Mitchell v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Shaulton J. Mitchell
Defendant: - Hernandez, - Cano, J Jones, Gutierrez, - Aguirre, - Sloss, - Masiel, - Aguayo, Bustos, Martinez, Ruiz, Compelbel, Mendoez and Thompson, -
Case Number: 1:2007cv01322
Filed: September 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants' 87 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted; Objections, if any, Due within Twenty-One Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/3/2011. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 10/28/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting Defendants' Second Motion To Modify Scheduling Order (Doc. 82 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Proceed To Trial (Doc. 85 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Locating James Garcia (Doc. 92 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Discovery (Doc. 93 ), Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment Due Within Twenty-One Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/14/2011. (Fahrney, E)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Denying 83 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/13/2011. (Gonzalez, R)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS AS MOOT 79 Motion for Extension and 80 Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/16/2011. (Martin, S)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 77 Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/01/2011. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/28/2011. (Flores, E)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 68 Defendants' Motion to Conduct Deposition Via Video Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/20/2010. (Jessen, A)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Disregarding 63 Request for Hearing Transcript and Denying Request for Copy of Objections without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 05/19/2010. (Flores, E)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING 53 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 41 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/4/2010. (Sondheim, M)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Striking 47 Surreply; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendants' 41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies be Granted in Part and Denied in Part signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/08/2010. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/4/2010. (Flores, E)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant, Aguayo should not be dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/29/2009. Show Cause Response due by 1/29/2010 from Plaintiff.(Lundstrom, T)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/23/2009 vacating 30 Service Process Order and forwarding service documents to Plaintiff re 17 Amended Complaint. (Notice of Submission of Documents due by 5/26/2009). (Lundstrom, T)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/12/2009 granting 22 MOTION for extension of time to submit completed service documents. (Filing due by 3/17/2009).(Lundstrom, T)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Finding Service of Second 17 Amended Complaint Appropriate, and Forwarding Service Documents to Plaintiff for Completion and Return Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/6/2009. Filing due by 2/10/2009. (Sondheim, M)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Certain Defendants Be Dismissed (Docs. 18 , 19 ) Objections, If Any, Due Within 30 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/6/2009. It is RECOMMENDED that: This action proceed only against defendants Hernandez, Aguiree, Gutierrez, Compelbel, Masiel, Bustos, Sloss, Aguayo, and Martinez; and Plaintiff's claims against defendants Jones, Cano, Ruiz, and Thompson be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Motion referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Objections to F&R due by 2/11/2009. (Scrivner, E)
September 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit New Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AND Certified Copy of Trust Account Statement OR Pay Filing Fee Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/13/07. IFP Deadline 10/17/2007. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaulton J. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Masiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Aguayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compelbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendoez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?