United States of America v. Uptergrove et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01630
Filed: November 14, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER of DISTRIBUTION signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/2/2012. (Marrujo, C)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting motion to substitute party signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/30/11. (Nazaroff, H)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Confirming Sale, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/22/11. (Gonzalez, R)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER vacating hearing of August 22, 2011 and taking matter under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/18/2011. (Nazaroff, H)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER ending stay and ORDERING defendants Charles and Martha Uptergrove to vacate the subject property; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/1/2010. (US Marshal Service, Fresno, served with instant order via hand delivery) (Rooney, M)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER STAYING ACTION Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362(c) for Thirty Days signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/24/2010. After thirty days or an order from the Bankruptcy Court Judge concerning this stay, the stay will automatically lift and the August 31, 2010 order will take full effect.(Bradley, A)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER to Vacate Property, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/30/10. (cc: USM - certified copy)(Hellings, J)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 168 Motion to Void Judgment and 172 Amended Motion to Void Judgment signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/24/2010. (Figueroa, O)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER setting briefing schedule and continuing motion Hearing set for 7/26/2010 to 8/30/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/15/2010. (Nazaroff, H)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Staying Case and Enforcement of the Order to Vacate signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/29/2009. Case Stayed. (Flores, E)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 AMENDED ORDER TO VACATE PROPERTY signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/17/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER TO VACATE PROPERTY signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/2/2009. (Certified copy of instant order delivered to US Marshal Service, Fresno)(Rooney, M)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING 154 Objections signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/27/2009. (Figueroa, O)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Monetary Sanctions 77 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/31/2008. Sanctions due by 3/3/2008.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Uptergrove et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?