Hardin v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Case Number: 1:2008cv00617
Filed: May 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER re: Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication 236 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/17/12. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of August 27, 2012 and Taking Matter 236 Under Submission, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/22/2012. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the previously set hearing date of August 27, 2012, is VACATED, and no party shall appear at that time. As of that date, the court will take the matter under submission and will thereafter issue its decision.)(Gaumnitz, R)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER RESPONDING to Plaintiff's 255 Request for Clarification signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/3/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 7/30/12(Summary Judgment) is continued to 8/27/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/26/12. (Nazaroff, H)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER on Request for Clarification and Deny Reconsideration [Docs. 233, 239, 240, 243], signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/23/2012. (Herman, H)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Wal-Mart to Produce Emails and Other Documents [228, 229,230], signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/16/2012. (Herman, H)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's 206 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/22/2012. (Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by 6/27/2012)(Figueroa, O)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER vacating hearing date of April 23, 2012 (Motion for Reconsideration as well as the motion to Tax Costs) and taking matters under submission. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/18/12. (Nazaroff, H)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER resetting briefing schedule on motion for reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/12. (Nazaroff, H)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/2/12. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Resetting Schedule: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE is moved from 2/29/12 to Monday, March 5, 2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE is moved from 2/29/2012 to Monday, March 5, 2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/28/2012. (Herman, H)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/24/2012. (Herman, H)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Hearing Date of February 22, 2012 VACATED and Taking Matter Under Submission and will thereafter issue its decision, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 02/20/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER on Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and Plaintiff's Motion for Compliance and Sanctions [Docs. 153, 155, 156]: (1) DENIES Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration regarding this Court's order on Defendant's objectio n to the deposition of Susan Chambers (Doc. 153); and (2) GRANTS Defendant's request to produce Ms. Chambers for deposition after the holiday season. Wal-Mart shall produce Ms. Chambers for deposition on or after January 23, 2012; The deposition shall be limited to no more than four (4) hours. (3) DENIES Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions. (Doc. 155). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/21/2011. (Herman, H)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER on Discovery Motions; Documents; Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition; Expand Number of Deposition (Docs. 140, 146/150, 149). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/2/2011. (Herman, H)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Ex Parte, Joint STIPULATION, and ORDER Briefly Extending Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: non-expert Discovery by 12/15/2011. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/20/2011. (Herman, H)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of March 14, 2011 and Taking Matter Under Submission (re 111 Motion to Dismiss), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/9/2011. (Arellano, S.)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Hearing (Doc. 111 ), Signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/2/2011. The Motion Hearing now set for 2/28/2011 is continued to 3/14/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Arellano, S.)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 62 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/23/10: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a new complaint that conforms to the evidence within fifteen (15) days. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ADOPTING 73 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding 55 Defendant's Motion to Prohibit Plaintiff from Eliciting Expert Testimony from Improperly Disclosed Witnesses, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/15/2010. (Jessen, A)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Denying Wal-Mart's Request to Reset Hearing 84 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/8/2010. (Verduzco, M)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Resetting hearing date to September 20, 2010 and vacating the September 9, 2010 pretrial conference. signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/25/10. (Nazaroff, H)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's Motion to Prohibit Plaintiff from Eliciting Expert Testimony from Improperly Disclosed Witnesses, or Alternatively, to Compel Plaintiff's Proper Expert Disclosure and Allow an Additional Forty-Five Days Within Which Defendant May Complete Expert Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/25/2010. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 9/8/2010. (Verduzco, M)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Re Plaintiff's 66 Ex Parte Application For Leave to File Objections to Defendant's Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/4/2010. (Esteves, C)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Amended Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/18/2009. (Esteves, C)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING Second and Third Causes of Action With Leave to Amend, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/17/2009. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 10/8/2009, or if no Amended Complaint is Filed by This Date, Defendant's are Directed to File an Answer to the Original Complaint (Narrowed by this Order) Within Twenty (20) Days of That Date. (Jessen, A)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Re Defendant's 26 Motion For Extension of Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/7/2009. The dates and related deadlines referenced in the September 2, 2008 Scheduling Order are vacated. Status Conference set for 6/8/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Esteves, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?