Tracy Yu-Santos v. Ford Motor Company et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv01773
Filed: December 7, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL and ORDER. Defendants Robert Santos and TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. are DISMISSED pursuant to FRCVP 41(a)(1). Each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/21/10. (Robles, S)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER regarding Plaintiff and Defendants' Mutual Settlement Agreement signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/17/2010. (Case Management Deadline: 6/25/2010)(Kusamura, W)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 108 Motion in Limine No. 1 of Defendant TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc. to Exclude Plaintiff's Evidence, Testimony and Argument of Unrelated Products and Defect Theories, and Unrelated Accidents, Claims, or Lawsuits, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/7/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Pre-Trial Order, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/4/2010. (Kusamura, W)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER on Defendant's Motion For Judgment In Its Favor On All Claims Related To Keilan Santos, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/3/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 97 Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 4 To Exclude Any And All Evidence Or References To The Materials Included In Defendant's Supplemental To Its Disclosure Of Expert Testimony Served On February 10, 2010, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/2/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Denying 100 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Evidence Of Rollover Testing, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/1/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 TENTATIVE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion To Amend The Pretrial Order 142 signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/25/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING Ex Parte Application For An Order (1) Modifying The Scheduling Order To Permit The Filing Of TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.'s Motion To Enter Judgment In It's Favor On All Claims Arising From The Death Of Keilan Santos; And (2) Shortening Time For Briefing And Hearing On The Same, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/21/2010. ( Counter-motion by Plaintiff shall be filed by May 24, 2010 by 12:00 p.m.; Plaintiff Tracy Yu-Santos shall file and serve her opposition to TRW VSSIs Motion by 5:00 p.m. on May 26, 2010; Any defense opposition to Plaintiffs counter-motion shall befiled by May 27, 2010 by 12:00 p.m.; TRW VSSI shall file and serve its reply papers in support of the Motion by 12:00 p.m. on May 28, 2010, andPlaintiffs shall file and serve their counter-motion reply by12:00 p.m. on May 28, 2010; Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2010 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. )(Gaumnitz, R)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 COURTROOM DECORUM. (Gaumnitz, R)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION and ORDER continuing Pretrial Conference and deadline to file joint pretrial conference statement; the deadline to file the Joint Pretrial Conference Statement shall be continued from February 12, 2010 to February 19, 2010 the Pretrial Conference currently set for 2/19/2010 is continued to 2/26/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/10/2010. (Timken, A)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 JOINT STIPULATION Requesting Continuation of Trial Date, Pretrial Conference and All Currently Scheduled and Statutorily Scheduled Dates for Six Weeks; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/18/2009. (Jury Trial set for 4/20/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracy Yu-Santos v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?