Allen et al v. Kumagai et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01469
Filed: October 19, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/24/2011. Derik Kumagai dismissed with prejudice from action.(Lundstrom, T)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER on Defendants' 95 Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication and Order Granting Stay as to Plaintiffs' 94 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Their Claims Against Fresno City Defendants, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/9/2011. (Marrujo, C)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER vacating hearing date of 2/14/2011 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Stipulated Dismissal and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/14/11. Robert Lincoln, Valerie Dunn and Romeo Grajeda terminated.(Verduzco, M)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION and ORDER MODIFYING the March 5, 2010, scheduling order as follows: designation of expert witnesses by 10/25/2010; supplemental expert designation by 11/8/2010; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/20/2010. (Rooney, M)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice 77 Motion to Dismiss, Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/4/2010. (Arellano, S.)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER vacating hearing date of April 5, 2010 and taking matter under submission signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/31/10. (Nazaroff, H)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Scheduling Conference: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 2/10/2010 to Monday, March 1, 2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder; Joint Scheduling Report due on or before 2/22/2010. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/29/2010. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Kumagai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?