2013 |
Filing
126
ORDER DENYING Motion for Late Settlement and Thief of Payment Agreement 118 ; ORDER DENYING Motion in Support of Violation By Defendants Violating a Court Order 121 ; ORDER DENYING Request That Settlement Agreement Be Enforced By Defendants as Moot 122 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/30/13. (Hellings, J)
|
December 27, 2012 |
Filing
117
ORDER DENYING 115 Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/27/2012. (Jessen, A)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing
114
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, With Prejudice, Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(1)(ii), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 08/20/2012. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
|
July 20, 2012 |
Filing
110
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/20/2012 granting 107 REQUEST for Representative to Appear at Settlement Conference by Telephone. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 19, 2012 |
Filing
105
ORDER & Writ Of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum To Transport Donald J. Ackley, CDC# E-81926, Plaintiff, Date: August 8, 2012, Time: 9:00 A.M., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/18/2012. (Fahrney, E)
|
June 1, 2012 |
Filing
104
ORDER VACATING Telephonic Conference On July 16, 2012 (ECF No. 102 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/1/2012. (Fahrney, E)
|
May 31, 2012 |
Filing
103
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/30/2012 vacating Jury Trial, setting Settlement Conference and Telephonic Status Conference; denying 92 Motion to continue trial and denying 93 Motion for discovery. (Settlement Conference set for 8/8/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/27/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii). (Lundstrom, T)
|
May 16, 2012 |
Filing
98
ORDER SETTING Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/2012. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 5/29/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Jessen, A)
|
May 9, 2012 |
Filing
96
ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 94 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/9/2012. (Fahrney, E)
|
April 23, 2012 |
Filing
88
ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether They Will Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Within Ten (10) Days signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/20/2012. (Jessen, A)
|
January 24, 2012 |
Filing
86
ORDER adopting 65 , 80 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/24/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
85
ORDER GRANTING 82 , 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and Deeming Plaintiff's Motion for the Attendance of Witnesses and Pretrial Statement as Timely Submitted; ORDER DENYING 82 Plaintiff's Motion for the Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses; and ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Submit Witness Fees by April 13, 2012, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/18/2012. (Jessen, A)
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing
80
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 78 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction be DENIED re 1 Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/13/2011. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
|
November 22, 2011 |
Filing
77
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 76 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/2011. Defendants' Pretrial Statement Due December 16, 2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
75
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Second 74 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and VACATING Dates for Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing and Trial; SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/9/2011. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 5/14/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 6/26/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
73
ORDER DENYING 69 and 70 Motion for Separate Trials and Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 28, 2011 |
Filing
66
ORDER Regarding Settlement Negotiations, re: 62 and 63 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 09/27/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 1, 2011 |
Filing
62
ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Before United States Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison Would Be Beneficial, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/31/2011. Response due within twenty (20) days. (Jessen, A)
|
August 29, 2011 |
Filing
61
ORDER GRANTING 60 Defendant's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and VACATING Dates for Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing and Trial; AMENDED SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/29/2011. Trial Confirmation Hearing RESET for 3/19/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial RESET for 5/1/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Jessen, A)
|
July 13, 2011 |
Filing
58
ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS And Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 47 , 56 , 57 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Appointment Of Expert Witness, Motion For Appointment Of Counsel, And Motion To Set A Settlement Conference, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/12/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
June 1, 2011 |
Filing
56
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/1/2011 recommending that 47 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be granted in part and denied in part. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 7/5/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
|
May 17, 2011 |
Filing
55
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Stay Action and Reopen Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 05/17/2011. (Flores, E)
|
December 14, 2010 |
Filing
49
ORDER DENYING 48 Motion for referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Settlement Program, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/13/2010. (Martin, S)
|
September 21, 2010 |
Filing
44
ORDER granting extension of time to file Dispositive Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/21/2010. (Dispositive Motions filed by 10/25/2010).(Lundstrom, T)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing
43
ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 42 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/30/10: Motion is DENIED, without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/15/2010 granting Defendants a 14-day extension of time to conduct Plaintiff's deposition and to file a motion to compel the deposition and to conduct Plaintiff's deposition via a video conference. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing
39
ORDER DENYING 32 Motion for Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/30/2010. ( Motion to Compel Deadline: 7/23/2010.) (Marrujo, C)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing
38
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Extension and 34 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/28/2010. (Vasquez, J)
|
February 9, 2010 |
Filing
29
ORDER Granting Defendants' 27 MOTION to Compel Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/08/2010. Discovery due by 3/4/2010. (Flores, E)
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing
28
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 26 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Time to Conduct Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/13/2010. (Sondheim, M)
|