May 8, 2012 |
Filing
177
ORDER Requiring Production of Prisoner for Trial on May 9, 2012 at 8:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/08/2012. (Flores, E)
|
May 7, 2012 |
Filing
175
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/2/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Donald Lancaster, Jr., is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
|
May 2, 2012 |
Filing
174
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/11/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel, Donald Lancaster, Jr., is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing
172
ORDER re Courtroom/Trial Decorum, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/30/12. (Gonzalez, R)
|
April 27, 2012 |
Filing
171
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 158 159 160 Motions In Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/26/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
|
March 26, 2012 |
Filing
150
PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/26/2012. Motions in Limine filed by 4/13/2012; Oppositions to Motions in Limine due by 4/20/2012; Trial Submisions due by 4/24/2012; Jury Trial set for 5/8/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Flores, E)
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
135
AMENDED Second Scheduling Order; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Notify Court Whether He Consents to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Within Thirty Days; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Send Consent Form to Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/31/12: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 5/8/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.(Hellings, J)
|
January 23, 2012 |
Filing
134
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/5/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs regarding travel is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
|
November 30, 2011 |
Filing
133
ORDER Granting Motion for Appointment of Counsel 128 , 129 ; ORDER Appointing Counsel for Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/29/11. Attorney Donald Aquinas Lancaster, Jr. appointed for Plaintiff Punaofo Tsugito Tilei. (Verduzco, M)
|
November 28, 2011 |
Filing
132
ORDER Granting 129 Plaintiff's Request to Reopen Case; ORDER Directing Clerk to Reopen Case signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/28/2011. Case reopened. (Flores, E)
|
October 27, 2011 |
Filing
127
ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Motion # 126 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/27/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
August 17, 2011 |
Filing
125
ORDER Vacating Trial And Extending Time For Plaintiff To Respond To Order To Show Cause, Thirty Day Deadline, Jury Trial Previously Scheduled For August 2, 2011 Has Been Vacated, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/17/2011. ( Responses due by 9/21/2011, Show Cause Response due by 9/21/2011) (Fahrney, E)
|
July 27, 2011 |
Filing
122
ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/26/2011. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing
121
ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File a Declaration Showing Cause why this Case Should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 07/14/2011. Show Cause Response due by 7/25/2011. (Flores, E)
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing
120
ORDER Granting in Part Defendants' 116 Request; ORDER Vacating Pretrial Conference and Relieving Defendants from Filing Pretrial Statement signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 06/14/2011. Jury Trial set for 8/2/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.(Flores, E)
|
January 13, 2011 |
Filing
111
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 92 Motion for Assistance Facilitating Communication with Inmate Witnesses, with Prejudice; ORDER CLOSING Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/13/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 13, 2010 |
Filing
107
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 99 , 100 Motions to Compel Discovery Responses as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/12/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing
106
ORDER Requiring Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's 92 MOTION for Assistance in Communicating with Inmate Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/08/2010. Response due by 11/10/2010. (Flores, E)
|
July 12, 2010 |
Filing
105
ORDER GRANTING 102 Motion for Extension of time to file Discovery; (Discovery, including Motions to Compel, due by 9/17/2010; Pretrial Dispositive Motions filed by 11/19/2010), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/12/2010. (Marrujo, C)
|
March 10, 2010 |
Filing
94
ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objection To, And Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Of, ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motions To Compel (Doc. 90 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/10/2010. (Scrivner, E)
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing
89
ORDER DENYING 62 and 76 Plaintiff's Motions For Assistance Facilitating Communication With Inmate Witnesses, Without Prejudice to Renewal Within Forty-Five Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/22/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing
85
ORDER DENYING 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Ruling on Letters to Clerk's Office, Attached as Exhibit C; and ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Provide Plaintiff With a Copy of the Docket Following the Docketing of This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/20/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing
80
ORDER Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 1/19/10. (Masterson, G)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing
72
ORDER STAYING Scheduling Order Pending Settlement Conference 40 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions as Moot 65 , 66 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/12/09. (Hellings, J)
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing
71
ORDER Approving Stipulation, GRANTING Request for Referral to Judge Vadas for Settlement Conference, and Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/9/09: Settlement Conference set for 12/15/2009 at 01:00 PM at C alifornia State Prison-Solano, before Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas; Confidential Settlement Conference Statements are due on or before 12/1/09 and are to be sent to Judge Nandor J. Vadas; The Clerk's Office shall serve a courtesy copy of this order on Judge Vadas.(Hellings, J)
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing
40
DISCOVERY ORDER, SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/22/2009; Motions due 3/30/2009; Amended Complaint due 7/30/2009; Discovery due 9/30/2009; Dispositive Motion due 11/30/2009. A request for an extension of a deadline set in this order must be filed on or before the expiration of the deadline in question and extensions of time will only be granted on a showing of good cause. (Figueroa, O)
|
June 30, 2006 |
Filing
6
FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/30/06. (Hellings, J)
|