March 5, 2019 |
Filing
280
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Robinson's Motion for Leave to Amend to Complaint, filed on December 23, 2015, be DENIED and The clerk be directed to : (1) Close this case and (2) Serve the Ninth Circuit with a copy of this order re 243 MOTION to AMEND the 53 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, filed by Jackie Robinson ; referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/5/2019. Objections to F&R due : 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
|
December 14, 2018 |
Filing
276
ORDER DENYING 275 Motion to Recuse AS MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/13/2018. (Jessen, A)
|
December 6, 2018 |
Filing
274
ORDER GRANTING 272 Plaintiff Robinson's Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing Regarding Motion to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/6/2018. Supplemental Briefing due by 1/10/2019. Defendants' Responsive Briefing due by 1/17/2019. Plaintiff's Reply to Response due by 1/31/2019. (Jessen, A)
|
November 14, 2018 |
Filing
265
ORDER Allowing Plaintiff Jackie Robinson to File Supplemental Briefing Regarding His Motion to File an Amended Complaint 243 signed by District Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 11/14/2018. Plaintiff's Supplemental Briefing due by 11/30/2018. Defendants' Responses due by 12/7/2018. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/21/2018. (Jessen, A)
|
August 16, 2016 |
Filing
253
RULE 54(b) JUDGMENT RE: ALL CLAIMS OF JACKIE ROBINSON signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 8/16/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
|
December 17, 2014 |
Filing
203
ORDER re Dispositive Motions Deadline for PA & Laundry Claims, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 12/17/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/20/2015. (Jessen, A)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
202
ORDER re PA & Laundry Claims of Plaintiffs George N. Allen and Henry C. Scott, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 12/15/2014. Expert Disclosures with respect to these claims due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
|
September 11, 2014 |
Filing
193
ORDER VACATING 192 Order on Motion signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 9/11/2014. (Jessen, A)
|
September 9, 2014 |
Filing
192
ORDER re 176 Motion, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 09/09/14. (Gonzalez, R)
|
March 3, 2014 |
Filing
183
ORDER Denying Motion for Relief from Final Judgment 169 , signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 3/3/14. (Verduzco, M)
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing
170
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: ORDER GRANTING 156 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 140 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's A mended Complaints, Motion to Strike and for a More Definite Statement; Order Substituting Audrey King and Andrew Beard as Defendants in this Action and Terminating All Claims Against All Other Defendants; Case Nos. 1:07-cv-00850-BLW, 1:07-cv-00987-B LW, 1:08-cv-01196-BLW and 1:10-cv-01973-BLW Shall be Severed From Case No. 1:06-cv-01801-BLW-LMB and REOPENED; All further submissions must be filed in Plaintiff's Individual Case; Counsel for Defendants Shall Notify the Court Within Ten (10) Da ys Whether They Will Waive Service on Behalf of Defendants King and Beard and Within Twenty-One (21) Days, the Parties Shall Submit Proposed Scheduling Orders; ORDER DENYING IN PART AND NOTED IN PART 168 Plaintiff Vasquez's Motion for Appearan ce Under His "Sui Juris" Status and Request for Appointment of Counsel; and ORDER DENYING 124 Plaintiff Vasquez's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Reissuance of Preliminary Injunction, Construed as a Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 8/1/2013. (Jessen, A)
|
April 3, 2013 |
Filing
149
ORDER on 137 143 145 146 Motions signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 4/3/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
|
February 12, 2013 |
Filing
136
RULE 54(b) JUDGMENT RE: All Claims of Jackie Robinson, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 2/12/13: Said claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Hellings, J)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing
123
ORDER transferring Plaintiff's Motion for reconsideration filed in case 1:12-cv-01557-AWI-MJS-PC signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/30/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
|
September 7, 2012 |
Filing
102
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re 96 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Denied, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 9/5/12. Discovery due by 2/28/2013, Dispositive Motions filed by 6/28/2013. Harold E Carmony terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
|
October 25, 2011 |
Filing
92
ORDER Setting Settlement/Triage Conference, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 10/25/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
87
ORDER Regarding Appearances for the September 16, 2011, Telephonic Triage (Scheduling) Conference and ORDER WITHDRAWING 86 Docket Text Order, as it was Filed in the Wrong Case, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 9/12/2011. (Jessen, A)
|
September 7, 2011 |
Filing
85
ORDERED that a telephonic Triage Conference shall be conducted on Friday, September 16, 2011 at 10:30 a.m., Boise time, which is 9:30 a.m. Moscow and California time; Triage conference shall be conducted by the Honorable David O. Carter, United States District Judge for the Central District of California, sitting by special designation, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 09/06/2011. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 1, 2011 |
Filing
84
ORDER Appointing Attorney Joe Ramsey as Pro Bono Local Co-Counsel for Plaintiffs; ORDER Directing the Executor or Heirs of Harold Carmony to File a Motion for Substitution of Party in this Case Within Ninety (90) Days if they Wish to Continue to Purs ue the Lawsuit; ORDER DENYING 81 Motion for Permissive Joinder; and ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 82 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 9/1/2011. cc: Judge David O. Carter, Joe Ramsey and Timothy J. Seeboth. (Jessen, A)
|
March 16, 2011 |
Filing
78
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 61 Motion for TRO; 62 Motion ; 63 Motion for TRO; 65 Motion ; 67 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; 71 Motion for TRO; ORDERED that Chief United States Magistrate Judge Candy W. Dale, United States District Court for the District of Idaho, is APPOINTED INTERIM TRIAGE JUDGE to preside over and conduct interim telephonic triage or videoconference proceedings with counsel until such time as JUDGE CARTER can conduct an IN-PERSON TRIAGE CONFERENCE with counsel and the parties; ORDERED that Judge Dale's scheduling clerk shall contact counsel and conference to be held no later than April 14, 2011; ORDERED that a copy of this order will be forwarded to Judge Carter and Judge Dale; ORDERED that all filings should be done through counsel, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 03/16/2011. (Martin, S)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing
74
ORDER Reassigning and CONSOLIDATING Civil Case No. 1:10-cv-01793-MJS (PC) with Lead Related Civil Consolidated Case No. 1:06-cv-01801-BLW-LMB (PC), signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/30/2010. All Future Filings to be Made in Lead Case 1:06-cv-01801-BLW-LMB (PC); Member Case 1:10-cv-01793-MJS (PC) CLOSED. Plaintiff George Vasquez added. (Verduzco, M)
|
November 1, 2010 |
Filing
73
ORDER Establishing a Two-Part Settlement Conference, signed by District Judge David A. Carter on 11/1/2010. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing
72
PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 10/26/2010. Attorney Maureen E. Laflin added for plaintiffs. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 22, 2010 |
Filing
69
PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 10/22/2010. Attorney Patrick Costello added for plaintiffs. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 14, 2010 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 10/14/2010. Attorneys Maureen Laflin and Patrick Costello appointed for Plaintiffs. Plaintiff Darryell Frazier's 60 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. (Verduzco, M)
|
September 3, 2010 |
Filing
59
ORDER ADOPTING 54 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DENYING 30 Plaintiff' DeBerry's Motion for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice; ORDER DENYING 48 Plaintiff Carmony's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief; ORDER DIS MISSING Raymond Amadeo's Case (Member Case No. 1:07-cv-00834-BLW); ORDER DISMISSING Don D. McNeal's Case (Member Case No. 1:07-cv-00851-BLW), signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 9/3/2010. Plaintiffs Lawtis Donald Rhoden, Darryell Frazier and Jackie Robinson shall be served with the Report and Recommendation and Order ( 54 ) and shall follow the instructions in the order regarding submission of confidential triage memoranda to Judge David O. Carter. (Jessen, A)
|
August 6, 2010 |
Filing
55
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Lead Case is 1:06-cv-1801-BLW-LMB, Member Case 1:08-cv-01339-JLS-BLM; Member Case Closed; All future filings to be made in Lead Case; Plaintiff Jackie Robinson and Defendants: Miriam Joya, Maria Zavala, Duvall and Ofelia Corona added, signed by District Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/3/2010. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing
54
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaitiff DeBerry's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff Carmony's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief 48 be DENIED without prejudice, and instead be ad dressed the Triage Conference; The actions filed by Raymond Amadeo, Don D. McNeal, and Fred Scott be DISMISSED without prejudice; In the event Plaintiff Rick Gonzales fails to file an Amended Complaint by August 20, 2010, his original complaint should be STAYED, signed by Magistrate Judge Larry M. Boyle on 07/22/2010. Referred to Judge Winmill; Objections to F&R due by 8/9/2010 (Martin, S)
|