Johnson v. Dovey et al
Plaintiff: Garrison S. Johnson
Defendant: John Dovey, W. J. Sullivan, F. Gonzalez, M. Carrasco, D. Zanchi, L. Magallanes, A. Dunnahoe, V. Ybarra, G. Ybarra and S. Cunningham
Case Number: 1:2008cv00640
Filed: May 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER DENYING 266 Plaintiff's Motion AS MOOT, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/25/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion As Moot (ECF No. 280 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/31/2014. (Fahrney, E)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Counsel and Expert 275 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/4/13. (Hellings, J)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 264 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/16/13. (Verduzco, M)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE and ORDER that Garrison S. Johnson is no Longer Needed in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/14/2013. (Flores, E)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Requiring Production of Plaintiff for Trial on March 14, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/13/2013. (Flores, E)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER Granting 225 Defendants' Motion in Limine, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/4/13. (Gonzalez, R)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witness, Jason McCoy #J-93313, for Jury Trial on March 13, 2013 at 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/12/13. (Gonzalez, R)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ***DISREGARD*** AMENDED ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witness, Jason McCoy #J-93313, for Trial on March 12, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/12/13. (Gonzalez, R)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Witness: Jason McCoy for trial on March 5, 2013 at 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/6/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Statement and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/30/2013. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Regarding Witness Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/21/2012. Plaintiff is required to submit money orders by 2/1/2013. (Jessen, A)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 175 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/27/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER DENYING CDCR'S 182 Motion for Reconsideration as MOOT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/27/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Regarding 176 Objection to Subpoena Duces Tecum and Production of Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 08/21/2012. (21) Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER ADOPTING 174 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING Motion for access to the law library, construed as a Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/21/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's motion for a court order directing the Warden of CCI to provide Plaintiff with access to the prison legal library be DENIED; re 173 MOTION re 172 Response MOTION re 172 Response filed by Garrison S. Johnson ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 06/13/2012.(20 - Day Deadline to file request) (Objections to F&R due by 7/2/2012) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Citation, Sanctions, and Dispositive Relief re 152 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration as Moot 164 ; ORDER Directing CDCR to Provide Further Response; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 155 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/24/12. Fourteen Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 158 Motion to require defendants to participate in settlement signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/16/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Objection 161 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/13/12. (Gonzalez, R)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Requiring Non-Party CDCR To Respond to Plaintiff's Motion 152 ; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion 154 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/15/12. (Gonzalez, R)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER DENYING 142 , 157 Motions to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/14/2012. (Jessen, A)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Granting CDCR's Motion for Protective Order in Part 147 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 12/12/11. (Verduzco, M)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER STRIKING 143 CDCR's Response; ORDER GRANTING 130 Plaintiff's Motion and ORDER Commanding CDCR to Comply With the Subpoena Duces Tecum and Produce for Plaintiff the Documents Listed in the Court's March 10, 2011 Order (Doc. 118 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/7/2011. CDCR is granted forty-five (45) days to comply. (Jessen, A)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration (Doc. 138 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/1/2011. (Fahrney, E)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Denying 135 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/01/2011. (Flores, E)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Requiring CDCR to Respond re 134 Response filed by Garrison S. Johnson, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 08/4/2011. (Responses- (14) Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Supplement Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 06/03/2011.(21 day deadline) (Martin, S)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Adopting 112 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION and DENYING Plaintiff's 76 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/22/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Directing Service Of Subpoena Duces Tecum By United States Marshal Without Prepayment Of Cost (Doc. 115 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/9/2011. (Fahrney, E)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motions For Subpoena Duces Tecum (Docs. 69 , 71 , 87 , 95 , 97 , 103 ), Subpoenas To Issue After Twenty (20) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/14/2011. (Fahrney, E)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING April 23, 2010 99 Motion to Compel as MOOT; ORDER REGARDING 85 , 91 , 94 , Motions to Compel; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 109 Motion for Modification of Discovery and Scheduling Order IN PART signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/11/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff 74 Leave to take Defendants' Deposition by Written Question as Unnecessary; ORDER DENYING 92 Motion to Compel as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/9/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to File Opposition to Plaintiff's 91 94 Motions to Compel; Opposition Due within 20 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/29/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING as Moot 52 Motion to compel; DENYING 61 Motion to Compel, without prejudice to refiling; Plaintiff and Defendants request for sanctions are DENIED; and Parties are to respond to discovery requests within thirty (30) days from the date of service of a discovery request, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/3/2010. (Marrujo, C)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING 70 & 72 Motions to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/29/2010. (Discovery due by 9/20/2010; Dispositive Motions filed by 11/22/2010) (Marrujo, C)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER adopting 58 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 41 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/9/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Setting Discovery and Scheduling Deadlines for Defendants G. Ybarra, Curliss, Velasquez and J. Gonzalez, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 05/19/2010. The Courts Discovery and Scheduling Order, filed November 5, 2009, applies to Defendants G. Ybarra, Powell, Curliss, Velasquez, and J. Gonzalez. (Martin, S)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISREGARDING 32 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Garrison S. Johnson AS MOOT, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/7/2009. (Martin, S)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING 33 Motion for Entry of Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/4/2009. (Figueroa, O)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and Dismissing of Certain Claims signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/9/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISREGARDING AS MOOT 7 Motion to Appoint Expert, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/7/2009. (Sondheim, M)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/22/2009, Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims 1 17 . Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. (Objections to F&R due by 5/26/2009) (Figueroa, O)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING Request for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration 12 , 15 ; OJBECTIONS to Findings and Recommendations 8 Due Within Thirty (30) Days of Service of This Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/19/09: Objections to F&R due by 3/24/2009. (Hellings, J)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING FIRST 9 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AN OBJECTION TO FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONSsigned by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/23/2009. ( Objections to F&R due by 2/26/2009) (Figueroa, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Dovey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrison S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Zanchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Magallanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Dunnahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?