Calderon v. Woodford et al
Plaintiff: Juan C. Calderon
Defendant: Jeanne Woodford, N. Grannis, M.L. Cate, E. Martinez, S. Lawin, D. G. Adams, S. Sherman, W. Hense, S. Aguilera-Marrero, L.C. Cano, M. Means, L. Smart, Correctional Counselors, Prison Administration, Classification, Supervisory Staff Members And Coordinators Of Inmate Appeals At Both Corcoran State Prisons, Warden of SCC-Jamestown, Adminstration Members of SCC-Jamestown and CDCR Medical And Mental Health Care Staff
Case Number: 1:2007cv01719
Filed: November 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DISMISSING Action, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/9/10: Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss 78 is GRANTED; The action is dismissed without prejudice; The Clerk is directed to close this case. (CASE CLOSED) (Hellings, J)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this 50 Action be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief can be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/21/2009. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 1/14/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate 67 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/24/2009. (Sondheim, M)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 **Vacated pursuant to 72 Order** FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/10/2009. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED That This Action be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 12/3/2009. (Bradley, A)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/16/2009, Recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief re 57 be Denied. Motion referred to Judge O'Neill. (Objections to F&R due by 11/23/2009) (Figueroa, O)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING Motions 42 44 45 47 52 53 54 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/24/2009. (Figueroa, O)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER VACATING Findings and Recommendations 37 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/1/09. (Hellings, J)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 {VACATED PER ORDER 56 } FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION, signed by Magistrate Judge William M. Wunderlich on 4/27/2009. The court RECOMMENDS that this action be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to obey a court order. Motion referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, Objections to F&R due by 6/1/2009. (Scrivner, E)
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER To Submit Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis Or Pay Filing Fee, Thirty Day Deadline, signed by Judge William M. Wunderlich on 11/29/2007. IFP Deadline due by 1/2/2008. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Instructions# 2 IFP Application)(Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calderon v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.L. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lawin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Hense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Aguilera-Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.C. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Counselors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervisory Staff Members And Coordinators Of Inmate Appeals At Both Corcoran State Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of SCC-Jamestown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adminstration Members of SCC-Jamestown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Medical And Mental Health Care Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?