Medlock v. Taco Bell Corp., et al.
Plaintiff: Sandrika Medlock
Defendant: Taco Bell Corp., Taco Bell of America, Inc., Taco Bell Foundation, Inc., Northern California Taco Bell Association, Inc., Taco Bell, Yum!, Yum! Brands and Yum Brands, Inc
Case Number: 1:2007cv01314
Filed: September 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER RE Stipulation for SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 780 AMENDED JUDGMENT. (Lundstrom, T)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER Setting a Supplemental Briefing Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/16/2016. (Kusamura, W)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing hearing on Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs and Leave to Depose Defendants' Retained Expert; ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Defer Ruling on Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2016. (Kusamura, W)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/8/2016. (Hernandez, M)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff Leyva's Individual Claims With Prejudice 736 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/29/16. (Hellings, J)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ORDER DENYING 685 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/14/2016. (Hernandez, M)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER AMENDING CAPTION OF ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/11/2016. (Kusamura, W)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO NOTICE THEIR RULE 50(b) MOTION PURSUANT TO THE LOCAL RULES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/2016. (Hernandez, M)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER SETTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law hearing is set for March 11, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/9/2016. (Hernandez, M)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER RE DAMAGES. For the reasons stated, plaintiffs request to modify jury instruction no. 35 is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/8/2016. (Hernandez, M)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ORDER REGARDING JUROR FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/2016. (Hernandez, M)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO DAMAGES TESTIMONY BY DR. JONATHAN WALKER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/2/2016. (Kusamura, W)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER of Dismissal Re Plaintiff Kevin Taylor signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/22/2016. Kevin Taylor terminated.(Flores, E)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF NARANJO'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/19/2016. (Hernandez, M)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER Requiring Parties to File Dispositional Documents Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/17/2016. (Jessen, A)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF LORAINE NARANJO TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/16/2016. (Hernandez, M)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF PARTIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/12/2016. (Hernandez, M)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM PARAGRAPH XIV.E OF THE SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER TO INCREASE THE NUMBER OF CONTESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/11/2016. (Hernandez, M)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DR. DANNA MOORE'S NOVEMBER 18, 2015 DECLARATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/4/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL ORDER 592 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/29/2016. (Kusamura, W)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXTENDING 10-PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/27/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO EXTEND 25 PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/19/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER Requiring Parties to File Dispositional Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/5/16: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 551 DEFENDANT'S Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony of Michael O'Brien. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2015. (Hernandez, M)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER RE SCHEDULING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2015. (Hernandez, M)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER DENYING 546 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Danna Moore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2015. (Hernandez, M)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER Setting Daubert Hearing for 12/9/2015 at 02:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/2/2015. (Kusamura, W)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER on Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. The hearing on the motions in limine remains on January 22, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/9/2015. (Hernandez, M)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 545 STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order and Continue the Pretrial Statement deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2015. (Kusamura, W)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/3/2015. (Hernandez, M)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 537 STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order and Continue Pretrial deadlines, Pretrial Conference is now set for 1/22/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/10/2015. (Kusamura, W)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER Approving Stipulated Class Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2015. (Kusamura, W)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Order DENYING Defendants' 523 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/2015. (Figueroa, O)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING [500, 501] Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Court's Order on Class Certification; Order partially GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/16/2014. (Hernandez, M)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER re setting a Scheduling Conference for 12/10/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2014. (Hernandez, M)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause Hearing. The show cause hearing scheduled for 9/24/2014 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/22/2014. (Hernandez, M)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Strike; Defendants Motion to Dismiss is partially granted; Defendants Motion to Alter or Amend partially granted. Defendants counsel shall appear in person for a show cause hearing on 9/24/2014 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2014. (Hernandez, M)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause and vacating 9/3/2014 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2014. (Hernandez, M)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/15/2014 re Motions to Compel and setting a Show Cause Hearing set for 9/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Kusamura, W)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER STIRKING 460 462 Motions to Compel - Based on the foregoing, defendant's motions to compel responses from Sandrika Medlock and Lisa Hardiman are hereby withdrawn from the record. These two matters are taken off calendar for August 13, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/6/2014. (Hernandez, M)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Order re Defendants' Ex Parte Application to continue hearing date on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/25/2014. (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summa ry Judgment filed by 6/30/2014; Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 7/11/2014; Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 8/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Defendant's Motion to Compel Hearing set for 8/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Figueroa, O)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 401 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/22/2014. (Kusamura, W)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 410 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Status Conference from 5/5/2014 to 5/21/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/29/2014. (Hernandez, M)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 394 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Further Status/Scheduling Conference from 4/1/2014 to 5/5/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2014. (Hernandez, M)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER setting further Status Conference for 1/9/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2013. (Hernandez, M)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER approving stipulated class notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/10/2013. (Hernandez, M)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER requiring parties to submit status report regarding class notice. The parties written response to the Court's order shall be filed by December 10, 2013 at NOON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2013. (Hernandez, M)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Order re Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/4/2013. (Stipulation regarding the content of the Class Action Deadline: 12/6/2013) (Figueroa, O)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER SETTING FURTHER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 11/4/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. On or about 10/28/2013 the parties shall file a joint scheduling report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2013. (Hernandez, M)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 377 STIPULATION and ORDER to VACATE EVIDENTIARY HEARING set for 9/20/2013 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/19/2013. (Hernandez, M)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing (Doc. 372 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/14/2013. The Evidentiary Hearing now set for 8/16/2013 at 9:30 AM is CONTINUED to 9/20/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Arellano, S.)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER following further Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 6/10/2013. (Hernandez, M)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER TO DENY RECONSIDERATION OF CLASS CERTIFICATION 347 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 17, 2013. (Munoz, I)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER ADOPTING the Findings and Recommendations, document 341 , re class certification. Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/2/2013. (Rooney, M)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification - referred to Judge O'Neill. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/26/2012. (Hernandez, M)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER Striking Defendants' 338 Notice of New Authority, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/16/12. (Verduzco, M)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Request for Consent ORDER and Order Granting Withdrawal of Defendants' Local Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/21/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER Re: STIPULATION to continue class certification hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/6/2012.( Motion for Class Certification Hearing previously set for 9/14/2012 has been CONTINUED to 10/5/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 284 Motion to Consolidate as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/30/2012. Stipulation Deadline: 8/31/2012. (Figueroa, O)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiffs' 299 Redacted Filing; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiffs to Submit Documents for Filing and Sealing, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/19/2012. Five Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' 298 Request to Seal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/17/2012. (The Court GRANTS the request as to (1) Exhibits C and D to the Declaration of David Cheng; and (2 ) the portions of the Declaration of Robert Fountain that contain identifying employee information. Plaintiffs SHALL file redacted versions consistent with this Order and submit unredacted versions to the Court for sealing. As to the remaining documents, the Court will allow Taco Bell to submit briefing in support of the request to seal within 7 days of the date of service of this order.)(Gaumnitz, R)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER regarding Plaintffs' Motion for Class Certification and Taco Bell's Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Report of James Lackritz, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/29/2011. (Kusamura, W)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM DECISION RE: Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class 185 and Defendants' Motion to Exclude Declaration and Report of James Lackritz 221 , signed by District Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/26/2011. (Kusamura, W)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER Granting Defendants Taco Bell Corp.'s and Taco Bell of America, Inc.'s Motion to Stay 250 , signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/9/11. Status Conference set for 8/20/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Gonzalez, R)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER re: Defendants' Motion to Stay 250 , signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/30/2011. (Kusamura, W)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Motion to Stay Hearing currently set for 8/8/2011 to 8/22/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/20/2011. (Kusamura, W)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' 223 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Exceed Page Limit signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/9/2011. (Figueroa, O)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Re STIPULATION to Continue Class Certification Briefing, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/6/2011. (Plaintiffs Reply in response to Defendants Opposition to the Motion for Class Certification is continued from 5/20/2011 to 5/27/2011; The hearing on the Motion for Class Certification shall remain as calendared for 6/6/2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Plaintiff's 210 Amended Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Complaint signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/3/2011. ( Proposed Order Consistent with Memorandum Decision Deadline: 5/10/2011)(Figueroa, O)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER GRANTING Leave to Exceed Page Limits, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/11/2011. (Kusamura, W)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER GRANTING 211 Plaintiff's Amended Ex Parte Application for Order to Shorten Notice Period for Amended Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/23/2011. Defendants' Opposition may be filed by 4/3/2011. Plaintiffs' Reply may be filed by 4/7/2011. (Jessen, A)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER re: STIPULATION to Continue Class Certification Friefing and hearing Dates: Replies due by 4/22/2011, Responses due by 5/20/2011, Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/23/2011. (Kusamura, W)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION and ORDER continue the Class Certification breifing and hearing dates (Defendants Replies due 3/25/2011, Plaintiff's Responses due 4/29/2011, Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/1/2011. (Kusamura, W)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Re: Request to Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/25/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER Re Stipulation Re Leyva Deposition Continuance To January 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/8/2010. (Case Management Deadline: 1/14/2011)(Fahrney, E)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/2/2010 re 179 Stipulation re Leyva Deposition continuance and discovery cut-off. (Lundstrom, T)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER To Continue Briefing Deadlines And Hearing Re Class Certification, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/26/2010. ( Motions to be filed by 12/30/2010, Oppositions due by 3/4/2011, Replies due by 4/8/2011, and Motions Re: Class Certification set for hearing 5/9/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER re 171 Stipulation re Leyva Deposition and Discovery Cut-Off signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/8/2010. Defendants may depose Plaintiff Leyva for the remaining time permitted under Rule 30(d)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure after the discovery cut-off date of June 24, 2010. This deposition shall be completed no later than August 13, 2010.(Bradley, A)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER And Joint STIPULATION Re Vacation Claim, Discovery Related To Yum! Brands, Inc., And Dismissal of Yum! Brands, Inc., signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/30/2010. It is ORDERED: Defendant Yum! Brands, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice from the above-entitled action. Each party shall bear its own fees and expenses in connection with the dismissal.(Scrivner, E)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION to Continue Deadline Whether Yum! Brands, Inc. is a Proper Party Defendant, Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/23/2010. (Arellano, S.)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER To Continue Deadline Whether Yum! Brands, Inc. Is a Proper Party Defendant, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/22/2010. (Deadline for Defendants to file any dispositive motion on the issue stated is continued from 1/29/2010 to 3/1/2010.) (Gaumnitz, R)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 135 Motion to Compel Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/23/2009. (Esteves, C)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Continuing Deadlines Re Whether Yum! Brands, Inc. is a Proper Party Defendant, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/21/2009. Discovery due by 12/28/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2010. (Sondheim, M)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying as moot 123 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/21/2009. (Lundstrom, T)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 JOINT STIPULATION And ORDER To Permit Taking Of Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Of Defendant Yum! Brands, Inc. After October 26, 2009 Discovery Cut-Off, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/13/2009. (Scrivner, E)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER amending the previous scheduling order, document 117 ; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/2/2009. (Rooney, M)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ON AMENDED STIPULATION RE PRODUCTION OF THE NAMES, ADDRESSES AND TELEPHONE NUMBERS OF PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/19/2009. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medlock v. Taco Bell Corp., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandrika Medlock
Represented By: Joseph Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Bell Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Bell of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Bell Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern California Taco Bell Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yum!
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yum! Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yum Brands, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?