Ruiz et al v. F. Korbel & Bros. Inc
Plaintiff: Juan Ruiz, Juana Martinez, Jesus Lozoya and Richard Rodriguez
Defendant: F. Korbel & Bros. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00417
Filed: March 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER to CLOSE CASE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/27/2009. (Jessen, A)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/30/09: (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs' Attorneys Fees; (2) GRANTING Reimbursement of Plaintiffs' Attorney Costs; (3) AWARDING Class Representative Payments. (Hellings, J)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/29/09: (1) Confirming Certification of Class and Collective Action; (2) Granting Final Approval to Class Action Settlement; and (3) Entering Final Judgment. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re: Settlement signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/22/2009. (Kusamura, W)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER to DISMISSAL of Plaintiff Rosario Perez's Claims With Prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/20/09. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz et al v. F. Korbel & Bros. Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Korbel & Bros. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ruiz
Represented By: Stanley S. Mallison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Martinez
Represented By: Stanley S. Mallison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Lozoya
Represented By: Stanley S. Mallison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rodriguez
Represented By: Stanley S. Mallison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?