Enns et al v. Flores et al
Plaintiff: Earl L. Enns, Enns Pontiac, Buick, & GMC, Harold J. Enns, Esther J. Enns and Patricia L. Enns
Defendant: Orelia Flores, Mabel Lee, Michelle Lua and Sieto Yamaguchi
Case Number: 1:2007cv01043
Filed: July 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 430 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Approving Settlement Agreement and Dismissing Case with Prejudice (Doc. 424). Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 15 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/2014. (Herman, H)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER Continuing the Settlement Conference: 4/24/2014 Court ordered Defendants to file oppositions, if any, to Plaintiffs' request for a continuance (on 4/18/2014). No oppositions were filed and Plaintiffs' counsel confirmed with the Court that no party is opposed to the motion. Accordingly, for good cause being shown and the lack of opposition, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Ex Parte request to continue the settlement conference as follows: Settlement Conference set for 4/29/20 14 is CONTINUED to Thursday, May 29, 2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. No later than May 22, 2014, each party shall submit directly to Judge McAuliffe's chambers at bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov, a confidential settlement conference statement. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/25/2014. (Herman, H)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Request to Continue the Settlement Conference and ORDERING Defendants to Submit Oppositions, IF ANY, by 3:00PM April 25, 2014, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/24/2014. (Herman, H)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 414 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Parties' Request to Vacate Remaininng Scheduling Order Deadlines in Order to Finalize Settlement and Setting Settlement Conference: Good cause appearing therefore, IT IS SO ORDERED that the Scheduling Order Deadlines be vacated, so parties can finalize settlement. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for Tuesday, April 29, 2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. No later than 4/18/2014, each party shall submit directly to Judge McAuliffe's chambers at bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov, a confidential settlement conference statement. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/2014. (Herman, H)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER for Further Status Report, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/13/2014.(Case Management Deadline: 3/31/2014) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER to Reset Pretrial Conference and Trial, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/19/2013. (Pretrial Conference RESET for 4/14/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, and Jury Trial RESET for 6/10/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.)(Gaumnitz, R)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 408 STIPULATION And ORDER For Substitution Of Party, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/10/2013. Constance Yamaguchi and Dana K. Yamaguchi added. Sachiko Yamaguchi (as administrator to The Estate of Sieto Yamaguchi), Sachiko Yamagu chi (as administrator to The Estate of Sieto Yamaguchi), Sachiko Yamaguchi (as administrator to The Estate of Sieto Yamaguchi), Sachiko Yamaguchi (as administrator to The Estate of Sieto Yamaguchi), Sachiko Yamaguchi (as administrator to The Estate of Sieto Yamaguchi) and Sachiko Yamaguchi (as administrator to The Estate of Sieto Yamaguchi) terminated.(Fahrney, E)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 405 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Continuance of Scheduling Order Deadlines in Order to Attend Further Mediation: Expert Witnesses Disclosure by 7/29/2013. Expert Rebuttal Disclosure and Expert Supplemental by 8/26/2013. Expert Discovery Cut-Off by 10/14/2013. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/4/2013 and heard by 12/5/2013. Settlement Conference: Not set. JURY TRIAL set for 4/22/2014 (was 1/20/2014) at 08:30 AM and PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 1/23/2014 (was 10/25/2013) at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/2/2013. (Herman, H)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 400 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding continuance of Scheduling Order Deadlines in Order to Attend further mediation: Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 1/20/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/1/2012. (Kusamura, W)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER on Reconsideration of Motion to Compel 386 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/27/12: This Court DENIES Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration and request for sanctions and reasonable expenses. (Hellings, J)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER on Motion to Filee a Counterclaim [Doc. 339, 352, 356]: the Court Grants Pearce's Motion for Leave to File a Counterlaim. (Doc. 339). Pearce shall file the counterclaim within 15 days of the service of this order. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/23/2011. (Herman, H)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER Granting Motion to Compel Further Responses to Deposition Questions 344 . signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/9/2011. (Herman, H)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 336 STIPULATION to Extend the Martinez's Time to Respond to the Lee Parties' Cross-Claims; ORDER - Patty and Louie Martinez Responses due 11/10/2011. NOTE: this document pertains to documents 290 and 324 , which was received on 11/15/2011 for the courts consideration. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/2011. (Herman, H)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Continuance of Scheduling Order Deadlines Due to Addition of New Parties, New Counter-Claims, New Cross-Claims, and Need For Settlement Discussion, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/21/2011. (D iscovery due by 8/1/2012; Case Management Deadline: 8/31/2012; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 10/18/2012; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/3/2012; Dispositive Motions filed by 11/5/2012; Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Jury Trial set for 3/12/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.) (Marrujo, C)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 305 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Enn's Time to Respond to Sachiko Yamaguchi, as Administrator to the Estate of Sieto Yamaguchi's Counterclaims: Response by 10/26/2011. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/19/2011. (Herman, H)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER re: defendants' Motions to Dismiss second Amended Complaint, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/8/2011. (Kusamura, W)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/29/2011. (Kusamura, W)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER Regarding Request for Clarification of Court's July 13, 2011 245 Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Pearce's Responses and Documents Related to Enns' Discovery Request Propounded on Pearce, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/9/2011. Defendant Pearce is Ordered to Respond and to Produce Responsive Documents Within Seven (7) Days of the Date of This Order. (Marrujo, C)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER regarding 183 Motion to Compel and 205 , 224 Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/12/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/11/2011 granting 170 , 225 Motions for Protective Order and denying 186 Motion to Compel. (Lundstrom, T)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion For Continuance of Scheduling Order Deadlines, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/16/2011. (Expert Discovery disclosure 11/1/2011, Rebuttal/Supplemental Expert Disclosure due 12/1/2011, Discovery Cut-off i ncluding Experts 1/3/2012, Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 1/18/2012, Non-Dispositive Motion Hearing set 2/24/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck, Dispositive Motions filed by 2/3/2012, Dispositive Motion Hea ring date set 3/5/2012 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver Wanger, Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, and Court Trial set for 5/22/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. There will be no further continuances granted.)(Gaumnitz, R)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Regarding Court's April 20, 2011 Memorandum Decision Regarding 123 Motion to Amend signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/2/2011. (Plaintiffs Amended Complaint due 5/10/2011) (Figueroa, O)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM Decision Regarding 124 Motion to Amend signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/20/2011. (Proposed Order Consistent with Memorandum Decision Deadline: 4/27/2011) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enns et al v. Flores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl L. Enns
Represented By: Jeffery L Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enns Pontiac, Buick, & GMC
Represented By: Jeffery L Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold J. Enns
Represented By: Jeffery L Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther J. Enns
Represented By: Jeffery L Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia L. Enns
Represented By: Jeffery L Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orelia Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mabel Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sieto Yamaguchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?