Marti v. Padilla, et al
Plaintiff: Alex Lamota Marti
Defendant: F - Padilla, Mcguirt, S Knight, W S Wadkins, W.W. Williams, W. Gardner and S. Boos
Case Number: 1:2007cv00066
Filed: January 12, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re Defendants' 173 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/25/2015, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER-NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' 173 Summary Judgment Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/23/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 219 , 225 Motions for Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/20/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Deposition, and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Stay 210 ; ORDER for Defendants to Serve Plaintiff With Copy of Deposition Transcript Within Twenty Days 175 ; ORDER for Plaintiff to File Declaration Within Forty-Five Days, as Instructed By This Court; ORDER for Defendants to Notify Court Within Thirty Days if Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/7/12. (Hellings, J)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Denying 230 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/19/2012. (Flores, E)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER for Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Deposition 210 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/19/11. (Verduzco, M)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Granting 203 in Part Plaintiff's All-Inclusive Motion to Compel 203 ; ORDER for Defendants to Provide Further Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, as Instructed by this Order, within Forty-Five (45) Days; ORDER Closing Discovery Except for Limited Purpose, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/30/11. (Verduzco, M)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration 215 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/30/11. (Hellings, J)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER DENYING 184 189 Motion for Court Order Directing Law Librarian to Make Copies, or in the Alternative, Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Plaintiff's Inability to Obtain Copies signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/10/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Continuing Motion for Summary Judgment 173 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/28/11. (Verduzco, M)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 200 Request for Docket Sheet; ORDER for Clerk to Send Docket Sheet to Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/15/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER DENYING 170 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Smart signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/1/2011. (Jessen, A)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING 180 and 190 Plaintiff's Motions for an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Until March 2, 2011 to File One, All-Inclusive Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYIN G 179 and 188 Plaintiff's Motions Seeking New and Complete Service of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER DENYING 178 Plaintiff's Motion for a Stay of the Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines; and ORDER DENYING 186 Plaintiff's Motion Seeking Relief From the Court's Order Dated March 30, 2010, signed by District Judge Raner Collins on 1/28/2011. (Jessen, A)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER re 173 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge John M. Roll on 8/4/2010. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion due by 8/31/2010. (Bradley, A)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER, signed by Chief Judge John M. Roll on 3/30/10: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants and Sever Claims 149 is DENIED without prejudice; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement due April 30, 2010; All pend ing motions to compel and motions relating to discovery 107 , 127 , 129 , 134 , 136 , 137 , 139 , 147 , 148 are DENIED as moot in light of this order; Plaintiff's Motion for an Order for a Pretrial Conference 128 and Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 160 are DENIED as moot in light of this order. (Hellings, J)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING 156 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Schedule, STAYING All Outstanding Deadlines Pending Full Briefing and Determination of 149 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants and Sever Claims signed by Chief Judge John M. Roll on 12/22/2009. (Jessen, A)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER that Plaintiff's 138 Motion for an Order to Prohibit Defendants from Filing Pre-Trial Dispositive Motions, Plaintiff's 143 Request for an Extension of Time, and Plaintiff's 144 Request for an Extension of Time are all DENIED AS MOOT signed by Chief Judge John M. Roll on 10/20/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 141 , signed by Chief Judge John M. Roll on 10/1/09: Defendants' outstanding responses to Plaintiff's discovery are due on October 16, 2009. (Hellings, J)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RELATED CASE ORDER, signed by Chief Judge John M. Roll on 4/8/09. (Gil-Garcia, A)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER of REFERRAL, signed by District Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/12/09. (Hellings, J)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER 98 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DENIED); 91 MOTION to STRIKE (DENIED); 56 MOTION to STRIKE amending (DENIED); 52 Answer to Complaint; 95 MOTION to COMPEL (GRANTED); 101 AMENDED MOTION to SET ASIDE amending (GRANTED); 84 MOTION to SET ASIDE (DISMISSED AS MOOT) and 94 MOTION for SANCTIONS (DENIED), signed by Chief Judge John M. Roll on 2/2/2009. (Response to Plaintiff's Request due by 2/27/2009) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marti v. Padilla, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Lamota Marti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F - Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mcguirt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W S Wadkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.W. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?