Rose v. State of California

Plaintiff: Steven W. Rose
Defendant: State of California
Case Number: 1:2008cv00681
Filed: May 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Finding Appeal to be Frivolous and REVOKING In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/12/2012. cc Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Marrujo, C)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this Action be DISMISSED for Failure to State a Claim re 56 Third Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/11/2012. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS To Dismiss The Action (Doc. 49 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/9/2011. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 7/5/2011. (Fahrney, E)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Vacating 38 Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/21/11. (Verduzco, M)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending the Dismissal of Certain 23 Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/01/2011. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 4/18/2011.(Flores, E)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Vacating 35 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/31/2011. (Flores, E)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending this Action be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/17/11. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Verduzco, M)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 02/09/2011. Second Amended Complaint due by 3/14/2011.(Flores, E)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying 32 Motion to Stay signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/08/2011. (Flores, E)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 26 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Plaintiffs First Amendment claims are dismissed with prejudice; Plaintiffs RLUIPA claims are dismissed with prejudice; Plaintiffs Sixth Amendment claims are dismissed with prejudice; Plaintiffs equal protection claims are dismissed with prejudice; Board of Prison Hearings is dismissed, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/20/2010. (Marrujo, C)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections and a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/23/2010. (Amended Complaint due by 1/26/2011 and Objections to F&R due by 12/27/2010) (Martin, S)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 24 Motion for Proof of Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/29/2010. (Verduzco, M)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Dismissing Certain Claims with Leave to Amend; FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending the Dismissal of Other Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/2010. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Second Amended Complaint due by 11/30/2010; Objections to F&R due by 11/22/2010.(Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven W. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?