Derwin Jules Jackson v. W. Sullivan, Et Al.
Plaintiff: Derwin Jules Jackson
Defendant: W Sullivan, T. W. Meadors, J L Cobbs, M. S. Evans, M Stainer, T Traynham, D. Rhods, B Wilson and B - Phillips
Case Number: 1:2007cv00178
Filed: February 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 151 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/27/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Requiring Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Letter 15 ,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/3/19. (Case Management Deadline: 6/21/2019) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER DENYING Defendants' 146 Motion for Alter, Amend, or Clarify Order Enforcing Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/19/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion to Enforce the Parties' Settlement Agreement and Request for Sanctions 137 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/13/2018: The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Hellings, J)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Directing Clerk to Return Money Orders to Plaintiff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/16/2018. (Flores, E)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DIRECTING Personal Service of Civil Subpoena upon Prospective Witness by the United States Marshals Service, without Prepayment of Costs,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/31/2018. (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TENTATIVE PRETRIAL ORDER,signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/29/18. (Case Management Deadline: 2/27/2018, Filing Deadline: 2/16/2018, Motions In Limine filed by 2/13/2018) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Plaintiff, Derwin Jules Jackson, CDCR No. K-85360 to appear for Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2018 at 1:00 pm signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Directing Personal Service of Civil Subpoenas Upon Prospective Witnesses by the United States Marshals Service, without Prepayment of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/10/2018. (Flores, E)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Giving Full Effect to Second Stipulation Regarding Expert Disclosures signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/08/2018. Expert Disclosures due by 1/19/2018; Rebuttal due by 2/16/2018.(Flores, E)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Regarding Witness Fees as to 108 ,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/21/17. (Case Management Deadline: 1/8/2018) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Giving Full Effect to Stipulation Regarding Expert Disclosures 105 ; New Deadline for Providing Expert Disclosures: January 6, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/7/17. (Case Management Deadline: 1/6/2018) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE and ORDER that inmate witness is no longer needed as witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is discharged 98 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Derwin Jules Jackson, CDCR #K-85360, for a Hearing before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, on November 16, 2017 at 9:30am.m, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/12/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/28/17. (Settlement Conference set for 11/16/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER APPROVING 93 Substitution of Attorneys for Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/14/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/5/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Addressing Attorney Appearance 88 ; ORDER for Clerk to Reflect Plaintiff's Pro Se Status on Court Record; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Twenty (20) Days in Which to File Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/28/17. (Hellings, J)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER for Plaintiff to File Status Report Within Fourteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/13/17. (Marrujo, C)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 59 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/15/11: Motion is DENIED, without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' 45 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/13/2011. Referred to Judge Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 2/17/2011. (Flores, E)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Denying 40 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/26/2010. (Marrujo, C)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/7/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derwin Jules Jackson v. W. Sullivan, Et Al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derwin Jules Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. W. Meadors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J L Cobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. S. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Stainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Traynham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Rhods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B - Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?