Simmons v. Hedgpeth
Petitioner: Christopher I. Simmons
Respondent: Anthony Hedgpeth
Case Number: 1:2007cv01058
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER ADOPTING 224 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING Defendant Akanno's 179 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER re 243 Defendants' Request for Clarification Filed 11/22/2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/27/17. (Gonzalez, R)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants Grissom, Keiley, Rients, and St. Lucia's 172 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/21/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Doe Defendants From Action, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/15/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 179 Defendant Dr. Akanno's Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED re 45 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/19/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Doe Defendants Should Not Be Dismissed From the Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/14/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations and Dismissing Defendants Sauceda, Ellstrom and Rufino, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/31/16. (Verduzco, M)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 193 Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/03/2016. (Flores, E)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Dismissal, without Prejudice, of Defendants Sauceda, Ellstrom, and Rufino Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/6/16. Referred to Judge Drozd; 30-day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions against Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/3/16. (Verduzco, M)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 174 Motion for Court Order Granting Access to Inmate Witnesses, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/2/16. (Verduzco, M)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Granting 171 Defendants' Motion to Seal Documents and Issue of Protective Order Precluding Plaintiff from Using Information or Documentation for Any Purpose, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/10/16. (Verduzco, M)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline and Motions to Amend re 142 , 150 , 157 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/29/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 160 Motion for Extension of Time to File A Dispositive Motion and Respond to Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/22/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER directing Defendants to file a response to 142 MOTION for EXTENSION of Discovery deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/29/2015. (Filing Deadline: 1/19/2016). (Lundstrom, T)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Rufino Should Not Be Dismissed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M) 134 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/3/15: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order 139 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/15: Dispositive Motion filing deadline set for 12/28/2015. (Hellings, J)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 132 Motion for Reconsideration and 133 Motion for Stay of Proceedings, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/8/15. (Verduzco, M)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel 126 ; Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Proceedings 125 , and Extending the Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines re 130 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/15. Discovery due by 10/28/2015, Dispositive Motions filed by 11/28/2015. (Gonzalez, R)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Directing Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Proceedings and Opposition to Motion to Compel 125 , 127 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/24/15: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Re-Send Court's Second Order Directing Service by the United States Marshals Service Without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/2015. (Marrujo, C)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER EXTENDING Discovery and Scheduilng Deadlines to Defendant Keiley, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/16/15. (Marrujo, C)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION and DENYING Defendant Keiley's Motion to Dismiss 93 , 104 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/9/15: Plaintiff's request for imposition of sanctions is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER STAYING Proceedings in This Matter Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Medical Condition and Directing Defense Counsel to Provide a Status Report Within Thirty Days 105 , 107 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/15. (Hellings, J)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants' 93 Motion to Dismiss the 45 First Amended Complaint be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/22/2014. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 1/26/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 94 Defendant Keiley's Request for a Protective Order Staying Discovery Until After Resolution of the Pending Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/12/2014. (Jessen, A)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Directing Defendants to File a Further Response to Complaint Following Denial of Motion to Dismiss re 87 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/01/14. Twenty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Adopting 85 Findings and Recommendation, Denying Defendants' 85 Motion to Dismiss, and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/27/14. (Gonzalez, R)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Defendants' 67 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/22/14. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 20-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Sauceda Should Not Be Dismissed Pursuant to Rule 4(M), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/19/14: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Ellstrom Should Not Be Dismissed Pursuant to Rule 4(M), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/14: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Second Motion to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint 62 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/14: Deadline EXTENDED to February 14, 2014. (Hellings, J)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/9/13. This action shall proceed as one for damages against Defendants Grissom, Keiley, St. Lucia, Ellstrom, Rients, Sauceda, Akanno, Rufino and Does #1-10 (nurses); Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Anthony Hedgpeth, Nate Dill, Jr., and Rubles are dismissed for failure to state a claim. (Verduzco, M)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants re 47 , 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 4/23/13. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Thirty-Day Objection Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Consolidation signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 12/06/2010. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher I. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?