July 11, 2017 |
Filing
814
ORDER RE Stipulation for SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
|
July 15, 2016 |
Filing
780
AMENDED JUDGMENT. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Filing
774
ORDER Setting a Supplemental Briefing Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/16/2016. (Kusamura, W)
|
June 7, 2016 |
Filing
764
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing hearing on Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs and Leave to Depose Defendants' Retained Expert; ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Defer Ruling on Motion for Attorney Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2016. (Kusamura, W)
|
April 8, 2016 |
Filing
743
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/8/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
737
ORDER DISMISSING Plaintiff Leyva's Individual Claims With Prejudice 736 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/29/16. (Hellings, J)
|
March 14, 2016 |
Filing
713
ORDER DENYING 685 Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/14/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 11, 2016 |
Filing
707
ORDER AMENDING CAPTION OF ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/11/2016. (Kusamura, W)
|
March 10, 2016 |
Filing
698
ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO NOTICE THEIR RULE 50(b) MOTION PURSUANT TO THE LOCAL RULES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 9, 2016 |
Filing
692
ORDER SETTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law hearing is set for March 11, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/9/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 8, 2016 |
Filing
690
ORDER RE DAMAGES. For the reasons stated, plaintiffs request to modify jury instruction no. 35 is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/8/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 4, 2016 |
Filing
674
ORDER REGARDING JUROR FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/4/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
March 2, 2016 |
Filing
669
ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO DAMAGES TESTIMONY BY DR. JONATHAN WALKER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/2/2016. (Kusamura, W)
|
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
656
ORDER of Dismissal Re Plaintiff Kevin Taylor signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/22/2016. Kevin Taylor terminated.(Flores, E)
|
February 19, 2016 |
Filing
652
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF NARANJO'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/19/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
648
ORDER Requiring Parties to File Dispositional Documents Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/17/2016. (Jessen, A)
|
February 17, 2016 |
Filing
646
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF LORAINE NARANJO TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/16/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 12, 2016 |
Filing
624
ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF PARTIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/12/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 11, 2016 |
Filing
619
ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM PARAGRAPH XIV.E OF THE SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER TO INCREASE THE NUMBER OF CONTESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/11/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 4, 2016 |
Filing
610
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DR. DANNA MOORE'S NOVEMBER 18, 2015 DECLARATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/4/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
602
ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL ORDER 592 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/29/2016. (Kusamura, W)
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing
600
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXTENDING 10-PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/27/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing
587
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO EXTEND 25 PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/19/2016. (Hernandez, M)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing
582
ORDER Requiring Parties to File Dispositional Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/5/16: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing
574
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 551 DEFENDANT'S Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony of Michael O'Brien. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2015. (Hernandez, M)
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing
571
ORDER RE SCHEDULING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2015. (Hernandez, M)
|
December 9, 2015 |
Filing
569
ORDER DENYING 546 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Danna Moore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2015. (Hernandez, M)
|
December 3, 2015 |
Filing
567
ORDER Setting Daubert Hearing for 12/9/2015 at 02:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/2/2015. (Kusamura, W)
|
November 9, 2015 |
Filing
559
ORDER on Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. The hearing on the motions in limine remains on January 22, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/9/2015. (Hernandez, M)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
545
STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order and Continue the Pretrial Statement deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2015. (Kusamura, W)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing
541
ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/3/2015. (Hernandez, M)
|
June 10, 2015 |
Filing
537
STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order and Continue Pretrial deadlines, Pretrial Conference is now set for 1/22/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/10/2015. (Kusamura, W)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
535
ORDER Approving Stipulated Class Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2015. (Kusamura, W)
|
February 26, 2015 |
Filing
529
Order DENYING Defendants' 523 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/2015. (Figueroa, O)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
520
ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING [500, 501] Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Court's Order on Class Certification; Order partially GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/16/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
November 14, 2014 |
Filing
511
ORDER re setting a Scheduling Conference for 12/10/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
September 22, 2014 |
Filing
490
ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause Hearing. The show cause hearing scheduled for 9/24/2014 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/22/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
August 29, 2014 |
Filing
487
ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Strike; Defendants Motion to Dismiss is partially granted; Defendants Motion to Alter or Amend partially granted. Defendants counsel shall appear in person for a show cause hearing on 9/24/2014 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/29/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
August 28, 2014 |
Filing
485
ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause and vacating 9/3/2014 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
August 15, 2014 |
Filing
483
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/15/2014 re Motions to Compel and setting a Show Cause Hearing set for 9/3/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Kusamura, W)
|
August 6, 2014 |
Filing
476
ORDER STIRKING 460 462 Motions to Compel - Based on the foregoing, defendant's motions to compel responses from Sandrika Medlock and Lisa Hardiman are hereby withdrawn from the record. These two matters are taken off calendar for August 13, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/6/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing
430
Order re Defendants' Ex Parte Application to continue hearing date on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/25/2014. (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summa ry Judgment filed by 6/30/2014; Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by 7/11/2014; Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 8/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; Defendant's Motion to Compel Hearing set for 8/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Figueroa, O)
|
May 22, 2014 |
Filing
421
ORDER DENYING Defendant's 401 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/22/2014. (Kusamura, W)
|
April 30, 2014 |
Filing
410
STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Status Conference from 5/5/2014 to 5/21/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/29/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
February 25, 2014 |
Filing
394
STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Further Status/Scheduling Conference from 4/1/2014 to 5/5/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2014. (Hernandez, M)
|
December 12, 2013 |
Filing
390
ORDER setting further Status Conference for 1/9/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2013. (Hernandez, M)
|
December 11, 2013 |
Filing
389
ORDER approving stipulated class notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/10/2013. (Hernandez, M)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing
386
ORDER requiring parties to submit status report regarding class notice. The parties written response to the Court's order shall be filed by December 10, 2013 at NOON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2013. (Hernandez, M)
|
November 4, 2013 |
Filing
384
Order re Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/4/2013. (Stipulation regarding the content of the Class Action Deadline: 12/6/2013) (Figueroa, O)
|
October 16, 2013 |
Filing
379
ORDER SETTING FURTHER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 11/4/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. On or about 10/28/2013 the parties shall file a joint scheduling report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2013. (Hernandez, M)
|
September 19, 2013 |
Filing
377
STIPULATION and ORDER to VACATE EVIDENTIARY HEARING set for 9/20/2013 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/19/2013. (Hernandez, M)
|
August 14, 2013 |
Filing
373
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing (Doc. 372 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/14/2013. The Evidentiary Hearing now set for 8/16/2013 at 9:30 AM is CONTINUED to 9/20/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Arellano, S.)
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing
364
ORDER following further Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 6/10/2013. (Hernandez, M)
|
January 17, 2013 |
Filing
348
ORDER TO DENY RECONSIDERATION OF CLASS CERTIFICATION 347 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 17, 2013. (Munoz, I)
|
January 2, 2013 |
Filing
344
ORDER ADOPTING the Findings and Recommendations, document 341 , re class certification. Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/2/2013. (Rooney, M)
|
November 27, 2012 |
Filing
341
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification - referred to Judge O'Neill. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/26/2012. (Hernandez, M)
|
November 16, 2012 |
Filing
339
ORDER Striking Defendants' 338 Notice of New Authority, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/16/12. (Verduzco, M)
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing
327
Request for Consent ORDER and Order Granting Withdrawal of Defendants' Local Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/21/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing
322
ORDER Re: STIPULATION to continue class certification hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/6/2012.( Motion for Class Certification Hearing previously set for 9/14/2012 has been CONTINUED to 10/5/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck) (Figueroa, O)
|
July 30, 2012 |
Filing
311
ORDER DENYING Defendant's 284 Motion to Consolidate as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/30/2012. Stipulation Deadline: 8/31/2012. (Figueroa, O)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
304
ORDER STRIKING Plaintiffs' 299 Redacted Filing; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiffs to Submit Documents for Filing and Sealing, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/19/2012. Five Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 17, 2012 |
Filing
302
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' 298 Request to Seal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/17/2012. (The Court GRANTS the request as to (1) Exhibits C and D to the Declaration of David Cheng; and (2 ) the portions of the Declaration of Robert Fountain that contain identifying employee information. Plaintiffs SHALL file redacted versions consistent with this Order and submit unredacted versions to the Court for sealing. As to the remaining documents, the Court will allow Taco Bell to submit briefing in support of the request to seal within 7 days of the date of service of this order.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
269
ORDER regarding Plaintffs' Motion for Class Certification and Taco Bell's Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Report of James Lackritz, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/29/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
September 26, 2011 |
Filing
267
MEMORANDUM DECISION RE: Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class 185 and Defendants' Motion to Exclude Declaration and Report of James Lackritz 221 , signed by District Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/26/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
September 9, 2011 |
Filing
265
ORDER Granting Defendants Taco Bell Corp.'s and Taco Bell of America, Inc.'s Motion to Stay 250 , signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/9/11. Status Conference set for 8/20/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Gonzalez, R)
|
August 30, 2011 |
Filing
263
MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER re: Defendants' Motion to Stay 250 , signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/30/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
July 21, 2011 |
Filing
258
STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Motion to Stay Hearing currently set for 8/8/2011 to 8/22/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/20/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
228
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' 223 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Exceed Page Limit signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/9/2011. (Figueroa, O)
|
May 6, 2011 |
Filing
225
ORDER Re STIPULATION to Continue Class Certification Briefing, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/6/2011. (Plaintiffs Reply in response to Defendants Opposition to the Motion for Class Certification is continued from 5/20/2011 to 5/27/2011; The hearing on the Motion for Class Certification shall remain as calendared for 6/6/2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
May 3, 2011 |
Filing
222
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Plaintiff's 210 Amended Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Complaint signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/3/2011. ( Proposed Order Consistent with Memorandum Decision Deadline: 5/10/2011)(Figueroa, O)
|
April 11, 2011 |
Filing
217
ORDER GRANTING Leave to Exceed Page Limits, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/11/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing
213
ORDER GRANTING 211 Plaintiff's Amended Ex Parte Application for Order to Shorten Notice Period for Amended Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Complaint, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/23/2011. Defendants' Opposition may be filed by 4/3/2011. Plaintiffs' Reply may be filed by 4/7/2011. (Jessen, A)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
202
ORDER re: STIPULATION to Continue Class Certification Friefing and hearing Dates: Replies due by 4/22/2011, Responses due by 5/20/2011, Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/23/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
February 2, 2011 |
Filing
198
STIPULATION and ORDER continue the Class Certification breifing and hearing dates (Defendants Replies due 3/25/2011, Plaintiff's Responses due 4/29/2011, Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/1/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing
195
ORDER Re: Request to Seal Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/25/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
December 9, 2010 |
Filing
183
ORDER Re Stipulation Re Leyva Deposition Continuance To January 2011, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/8/2010. (Case Management Deadline: 1/14/2011)(Fahrney, E)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing
180
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/2/2010 re 179 Stipulation re Leyva Deposition continuance and discovery cut-off. (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing
178
ORDER To Continue Briefing Deadlines And Hearing Re Class Certification, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/26/2010. ( Motions to be filed by 12/30/2010, Oppositions due by 3/4/2011, Replies due by 4/8/2011, and Motions Re: Class Certification set for hearing 5/9/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
June 8, 2010 |
Filing
172
ORDER re 171 Stipulation re Leyva Deposition and Discovery Cut-Off signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/8/2010. Defendants may depose Plaintiff Leyva for the remaining time permitted under Rule 30(d)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure after the discovery cut-off date of June 24, 2010. This deposition shall be completed no later than August 13, 2010.(Bradley, A)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
158
ORDER And Joint STIPULATION Re Vacation Claim, Discovery Related To Yum! Brands, Inc., And Dismissal of Yum! Brands, Inc., signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/30/2010. It is ORDERED: Defendant Yum! Brands, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice from the above-entitled action. Each party shall bear its own fees and expenses in connection with the dismissal.(Scrivner, E)
|
February 24, 2010 |
Filing
156
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION to Continue Deadline Whether Yum! Brands, Inc. is a Proper Party Defendant, Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/23/2010. (Arellano, S.)
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing
150
JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER To Continue Deadline Whether Yum! Brands, Inc. Is a Proper Party Defendant, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/22/2010. (Deadline for Defendants to file any dispositive motion on the issue stated is continued from 1/29/2010 to 3/1/2010.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing
143
ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 135 Motion to Compel Production of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/23/2009. (Esteves, C)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
133
ORDER Continuing Deadlines Re Whether Yum! Brands, Inc. is a Proper Party Defendant, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/21/2009. Discovery due by 12/28/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2010. (Sondheim, M)
|
October 21, 2009 |
Filing
130
ORDER denying as moot 123 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/21/2009. (Lundstrom, T)
|
October 14, 2009 |
Filing
128
JOINT STIPULATION And ORDER To Permit Taking Of Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Of Defendant Yum! Brands, Inc. After October 26, 2009 Discovery Cut-Off, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/13/2009. (Scrivner, E)
|
July 7, 2009 |
Filing
119
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER amending the previous scheduling order, document 117 ; order signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/2/2009. (Rooney, M)
|
February 19, 2009 |
Filing
89
ORDER ON AMENDED STIPULATION RE PRODUCTION OF THE NAMES, ADDRESSES AND TELEPHONE NUMBERS OF PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/19/2009. (Hernandez, M)
|