Corona v. Knowles et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Cruz
Defendant: Mike Knowles, Chris Chrones and S. Fraunheim
Case Number: 1:2008cv00237
Filed: February 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing This Action With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Court Order and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/29/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/30/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER GRANTING In Part and Denying In Part Request to File Documents Under Seal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/11/18. (Marrujo, C)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER VACATING June 14, 2017 Scheduling Conference and DIRECTING Defendants to Arrange for Plaintiff to Appear Telephonically at the June 16, 2017 Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER Requiring Aman Pradhan and Courtney Smith to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed for Failure to Appear signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/31/2017. Further Scheduling and Show Cause Hearing set for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Setting Status Conference for May 31, 2017 at 2:30 PM and Directing Clerk of the Court to Serve a Copy of This Order on Plaintiff Andres Santana signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2017. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/31/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER on Request for Docket Sheet 194 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/18/13: As a one-time courtesy to Mr. Santana, this Court DIRECTS the Clerk to send Mr. Santana a copy of this Court's docket sheet. (Hellings, J)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 142 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/14/12. (Hellings, J)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER ON REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENT(S), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/12: The Clerk of Court shall file the documents listed under seal. (Hellings, J)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Seal Documents Submitted in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/6/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION Regarding Expert Disclosures; ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/13/2012. (IT IS SO ORDERED that the parties stipulation regarding expert disclosures is approved. The disclosures for Plaintiffs correctional expert shall occur on or before 8/8/2012. All other disclosures shall occur on or before 7/17/2012, consistent with this Courts prior order 129 .) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER re Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 142 ), Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/27/2012. The July 27, 2012 motion hearing is VACATED. (Arellano, S.)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Doc. 132 ), Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/19/2012. Defendants SHALL produce the unredacted documents prior to the June 21, 2012, deposition. If the documents are not received prior to the deposition, the Court will permit rescheduling. (Arellano, S.)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Granting 143 Request to Seal, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/18/12. (Verduzco, M)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time for hearing on Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/14/2012. (Hernandez, M)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Request to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/12/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 111 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/13/2012. Plaintiff's request for sanctions is DENIED. (Figueroa, O)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION of the Parties and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/27/2012. (Defendant's Opposition due by 2/27/2012) (Figueroa, O)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATES signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 14, 2012. (Munoz, I)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION Regarding Expert Disclosures; and ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/14/2011. (Expert Disclosures to be made by 3/16/2012, This extension of time does not affect any other case deadlines set forth in the Courts most recent scheduling order.)(Gaumnitz, R)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/6/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling Order, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/6/11: Non-Expert Discovery due by 3/1/2012. Expert Discovery due by 5/3/2012. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 5/15/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/2 9/2012. Settlement Conference - Parties to contact Magistrate. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Trial (JT-5 days) set for 12/10/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill(Hellings, J)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER STAYING Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal, Re 81 Motion to Stay, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/3/2010. Case Management Deadline: 9/2/2010. (Sondheim, M)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER on Defendants' FRCP 12 Motion to Dismiss 65 ; ORDERS Defendants, no later than February 5, 2010, file and serve an answer to plaintiffs' remaining Eighth Amendment Claim, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/20/2010. (Martin, S)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/24/2009. Response due 12/9/2009. (Esteves, C)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/4/2009. First Amended Complaint due by 11/16/2009. (Jessen, A)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING 50 56 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Strike Opposition; DENYING 52 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time; GRANTING Plaintiff additional time to file Reply. In the interest of deciding the motion on the merits , the Court will allow the late filing to stand. To prevent prejudice to plaintiff, however, the Court will allow her to file her reply no later than 10/20/2009. The 10/23/2009, hearing date will remain on calendar. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/16/2009. (Hernandez, M)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Redesignate Action as Regular Civil Case; ORDER VACATING 41 Discovery and Scheduling Order; ORDER SETTING HEARING For 42 Motion to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/16/2009. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Jessen, A)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 10 , and DISMISSING Certain Claims, Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/09/2009. (Arellano, S.)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Re Plaintiff's 12 Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/6/2009. (Sondheim, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corona v. Knowles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Chrones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Fraunheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?