Manuel v. Powers et al
Plaintiff: |
Lonnie Lee Manuel |
Defendant: |
K. Mandoza Powers, P. Baltierrez and Suryadevara |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv00968 |
Filed: |
July 6, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Fresno Office |
County: |
Kings |
Presiding Judge: |
Anthony W. Ishii |
Presiding Judge: |
Sandra M. Snyder |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 23, 2010 |
Filing
42
ORDER signed by District Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/22/2010. (Verduzco, M)
|
March 4, 2010 |
Filing
38
ORDER, signed by District Judge Neil V. Wake on 3/4/2010. It is ORDERED, that this action will be terminated by entry of judgment for Plaintiff in the amount of $200 on or after July 16, 2010, unless a stipulation for dismissal or other disposition is received before then. It is further ORDERED vacating the Pretrial Conference set March 19, 2010.(Scrivner, E)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing
36
ORDER Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference, signed by District Judge Neil V. Wake on 02/03/2010. (***VACATED; pursuant to ORDER 38 ***Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2010 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Neil V. Wake) (Martin, S)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by District Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/22/2009. Within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the$350.00 balance of the filing fee or show good cause why he is unable to do so. If Plaintiff fails, wi thin 30 days from the filing date of this Order, either to pay the $350.00 balance of the filing fee or to show good cause why he is unable to pay thebalance of the filing fee, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice or further notice. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing anApplication to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas) as a guideline in the event thatPlaintiff seeks to show good cause why he is unable to pay the filing fee.( Filing Deadline: 11/25/2009.)(Sondheim, M)
|
October 14, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER, signed by District Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/13/2009. Plaintiff and defense counsel shall each contact chambers at 602-322-7640 at the scheduled time and the Court will arrange a conference call. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/22/2009 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Neil V. Wake) (Scrivner, E)
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing
27
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for Failure to Comply With the Rules of the Court and the 23 Further Scheduling Order Filed July 16, 2009; ORDER DENYING 26 Plaintiff's Request to Court for Attorney, signed by District Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/28/2009. Show Cause Response due by 10/9/2009. (Jessen, A)
|
July 11, 2007 |
Filing
6
FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 07/11/2007. (Esteves, C)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?