Crayton v. Hedgpeth et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Crayton
Defendant: A. Hedgpeth, Kern Valley State Prison, - Corrales and K Matheny
Case Number: 1:2008cv00621
Filed: May 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION Pursuant to Settlement signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 6/30/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER VACATING June 19 Hearing signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 6/18/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE and ORDER Setting Hearing on June 19, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 6/9/2014. Joint Statements due by noon on 6/13/2014. Hearing set for 6/19/2014 at 08:00 AM before District Judge William Haskell Alsup at the United States District Court, Northern District of California in San Francisco, CA. (Jessen, A)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER re Settlement, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 5/9/14. (Verduzco, M)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Pending 212 216 218 222 223 Motions signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 2/10/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Vacating Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 1/28/2014. (Masterson, G)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 1/14/2014. (Filing Deadline set for 1/27/2014 to file final settlement papers with the Court).(Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER VACATING January 16 Hearing and Other Hearing Dates signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 1/8/2014. Status Conference set for 7/3/2014 at 11:00 AM before District Judge William Haskell Alsup. (Jessen, A)
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 12/24/2013 re 275 MOTION filed by Timothy Crayton. (Lundstrom, T)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 12/20/13. (Masterson, G)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 12/19/2013. (Masterson, G)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER re Stipulation to Set Status Conference Hearing and Consider Motion to Continue Trial on Shortened Time, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 12/13/13. (Marrujo, C)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER re 263 Verified Motion for Certificate of Appealability signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 12/12/2013. Pro bono counsel is directed to review the motion and accompanying documents and file a statement by 12/17/2013 at noon addressing whether this motion is withdrawn or will be re-noticed and re-filed on the docket. (Jessen, A)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER APPOINTING PRO BONO COUNSEL signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 12/10/2013. Attorney Jeffrey L. Bornstein and Claudia A. Quiroz for Timothy Crayton added. (Jessen, A)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER REFERRING Matter to Federal Pro Bono Project for Appointment of Counsel signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 12/3/2013. (Jessen, A)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER Setting Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Date, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 12/2/13. (Gonzalez, R)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 10/28/2013. (Masterson, G)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER and Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 10/1/2013. (Masterson, G)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER and Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on 9/10/2013. (Van Meter, L.)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE TO PARTIES signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 9/3/2013. (Jessen, A)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER DENYING 241 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 243 Defendants' Motion to Strike; ORDER DENYING 234 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Vadas pursuant to the Pro Se Prisoner Mediation Program, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 8/21/2013. (Jessen, A)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER GRANTING Request for Stay signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 3/8/2013. This case is stayed until June 12, 2013. Plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment is due by June 12, 2013. (Jessen, A)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER DENYING Motion for an ADA Accommodation Order 233 , signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 2/6/13. (Hellings, J)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 12/14/12.(Hellings, J)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 AMENDED ORDER regarding 225 Order on Motion for Extension signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 9/20/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Misjoined Defendants and Claims, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 8/4/12. (Verduzco, M)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER DENYING 188 Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating Sanctions; ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Within Forty-Five (45) Days; and ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Mail Plaintiff a Copy of the First Amended Complaint and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, as a One Time Courtesy, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 4/25/2012. (Jessen, A)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING 191 Motion to Stay signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 7/28/2011. This action is stayed until November 1, 2011. (Jessen, A)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Vacating Summary Judgment Deadline Pending Adjudication Of Motion To Dismiss Misjoined Defendants And Claims (Doc. 189 ), signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 7/20/2011. (Fahrney, E)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER on 153 158 Motions to Dismiss; Motion for Partial 108 Summary Judgment; 147 Motion to Declare Plaintfff a Vexatious Litigant; Plaintiff's 151 Motion to Reconsider; and Further Scheduling signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 05/18/2011. (Flores, E)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to RE-ISSUE SUMMONS for unserved defendants: Correctional Officer Chambers, Correctional Officer R. Phillips, Correctional Officer Fernandez or Ferdinana, Correctional Officer Amavisca and Correctional Officer Sergeant Butter field; ORDER DENYING In Part and GRANTING In Part Motion to Compel 111 , 113 , 114 and 150 , signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 02/28/2011. (Service Documents forwarded to USM Sacramento: 5 summons, 6 copies of amended complaint, 6 copies of this order) (Martin, S)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Re-Opening Case; Setting Schedule, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 1/18/2011. Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants 106 Motion to Dismiss and 108 Motion for Summary Judgment Must be Filed No Later Than 60 Days From the Date of This Order; Defendant Adams Shall File His Responsive Pleading No Later Than 60 Days From the Date of This Order. (Marrujo, C)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER DENYING Pending Motions signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 11/9/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines. Settlement Conference set before Magistrate Judge Vadas on Tuesday, December 14, 2010 at 1:00 p.m. at Solano State Prison. signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J Vadas on September 17, 2010. (Masterson, G)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING 98 Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Preliminary Injunction and REFERRING CASE to Pro Se Prisoner Settlement Program, signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 8/30/2010. Case stayed. Copy of order mailed to Judge Vadas. (Jessen, A)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting First Extension Of Time For Defendant Lopez To Respond To First Amended Complaint (As Amended On May 25, 2010) (Doc. 104 ), signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 8/5/2010. ( Response to Complaint due by 9/30/2010) (Scrivner, E)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Requiring Defendants' Response 98 , signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 8/2/2010. (Defendants Response due by 9/7/2010) (Scrivner, E)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Claims; GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time 91 , 93 , signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 5/25/10: Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings on or before August 1, 2010. (Hellings, J)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 79 Motion to modify Scheduling Order and granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 1/7/2010. ( Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2010).(Lundstrom, T)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING Motion for Preliminary Injunction; GRANTING Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Amend the Complaint; ORDER of Service; Further Scheduling signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 10/13/2009. ( Filing Deadline: 12/21/2009) (Figueroa, O)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 42 } ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 24 , signed by District Judge William Haskell Alsup on 8/21/09: Defendants are ordered to submit a response by SEPTEMBER 8, 2009. Plaintiff may file a reply by SEPTEMBER 15, 2009.(Hellings, J) .
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crayton v. Hedgpeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Crayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hedgpeth
Represented By: Grant Lien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Matheny
Represented By: Grant Lien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?