Trevino v. Mendoza-Powers

Defendant: Kathy Mendoza-Powers
Petitioner: Arnold Trevino
Case Number: 1:2007cv00169
Filed: January 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Motion To Vacate Judgment, And Vacating Order And Entry Of Judgment Issued March 24, 2010 (Docs. 33 , 34 , 38 ), ORDER Adopting Findings And Recommendation, Granting Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus, Directing Entry Of Judgment For Petitioner, And Granting Stay Of Order For Respondent To File Notice Of Appeal With Ninth Circuit Court Of Appeals (Doc. 30 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/30/2010. (Scrivner, E)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Respondent's 39 Motion for Stay and STAYING Judgment Pending Disposition of 38 Motion to Vacate signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/6/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/4/2010, Recommending that the Petition for re 1 Writ of Habeas Corpus be GRANTED. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. (Objections to F&R due by 3/10/2010)(Figueroa, O)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/10/209 directing Respondent to submit all exhibits attached to Petitioner's State Court Petition attached as Exhibit 3 to 8 Answer to Petition. (Filing Deadline: 12/21/2009).(Lundstrom, T)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO SUBMIT RESPONSIVE PLEADING: MOTION TO DISMISS and NOTICE OF APPEARANCE due by 4/16/2007, ANSWER due by 5/16/2007; Signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/6/2007. (Order served electronically on Attorney General as Directed) (Attachments: # 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (Arellano, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trevino v. Mendoza-Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arnold Trevino
Represented By: Richard Darington Pfeiffer, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Mendoza-Powers
Represented By: Heather M. Heckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?