Carter v. Munoz et al
Plaintiff: Desha M. Carter
Defendant: C. Munoz, R. Roberson, P.F. Paz, G. Parra and L. Silva
Case Number: 1:2007cv01736
Filed: November 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Dismissing the Matter with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/11. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal and/or Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/23/11. 21-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/17/2011 requiring the parties to submit a Stipulation of Dismissal. (Lundstrom, T)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 91 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to be Transported signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/10/2011. (Jessen, A)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING 87 and 88 Motions in Limine as Rendered Moot and ORDER VACATING 72 , 73 and 74 Writs of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/9/2011. (Jessen, A)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DISCHARGING 80 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/28/2011. (Jessen, A)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING 82 Plaintiff's Motion for a Change in Venue signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/18/2011. (Jessen, A)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Matter should not be Dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2011. Show Cause Response due by 2/1/2011.(Sant Agata, S)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER to Plaintiff Re: Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/2010. (Flores, E)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Discharging Order To Show Cause (Doc. 67 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2010. (Fahrney, E)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Denying 65 Request for a Status Update signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/06/2010. (Flores, E)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Matter Should Not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/23/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART Defendants' 42 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/25/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER STRIKING 56 Plaintiff's Surreply signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/9/2010. (Jessen, A)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/25/2010. (Jessen, A)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING 41 Motion to File Supplemental Complaint, and DISREGARDING Supplemental Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/10/2009. (Bradley, A)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Striking Unsigned Motion To Compel, And Granting Plaintiff Thirty Days Within Which To File Signed Motion (Doc. 36 ) ORDER Disregarding Motion For Status (Doc. 37 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/16/2009. (Scrivner, E)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit New Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Certified Copy of Trust Account Statement or Pay Filing Fee signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/4/07. IFP due by 1/10/2008. (Enclosed: In Forma Pauperis Form and Instructions) (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Munoz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desha M. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Paz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Parra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?