December 20, 2011 |
Filing
190
ORDER Denying 186 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/20/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
November 1, 2011 |
Filing
178
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted 170 , Objections, If Any, Due Within Twenty-One Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/31/11. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)(Gonzalez, R)
|
August 3, 2011 |
Filing
173
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Stay as MOOT 156 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Deposition Transcripts 164 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/2/11. (Hellings, J)
|
July 21, 2011 |
Filing
172
ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendants' 170 Motion for Summary Judgment; Response Due within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/21/2011. Response Due by 8/15/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
March 14, 2011 |
Filing
169
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Second Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order 168 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/14/11: The parties are GRANTED up to and including March 30, 2011 in which to file a motion for summary judgment. (Hellings, J)
|
February 1, 2011 |
Filing
167
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 165 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/1/11: The Dispositive Motion deadline EXTENDED to February 28, 2011. (Hellings, J)
|
January 28, 2011 |
Filing
166
ORDER ADOPTING in FULL the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 163 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/28/11: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief and Motion to Dispense of Security Deposit 158 , 159 , filed October 22, 2010 are DENIED. (Hellings, J)
|
December 16, 2010 |
Filing
163
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 158 MOTION to Dispense with the Requirement for Security be DENIED AS MOOT, and 159 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER be DENIED, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/16/2010, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 1/21/2011. (Marrujo, C)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing
161
**VACATED per Order 162 ** FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATION Recommending Plaintiff's Motion For Injunctive Relief Be Denied (Docs. 158 , 159 ), Objections Due Within Twenty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/3/2010. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/27/2010.(Fahrney, E)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
160
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/26/2010 denying 155 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re 149 Order. (Lundstrom, T)
|
October 4, 2010 |
Filing
149
ORDER GRANTING 145 Defendant's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and DENYING 147 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgement, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/1/2010. (DEPOSITION DEADLINE: OCTOBER 20, 2010) (Martin, S)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
144
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 134 141 Motions for Appointment of Counsel; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's 138 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDER DIRECTING Defendant to File a Response within Seven (7) Days to Plaintiff's 140 Motion Requesting an Extension of Time to Obtain Documents from his Central File signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/14/2010. Defendants' Response due by 9/27/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing
142
ORDER DENYING 134 and 141 Plaintiff's Motions to Appoint Counsel; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 138 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; and ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT to File Response to Plaintiff's September 9, 2010 Motion Requesting an Extension of Time to Obtain Documents From His Central File Within Seven (7) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/14/2010. Defendant's Response due by 9/23/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
August 27, 2010 |
Filing
137
ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion/Request to Conduct Plaintiff's Deposition Via Video Conference 136 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/27/10. (Hellings, J)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing
133
ORDER GRANTING 132 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/18/2010. Discovery Cut-Off Date: 9/20/2010. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/29/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
May 7, 2010 |
Filing
131
ORDER DENYING 124 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; and ORDER DISREGARDING AS MOOT 128 Plaintiff's Motion for Transcripts, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/7/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing
120
ORDER DENYING 119 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/7/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
December 29, 2009 |
Filing
117
ORDER DISREGARDING AS MOOT 115 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default and 116 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/29/2009. (Jessen, A)
|
December 4, 2009 |
Filing
111
ORDER DISREGARDING AS MOOT 108 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/3/2009. (Sondheim, M)
|
December 3, 2009 |
Filing
110
ORDER GRANTING 104 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default; ORDER DISREGARDING Plaintiff's 107 Motion for Extension of Time as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/2/2009. Responsive Pleading Deadline: 12/17/2009. (Sondheim, M)
|
August 3, 2009 |
Filing
102
ORDER GRANTING 99 Motion for Entry of Default and DENYING Motion for Entry of Default Judgment; Order Striking Answer 101 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/2/2009. (Figueroa, O)
|
July 23, 2009 |
Filing
98
ORDER ADOPTING 96 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL, and DENYING 85 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/23/2009. (Jessen, A)
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing
91
ORDER GRANTING First Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Findings and Recommendations 90 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/30/09: Objections to F&R ddl EXTENDED to 6/2/2009.(Hellings, J)
|
April 23, 2009 |
Filing
89
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed only against Defendant Wenciker for retaliation in violation of the First Amendment for the destruction of Plaintiff's property;Plainttiff's Fifth and Fourteenth Amendments due process claims be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Plaintiff's request for declaratory relief be DISREGARDED AS UNNECCESSARY; Remaining Defendant's be DISMISSED for Plaintiff's failure to state claim; Remainder of Plaintiff's claims be DISMMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. re 79 Amended Complaint filed by Edward J Mullins; Motion referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 04/22/2009. (Objections to F&R due by 5/18/2009) (Martin, S)
|
April 16, 2009 |
Filing
88
ORDER VACATING 49 Findings and Recommendations, 59 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and 64 Discovery and Scheduling Order; ORDERED that the Court shall issue a revised Scheduling and Discovery Order in due course, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 04/16/2009. (Martin, S)
|
February 18, 2009 |
Filing
86
ORDER MOOTING Plaintiff's 40 Request for Information, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/18/2009. (Sondheim, M)
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing
84
ORDER DISREGARDING 61 , 66 Motions for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/23/2009. (Sondheim, M)
|