October 6, 2011 |
Filing
349
FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/6/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
|
July 18, 2011 |
Filing
344
PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/18/2011. (Filing Deadline: 9/20/2011. In Court Hearing set for 10/4/2011 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill). (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing
339
ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 6, 2011. (Lira, I)
|
May 20, 2011 |
Filing
327
STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Extension of Time to File the motion for approval of settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/20/2011. Filing Deadline: 6/6/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing
323
ORDER On Second Stipulation for Extension of Time To File Notice of Settlementsigned by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/4/2011. Stipulated notice of settlement filed no later than 5/12/2011. Motion for approval of settlement filed no later than 5/23/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
321
STIPULATION and ORDER Granting Extension to File Notice of Settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/20/2011. Filing Deadline: 5/3/2011. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing
316
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/28/2011. The Status Conference is RESET for 3/28/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing
307
ORDER ON STIPULATION Continuing Status Conference (Doc. 306 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/10/2010. The Status Conference Re: Class Notice now set for November 15, 2010 is CONTINUED to December 6, 2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (U.S. District Court, Fresno Division) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Arellano, S.)
|
October 13, 2010 |
Filing
305
ORDER ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL 294 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 13, 2010. (Lira, I)
|
August 23, 2010 |
Filing
291
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DECERTIFY CLASS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 23, 2010. (Lira, I)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing
278
ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/23/2010 re 275 Stipulation of Dismissal; Plaintiff, Greg Palla dismissed from action. (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing
270
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 16, 2010. (Lira, I)
|
June 8, 2010 |
Filing
264
STIPULATION and ORDER for 221 Motion for Protective Order re use and dissemination of confidential information signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/8/2010. (Timken, A)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing
262
ORDER RESETTING the scheduling conference currently on calendar for 6/3/2010 and CONTINUING it to 7/22/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/28/2010. (Rooney, M)
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing
245
ORDER ON STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 5, 2010. Motion Hearing currently set for 5/24/2010 has been CONTINUED to 6/8/2010 at 8:30am. (Lira, I)
|
April 27, 2010 |
Filing
243
STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Motion to Amend Class Certification: Reply due by 5/4/2010, Response due by 5/17/2010, Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/27/2010. (Kusamura, W)
|
April 22, 2010 |
Filing
239
STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the hearing date on the motion for protective order. The Motion for Protective Order currently set for 4/30/2010 before Magistrate Judge Beck has been continued to 6/11/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/21/2010. (Timken, A)
|
April 5, 2010 |
Filing
229
STIPULATION and ORDER continuing the Hearing re Motion for Protective Order currently set for 4/16/2010 to 4/30/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/3/2010. (Timken, A)
|
February 16, 2010 |
Filing
219
ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION 170 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 16, 2010. (Lira, I)
|
January 28, 2010 |
Filing
205
ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' WAIVER OF OBJECTION AND TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS' REPLY DEADLINE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 27, 2010. (Lira, I)
|
December 3, 2009 |
Filing
180
ORDER on Defendants' Application for Continuance of Hearing dates on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, Opposition filing ddl 1/14/2010, Reply ddl 1/21/2010 and the Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/3/009. (Kusamura, W)
|
September 25, 2009 |
Filing
166
STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING date to file mandatory joint scheduling conference report from 9/23/2009 to 9/25/2009 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/24/2009. (Hernandez, M)
|
September 10, 2009 |
Filing
163
STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 9/30/2009 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/8/2009. (Hernandez, M)
|
August 20, 2009 |
Filing
161
STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference For Class Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 08/20/09. 159 ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2009 at 09:30AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
August 5, 2009 |
Filing
159
ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 5, 2009. Motion Hearing currently set for 8/12/09 has been VACATED. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2009 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Lira, I)
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing
113
ORDER On Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion (Doc. 73 , 98 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/30/2009. (Plaintiff's Reply due by: 6/11/2009, Defendant's Opposition due by: 6/4/2009, Plaintiff's Renewed Motion due by 5/21/2009, Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 4(LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill)(Scrivner, E)
|
March 30, 2007 |
Filing
12
STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/30/2007. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 23, 2007 |
Filing
8
ORDER extending page limit for defendant Calcot, Ltds motion to dismiss to 35 pages signed by Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/23/3007. (Lucas, G)
|