Sang v. Scribner et al

Plaintiff: Thon Ngot Sang
Defendant: A. K. Scribner, R. Flores, J. Torres and Ochoa
Case Number: 1:2007cv01759
Filed: December 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING 50 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in Full and Dismissing Action for Failure to State a Claim; Dismissal Counts as (Strike) signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/20/2010. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/1/10: Recommending that this action be DISMISSED in its entirety for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted re 46 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Thon Ngot Sang. Objections to F&R due by 10/7/2010. (Hellings, J)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING 41 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and GRANTING Defendants' 41 Motion to Dismiss, Dismissing Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, and GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Withint Thirty (30) Days, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/24/2009. Second Amended Complaint due by 12/28/2009. (Sondheim, M)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING 40 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/19/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 30 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED, 14 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint be DISMISSED, and Plaintiff be GRANTED Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/16/2009. Referred to Judge Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 11/18/2009. (Jessen, A)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT 28 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/14/2009. (Figueroa, O)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' First 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/4/2009. Answer to Complaint due by 3/11/2009. (Sondheim, M)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER To Submit Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Or Pay Filing Fee, Thirty Day Deadline, signed by Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/10/2007. IFP Deadline due by 1/15/2008. (Scrivner, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sang v. Scribner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thon Ngot Sang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. K. Scribner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?