Scott v. Mayberg et al
Plaintiff: Henry C. Scott
Defendant: Stephen Mayberg, Ben McClain, Gary Renzaglia, Linda Clark and Rocky Spurgeon
Case Number: 1:2007cv00897
Filed: June 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES; ORDER GRANTING 53 Defendants' Request for Substitution of Defendant; ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 51 Defendants' Notice of Filing Request for Scheduling Order and Consolidation Regarding Computer Claims; and ORDER GRANTING 50 , 52 , 54 Defendants' Motions for Extensions of Time to Disclose Expert Witnesses signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 12/15/2014. Lead Case: 1:06-cv-01801-BLW-LMB. Member Case: 1:07-cv-00897-BLW. (Jessen, A)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 10/16/2013. Jack Carter added. Andrew Beard terminated from Action.(Flores, E)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Order Substituting Audrey King and Andrew Beard as Defendants in this Action and Terminating All Claims Against All Other Defendants; Case No. 1:07-cv-00897-BLW Shall be Severed From Case No. 1:06-cv-01801-BLW-LMB and R EOPENED; All further submissions must be filed in Plaintiff's Individual Case; Counsel for Defendants Shall Notify the Court Within Ten (10) Days Whether They Will Waive Service on Behalf of Defendants King and Beard and Within Twenty-One (21) Days, the Parties Shall Submit Proposed Scheduling Orders, signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 8/1/2013. signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 8/1/2013. (Jessen, A)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER adopting 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Chief Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 10/29/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPORT and RECOMMENDATION, signed by Magistrate Judge Larry M. Boyle on 7/22/10: Recommending that Plaintiff DeBerry's Motion for Summary Judgment 30 be DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff Carmony's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Re lief 48 be DENIED without prejudice, and instead be addressed in the Triage Conference; The actions filed by Raymond Amadeo, Don D. McNeal and Fred Scott be DISMISSED without prejudice; In the event Plaintiff Rick Gonzales fails to file an Amended Complaint by August 20, 2010, his original Complaint should be STAYED pending further notice. Objections to R&R due by 8/12/2010. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Mayberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Mayberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Renzaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Spurgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?