April 8, 2014 |
Filing
230
FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION Re Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 106 , 152 ), Objections Due In Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/7/2014. Objections to F&R due by 5/12/2014 (Fahrney, E)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing
229
ORDER DENYING 228 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/25/2013. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 16, 2013 |
Filing
227
ORDER DENYING 226 Motion for Immediate Ruling signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/15/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
|
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
222
ORDER for PLAINTIFF to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendants Guerrero and Garcia Should Not Be Dismissed From this Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute Against Them, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/13/2012. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
|
November 9, 2012 |
Filing
218
ORDER Denying Motion to Stay, Denying Request for Clarification, and Granting Motion for Extension of Time; 30-Day Deadline for Plaintiff to File Amended Opposition to Defendant Mandujano's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/08/2012. Amended Opposition due by 12/11/2012. (Flores, E)
|
October 31, 2012 |
Filing
216
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 215 Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Mandujano as MOOT, with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/31/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
|
August 24, 2012 |
Filing
201
ORDER Vacating Motions for Summary Judgment From Court's Calendar 106 , 152 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/24/12. (Gonzalez, R)
|
August 23, 2012 |
Filing
200
AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER-NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' 106 152 Summary Judgment Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/23/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
198
ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 195 ; ORDER Denying Motion for Default Judgment 194 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/19/12. (Gonzalez, R)
|
August 10, 2012 |
Filing
197
ORDER Permitting Plaintiff to Withdraw Opposition, and File Amended Opposition, if he so Wishes signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/10/2012. (Flores, E)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
195
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 194 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Mandujano be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/19/2012. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 8/13/2012. (Flores, E)
|
July 2, 2012 |
Filing
190
ORDER Denying Motion For Investigation And For Stay (Doc. 189 ), ORDER Granting Extension Of Time To File Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment (Doc. 152 ), Sixty Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on July 2, 2012. (Response due by 9/5/2012)(Fahrney, E)
|
June 4, 2012 |
Filing
186
ORDER DENYING Motion for Stay 185 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/4/12. (Hellings, J)
|
May 21, 2012 |
Filing
184
ORDER Denying 182 Motion for Stay; ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/21/2012. Opposition due by 7/23/2012.(Flores, E)
|
May 2, 2012 |
Filing
181
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 180 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/2/2012. (Marrujo, C)
|
April 18, 2012 |
Filing
179
ORDER Granting 171 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Defendants O'Grady, Wilcox and Wilkerson's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/17/2012. Response due by 5/21/2012. (Flores, E)
|
April 17, 2012 |
Filing
177
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 169 Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/17/2012. (Flores, E)
|
March 28, 2012 |
Filing
168
ORDER Denying 167 Request for Court Order Allowing Plaintiff to take Polygraph Test; ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/28/2012. (Flores, E)
|
March 14, 2012 |
Filing
166
ORDER DENYING 165 Motion for Stay and Motion for Order Releasing Plaintiff from Ad-Seg and Allowing him to Possess a Tape Recorder signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/14/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
|
January 24, 2012 |
Filing
157
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 145 Motion to Extend Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/24/2012. Discovery Cut-Off due by 3/23/2012; Dispositive Motions filed by 5/25/2012. (Flores, E)
|
December 1, 2011 |
Filing
148
ORDER DENYING 144 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and 147 Motion for Private Investigator, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/1/2011. (Jessen, A)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
143
ORDER Denying Motion For Transcripts (Doc. 142 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/24/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
October 18, 2011 |
Filing
141
ORDER Denying 131 Motion for Transfer; ORDER Denying 131 137 Motion for Stay based on Prison Conditions and Plaintiff's Medical Condition; ORDER Granting in Part 138 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal; ORDER Staying Case Against Defendant Mandujano, Pending Appeal; ORDER Vacating Defendant Mandujano's 106 Motion for Summary Judgment from Court Calendar, Pending Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/17/2011. (Flores, E)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
129
ORDER DENYING 128 Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/27/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Filing
126
ORDER denying 118 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/22/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
120
ORDER ADOPTING 97 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 83 Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Debbie Mandujano signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/11/2011. (Flores, E)
|
August 22, 2011 |
Filing
114
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/22/2011 denying 110 Motion to Stay proceedings and granting extension of time to file response to 106 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Response due by 9/22/2011.(Lundstrom, T)
|
August 1, 2011 |
Filing
105
ORDER adopting 100 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 98 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/29/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
104
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/25/2011 denying Motion for Counsel, to stay proceedings, to accommodate Plaintiff's claustrophobia and provide envelopes, access to law library, truthserum and polygraph test and for court to provide free copies re 101 , 102 . Granting 101 Motion for Extension of time to file objections to Findings and Recommendations. ( Objections to F&R due by 8/29/2011). (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing
100
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/14/2011. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 7/18/2011. (Flores, E)
|
June 14, 2011 |
Filing
99
ORDER DENYING 98 Motion to Appoint Counsel and to Stay Proceedings; and ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Objections to 97 Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/14/2011. Objections to F&R due within sixty (60) days. (Jessen, A)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
97
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Debbie Mandujano Be Denied; OBJECTIONS, IF ANY, DUE IN 30 DAYS (Doc. 83 ; Also Resolves Docs. 92 , 94 , 95 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/24/11: Matter/Motions referred to Judge Ishii. (Hellings, J)
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing
90
ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 80 ; ORDER Denying Motion to Dismiss 68 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
January 20, 2011 |
Filing
88
ORDER DENYING 86 Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Provide Him Transportation signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/20/2011. (Jessen, A)
|
January 5, 2011 |
Filing
82
ORDER Vacating Order To Show Cause And Excusing Plaintiff From Filing Response (Doc. 78 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/5/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
December 16, 2010 |
Filing
80
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/16/10: Recommending That Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, filed on June 3, 2010, be DENIED 68 ; MOTION to DISMISS filed by Wilcox, O'Grady, Wilkerson and 35 Amended Complaint filed by Robert P. Benyamini referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 1/10/2011, Reply due 10 court days (+3 days if served by mail) after service of the objections. (Hellings, J)
|
December 15, 2010 |
Filing
78
ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Manjuano Should Not Be Dismissed From This Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute Against Her, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/15/10: Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 1/18/2011. (Hellings, J)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
74
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 72 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/15/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing
67
ORDER DENYING 66 Motion for Default Judgment as PREMATURE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/1/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing
61
ORDER DENYING 60 Motion to Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/23/2009. (Sondheim, M)
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing
57
ORDER DENYING 56 Motion to Appoint Counsel and to Stay Proceedings; Order Directing Clerk's Office to Prepare USM-285 Forms and Summonses on Plaintiff's Behalf signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/10/2009. (Figueroa, O)
|