Howard v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Clarence E. Howard
Defendant: W.J. Sullivan, Kamel and Hazel
Case Number: 1:2007cv00988
Filed: July 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant Kamel's 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/19/2010. Referred to Judge Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 12/23/2010. (Flores, E)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Surreply signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/16/2010. (Flores, E)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff To File Opposition Or Statement Of Non-Opposition To Defendant Kamel's Motion To Dismiss Within Thirty Days (Doc. 40 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/1/2010. (Opposition/Non-Opposition Deadline: 7/6/2010)(Scrivner, E)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and DISMISSING Certain Claims From 31 Second Amended Complaint signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/10/2009. (Bradley, A)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action Proceed on 31 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Against Defendant Kamel and that Plaintiff's Equal Protection Claim and State Law Tort Claims be DISMISSED, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/9/2009. Referred to Judge Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 11/12/2009. (Jessen, A)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting First Motion To Extend Time To File Amended Complaint 29 , 30-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/7/2009. (Amended Complaint due by 5/14/2009) (Scrivner, E)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief BE DENIED signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/21/07. Motion referred to Judge Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 8/28/2007. (Verduzco, M)
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 07/12/2007. (Esteves, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence E. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?