Norwood v. Hubbard
Plaintiff: Kenneth Norwood
Defendant: Suzan Hubbard
Case Number: 1:2007cv00889
Filed: June 22, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 8/8/12: Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED as MOOT 183 . This case has been concluded and closed. (Hellings, J)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED AT MOOT, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 06/21/2012. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER GRANTING 177 Motion to Withdraw Bill of Costs: ORDERED Clerk of Court to STRIKE the Bill of Costs 156 from the record, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 05/23/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER After Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/12. (Gonzalez, R)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 2/17/2012. It is ORDERED Granting Plaintiff's and Defendants' motions for a settlement conference. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for a settlement conference at Kern Valley State Prison on March 16, 2012 at 11:00 a.m., 300 West Cecil Avenue, Delano, California 93215. (Fahrney, E)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Defendants Frescura, Gonzales, James Keener, Koehler, Maldonado, Morales, Pascua, Price, Brandon and Canedo from this action and denying 154 Motion for Court to supply Plaintiff with a copy of his sur-reply signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 12/8/2011.(Lundstrom, T)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Respond on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by 9/16/2011; ORDER GRANTING 136 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline to 9/18/2011; ORDER GRANTING 134 Plaintiff's Request for a Telephonic Status Conference; and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Remaining Requests and Motions for Miscellaneous Relief (Docs. 132 , 134 , 135 , 136 ), signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 7/13/2011. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/28/2011 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. (Jessen, A)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting 137 Motion for Further Settlement Conference, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 6/21/11. Second Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2011 at 10:00 AM at Pleasant Valley State Prison, 24863 West Jayne Avenue, Coalinga, CA 93210, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Gonzalez, R)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re 130 Motion, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 5/18/11. (Verduzco, M)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/15/11: Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum 115 is DENIED; Request for In Camera and Under Seal Review of the Subpoenaed Documents is GRANTED. CDCR is directed to provide all documents related to the internal affairs investigation of the events of September 11, 2006 to the Court, along with any specific claims of privilege, by April 15, 2011. (Hellings, J)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 110 Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline to June 18, 2011; ORDER that Plaintiff File an Affidavit or Declaration Pursuant to Rule 56(d) by March 11, 2011; ORDER that the Deadline to File Plaintiff's Response is extended to 4/2/2011 signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/3/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 2/1/11: Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Discovery 105 is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/21/2011 directing service of subpoena duces tecum by U.S. Marshall Service without prepayment of costs.(Lundstrom, T)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 101 Motion to Stay signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 12/22/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING the 97 Stipulation to WithdrawPlaintiffs Motion to Compel; ORDER DENYING As Moot 94 Motion to Compel, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 12/14/2010. (Marrujo, C)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re 90 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 12/2/2010. Plaintiff is ordered to file a response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment no later than 1/1/2011. (Jessen, A)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Set Aside Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Reprocess a New Set fo 25 Interrogatories and Serve an Additional 30 Interrogatories on Defendant Carter signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 11/17/2010. (Flores, E)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 11/3/2010. Blank subpoenas and USM-285 Form enclosed.(Verduzco, M)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING 79 Defendant Carter's Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 10/12/2010. (Case Management Deadline: 11/12/2010) (Martin, S)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 9/17/2010. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Monday, September 20, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. is RESET for Wednesday, September 22, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. (Bradley, A)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 9/13/2010. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 70 "Motion Requesting that Defendant Covarrubias be Dismissed Immediately from This Lawsuit" is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Covarrubias only are dismissed without prejudice from this action. (Bradley, A)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING 67 Motion for the Court to Please Send Plaintiff 2 Subpoena Duces Tecum Documents signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 7/30/2010. (Marrujo, C)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 7/21/2010. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for an order allowing him to have "priority law library access" at the Pleasant Valley State Prison from the present date until September 30, 2010 (Doc. 65 ) is DENIED. (Scrivner, E)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 63 Motion to re-schedule disposition dates signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 7/19/2010. (Marrujo, C)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 4/23/2010. Settlement Conference set for 6/28/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston at Pleasant Valley State Prison, 24863 West Jayne Avenue, Coalinga, California 93210; The proceedings are stayed until June 30, 2010. (Verduzco, M)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/9/2010. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That Defendants 46 Motion for a Continuance of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, April 6, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. Arizona time. (Bradley, A)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 2/22/2010. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2010 at 01:30 PM Arizona Time before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. (Sant Agata, S)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/7/2009, The Court advises the parties that the Court is conducting statutory screening.The matter will proceed following the issuance of the statutory screening order. (Figueroa, O)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SUBMIT APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS OR PAY FILING FEE by 7/30/2007, signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 06/26/2007. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Form)(Esteves, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwood v. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzan Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?