Rosenblum v. Mule Creek State Prison Medical Staff et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Rosenblum
Defendant: Mule Creek State Prison Medical Staff and Pleasant Valley State Prison Medical Staff
Case Number: 1:2008cv00448
Filed: March 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM of DECISION and ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 8/8/12: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on all claims is GRANTED 91 . The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action, dismissing all the remaining individual Defendants: Diep, Akintola, Nale, Galloway, Todd, Williams, Milliman, Jensen, and Hall. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/13/12: Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is due no later than Friday, April 20, 2012; Plaintiff must file a Notice of Change of Address with the Court by Friday, March 30, 2012.(Hellings, J)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Directing Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum by United States Marshals Service without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 11/22/11. (Verduzco, M)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING 83 Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Vilaysane, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/8/2011. Defendant Vilaysane is terminated from this action. (Jessen, A)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 2/4/11: Plaintiff's Request for Modification of Scheduling Order 57 is DENIED; Plaintiff's TRO Motion 67 is DENIED; Defendant shall file any summary judgment motion by Friday, April 8, 2011; Plaintiff shall file his response by Friday, July 8, 2011; Defendants shall file any reply by Friday, July 29, 2011. (Hellings, J)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that Defendants File Response to Plaintiff's 67 Motion by January 4, 2011 and Plaintiff shall File a Reply by January 18, 2011 signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 12/14/2010. (Flores, E)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 57 Plaintiffs Request for Extension of Timeto File Reply to Opposition of Scheduling Order Modification, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 11/22/2010. (Verduzco, M)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 10/22/2010 ORDERING Defendants to file a response re 57 MOTION /Request for Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Phillip Rosenblum. (Filing Deadline: 11/5/2010). (Lundstrom, T)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order 50 , signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 6/14/2010. (Verduzco, M)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 46 Motion to Modify the Summary Judgment Motion Deadlines; ORDERED to VACATE the Summary Judgment Motion Briefing Deadlines in the Courts's March 25, 2010 44 Order; ORDERED that the Court will issue an Amended Scheduling Order with Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule upon its ruling of 45 Motion for leave to file Amended Complaint, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 05/18/2010. (Martin, S)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 01/19/2010.(Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2010 at 02:00 PM (Arizona Time)before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee,in his chambers) (Martin, S)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 12/2/2009. It is ORDERED Granting Plaintiff's Motion Dismissal of Defendant Cliforde Without Prejudice (Doc. 34 ). It is further ORDERED that Defendant Cliforde shall be dismissed without prejudice from the present action. (Scrivner, E)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 28 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel, Without Prejudice signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 11/9/2009. (Bradley, A)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER for PLAINTIFF to SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed With Respect to Defendant Cliforde Who Has Not Yet Been Served, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 10/27/2009. Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2009. (Jessen, A)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that on or before October 23, 2009, the served Defendants shall provide under seal the last known address of Defendants Vilaysane, Cliforde, and Williams signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 10/02/2009. Response due by 10/23/2009. (Flores, E)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 21 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 8/10/2009. Responsive Pleading due by 9/25/2009. (Jessen, A)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/7/2009, The Court advises the parties that the Court is conducting statutory screening.The matter will proceed following the issuance of the statutory screening order. (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenblum v. Mule Creek State Prison Medical Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mule Creek State Prison Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley State Prison Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?