Perez v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Perez
Defendant: Ken Clark, R. Roberson, C. Munoz, R. Perez, J. Olmos, J. Sanchez, P. Paz, - Castello, Silva, - Blanks, S. Marquez, - Jimenez, Hains and Talle
Case Number: 1:2008cv00466
Filed: February 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, With Prejudice, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(2), and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close File re 49 , 50 , and 53 signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/29/2010. CASE CLOSED.(Bradley, A)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES to Advise Whether they Stipulate to Dismissal of this Action per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/26/2010. Defense Counsel Response due by 6/14/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, And Dismissing Claims Against Defendant C. Munoz Without Prejudice (Docs. 29 , 39 and 47 ), signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/4/2010. (Scrivner, E)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/12/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion to Modify The Scheduling Order 38 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 03/28/10: Amended Discovery Deadline - 6/13/2010; Amended Dispositive Motion Deadline - 09/24/2010. (Hellings, J)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER finding Service of Amended Complaint Appropriate, and Forwarding Service Documents to Plaintiff for Completion and Return within Thirty Days 15 . ( Completed Service Documents Due: 5/12/2009.) signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/8/09. (amended complaint and service documents enclosed)(Gil-Garcia, A)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, and Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants from Action for Failure to State a Claim 15 16 . ORDER referring Action Back to Magistrate Judge for Service of Process, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/2/09. (Gil-Garcia, A)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/3/2009. Motion referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 3/9/2009. (Sondheim, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Olmos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Paz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Castello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Blanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?