Pinnacle Armor, Inc. vs. USA
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Armor, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2007cv01655
Filed: November 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re Cross Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 98 & 99 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/4/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER REQUESTING CLARIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF'S APA CLAIM signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 28, 2013. (Munoz, I)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 6/5/2013. (Hernandez, M)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 90 Motion to Conduct Discovery and Vacating Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 5/21/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's motion for discovery, filed 4/19/2013, is DENIED; 2. The motion hearing on 5/22/2013, is VACATED; and 3. The matter is set for further Status Conference 6/5/2013, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone to set a briefing schedule on Dispositive Motions.(Gaumnitz, R)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION and ORDER re: Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 4/19/2013. (Kusamura, W)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Discovery Motioj and Response Dates; ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference to May 6, 2013, at 11:00 A.M.,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 04/02/2013. (Case Management Deadline: 4/19/2013 and Status Conference set for 5/6/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER to continue discovery motion and response dates. Based on the stipulation of all parties to this action, the Court directs that: Plaintiffs motion for discovery, or a stipulation for discovery and/or supplementation of the RAR in lieu of a motion for discovery, shall be filed on or before March 29, 2013, and Defendants response to a motion for discovery, if any, be filed on or before April 5, 2013. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/28/2013. (Hernandez, M)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Doc. 71) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 12, 2013. (Munoz, I)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER continuing Status Conference from 1/23/2013 to 4/3/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/18/2013. (Hernandez, M)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT REVISED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND ORDER ADOPTING REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND VACATING HEARING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 21, 2012. (Munoz, I)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 28, 2012. (Munoz, I)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S THIRD MOTION TO DISMISS; AND DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART DEFENDANT'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 64 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 26, 2012. (Munoz, I)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue Status Conference from 8/29/2012 to 9/12/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/28/2012. (Hernandez, M)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying Defendant's 53 Second Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Granting Request to Strike Damages Prayer signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/19/2012. (Flores, E)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 52 Request for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/1/2012. (Administrative Record filed by : 6/8/2012) (Figueroa, O)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Status Conference from 7/13/2011 to 8/8/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/7/2011. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnacle Armor, Inc. vs. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Armor, Inc.
Represented By: Layne Eric Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?