January 23, 2012 |
Filing
138
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 137 Motion for Renewed Request of Transfer of Full Record on Appeal signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 01/23/2012. Transcript Desigantion Form due 2/10/2012. (Flores, E)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
133
ORDER signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 7/25/2011 denying as moot 131 Motion for request for transfer of full record on appeal. (Lundstrom, T)
|
May 25, 2011 |
Filing
128
ORDER, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 5/25/11: Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial 120 is DENIED . (Hellings, J)
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
115
Notice and ORDER that Willie D. Randle #D-89098, is No Longer Needed in These Proceedings, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 3/23/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
March 22, 2011 |
Filing
114
Notice and ORDER that David Hill #F-70901, is No Longer Needed in these Proceedings, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 3/22/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
March 16, 2011 |
Filing
105
ORDER Quashing 92 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport David Hill CDC#AB-9867, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 3/16/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
102
ORDER denying 101 Motion to continue Trial Date signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 3/15/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
|
March 1, 2011 |
Filing
98
ORDER, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 3/1/11: The Clerk of the Court shall return the four money orders to the person(s) who delivered the money orders to the Court on behalf of Plaintiff, together with a copy of this Order; That subpoenas described in Docket 87 and 88 will not be served by the United States Marshal, and are effectively quashed. (Hellings, J)
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion to Compel signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 2/28/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
92
ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Witness David Hill #AB-9867, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 2/24/11. (Verduzco, M)
|
February 9, 2011 |
Filing
89
ORDER signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 2/9/2011 requiring Plaintiff to submit witness fees to the Court. (Case Management Deadline: 2/25/2011).(Lundstrom, T)
|
February 1, 2011 |
Filing
88
ORDER Directing Service of Subpoena by United States Marshals Service without Prepayment of Costs; Subpoena to be served on Lieutenant J. Smith, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 02/01/2011. (Martin, S)
|
January 27, 2011 |
Filing
87
ORDER signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 1/27/2011 directing service of 15 Civil Subpoenas by U.S. Marshals Service without prepayment of costs. (Lundstrom, T)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing
72
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 71 Amended First Request for Extension of Time to Respond Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Defendants' First 70 Request for Extension of Time to Respond Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 11/2/2010. Defendants' Responses due by 11/5/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing
66
ORDER DENYING 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel and ORDER Extending Deadlines, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 7/23/2010. Plaintiff's Motions in Limine due by 10/12/2010. Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 12/13/2010 at 10:00 AM (11:00 AM Arizona time) before District Judge James A Teilborg. (Jessen, A)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing
62
ORDER Setting Final Pretrial Conference, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 08/31/2010. (Final Pretrial Conference set for November 8, 2010 at 10:15 a.m. to be held at 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona, Courtroom 503 - Telephonically)(Martin, S)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing
59
ORDER re: Plaintiff's 53 Motion to Compel signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 8/3/2010. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs 53 motion to compel is GRANTED to the extent that Defendants shall produce Kern Valley State Prison Facility, Building B, 4th floor control log book entries for October 29, 2007, as redacted in accordance with this Order, to Plaintiff within 14 days of the date of this Order. (Bradley, A)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
43
ORDER, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 3/31/10: Defendants Franklin and Phillips request to complete Plaintiff's deposition via videoconference 39 is GRANTED. (Hellings, J)
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing
36
ORDER to Send Plaintiff a New Summons and USM-285 Form for Defendant J. Nichols, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 3/8/2010. (Sondheim, M)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing
34
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 2/25/2010. (Discovery due by 8/2/2010. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/3/2010. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 4/1/2010. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/23/2010). (Show Cause Response due by 3/29/2010.)(Lundstrom, T)
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing
30
ORDER to File a Current Address for Defendant Sather and Defendant Nicholas signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 2/2/2010. If an address for either or both Defendants is provided under seal, the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of this Order to the Marshals, with the sealed address(es), and the Marshals shall complete service consistent with this Courts order of October 26, 2009.(Filing of Address Deadline: 2/23/2010) (Figueroa, O)
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing
22
ORDER, signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 10/1/09: Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint 19 is GRANTED; the Clerk of the Court shall file the amended complaint lodged at Doc. #20; FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall update the docket to reflect that the Defendants are Correctional Officer L.V. Franklin, Correctional Officer J. Nicholas, Correctional Control Officer L. Phillips, and Correctional Sergeant B. Sather; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion fo r three additional service packets for J. Nicholas, B. Sather and L. Phillips 18 is GRANTED; Service is appropriate for J. Nicholas, B. Sather and L. Phillips; Clerk to send plaintiff: (3) Summons, (3) USM-285 Forms, and (3) copies of the Amended Complaint filed on 10/5/09; FURTHER ORDERED extending Defendant Franklin's time to respond to the amended complaint until October 19, 2009. (Case Management Deadline: 11/9/2009) (Encls. to Plaintiff as directed in this Order) (Hellings, J)
|
August 26, 2009 |
Filing
14
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms. Service is appropriate for J Castro Philips. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copies of the Complaint filed on 6/18/2008; ORDER GRANTING Defendant Fr anklin's 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; ORDER for Clerk of the Court to forward a copy of this Order to the Marshals signed by District Judge James A Teilborg on 8/26/2009. Case Management Deadline: 9/28/2009; Defendant Franklin's Response to Complaint due by 10/5/2009, Marshal's status report due by 9/8/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, and Forwarding Service Documents to Plaintiff for Completion and Return Within Thirty Days; Defendants J Juarez, K Williams and Chavez are Dismissed without Prejudice signed by District Judge James A Te ilborg on 4/16/2009. If Plaintiff fails to return the Notice of Submission of Documents and the required documents within 30 days of the date of filing of this Order, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Completed Service Documents due by 5/20/2009.(Flores, E)
|