Plata v. Woodford et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01023
Filed: August 7, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Without Prejudice, For Failure to Obey a Court Order 57 ; ORDER For Clerk to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/17/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time For Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' 56 MOTION for Terminating Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/12/2011. Deadline: September 30, 2011. (Marrujo, C)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 51 Request to Withdraw Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/16/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 40 , ORDER For This Action To Proceed Only Against Defendants Watson, Corona, And John/Jane Doe #6, On Plaintiff's Claims For Retaliation And Failure To Protect, ORDER Dismissing Remaining Claims And Defendants For Failure To State A Claim, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/2/2010. (Fahrney, E)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action Proceed Only Against Defendants Watson, Corona, and John/Jane Doe #6, On Plaintiff's Claims for Retaliation and Failure to Protect, and All Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed re 19 First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/15/2010. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 11/18/2010. (Jessen, A)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING Findings and Recommendations of July 23, 2010 33 ; ORDER for Clerk to send the Plaintiff: (1) Copy of Court's Third Screening Order 32 (2) Section 1983 Complaint Form; ORDER for Plaintiff to comply with Court's Third Screening Order within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/15/2010. (Case Management Deadline: 10/19/2010) (Martin, S)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/22/2010 recommending that action be DISMISSED re 26 Amended Complaint. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 8/26/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/30/2009. (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plata v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?