Fields v. Voss et al
Plaintiff: Allen L. Fields
Defendant: Patrick Daley, Mae O'Brien, W. T. Voss, Linda Clark and Cindy Maynard
Case Number: 1:2007cv00595
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this 1 Action be Dismissed based on Plaintiff's Failure to Obey a Court 34 Order and Failure to Prosecute; Objections, if any, Due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/2010. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 12/2/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to Defendants renewed 33 MOTION to DISMISS, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/2/2010. (Filing Deadline: 10/5/2010.) (Marrujo, C)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER for Defendants Daley, O'Brien, and Maynard to File Answer to Complaint; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/7/2010. Answer to Complaint due by 6/9/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/3/2010, Recommending that Defendants' re 25 Motion to Dismiss be Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Motion referred to Judge Ishii.( Objections to F&R due by 3/9/2010) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Voss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mae O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. T. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen L. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?