March 9, 2012 |
Filing
544
STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Case signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/09/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Flores, E)
|
March 2, 2012 |
Filing
542
ORDER TO DENY EXTENSION, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/2/2012. (Court DENIES plaintiffs request for 30 additional days to dismiss this action. The 3/1/2012 order to show cause remainsin effect and is not discharged.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
March 1, 2012 |
Filing
541
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to dismiss action, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/01/2012. Show Cause Response due by 3/9/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
|
January 30, 2012 |
Filing
539
ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 30, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing
524
MOTIONS IN LIMINE ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 18, 2012. (Munoz, I)
|
November 22, 2011 |
Filing
487
STIPULATION and ORDER -GRANTED. Pretrial Conference currently set for 12/6/2011 has been CONTINUED to 12/20/2011 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 21, 2011. (Munoz, I)
|
November 10, 2011 |
Filing
485
STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Jury Trial currently set for 1/4/2012 to 1/17/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/10/11. (Kusamura, W)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing
473
ORDER RE: Post-Trial Motions and Entry of Judgment, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 8/9/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
July 5, 2011 |
Filing
469
MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER RE: Post-Trial Motions, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/5/2011. (Kusamura, W)
|
June 10, 2011 |
Filing
468
ORDER AFTER HEARING, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/10/2011. (Supplemental Joint Pretrial Statement to be filed on or before 10/26/2011, Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2011 at 11:00 a.m., and Jury Trial set for 11/29/2011 at 9:00 a.m.)(Gaumnitz, R)
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing
462
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Hearing on Motion for Final Entry of Judgment and Related Motions, Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/24/2011. The Motion Hearing now set for 4/4/2011 is CONTINUED to 5/23/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Arellano, S.)
|
December 14, 2010 |
Filing
413
ORDER GRANTING Defendants National Railroad Passenger Corporations's, BNSF Railway Company's, and State of California, Department of Transportation's 239 Motion in Limine No. 18 to Limit or Exclude Evidence Pertaining to Articles about Defendants or the Subject Accident, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/9/2010. (Figueroa, O)
|
December 13, 2010 |
Filing
411
ORDER GRANTING Defendants National Railroad Passenger Corporations's, BNSF Railway Company's, and State of California, Department of Transportation's 243 Motion in Limine No. 16 to Limit or Exclude any Evidence Regarding the Nature and Extent of Decedents' Injuries, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/9/2010. (Figueroa, O)
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing
400
ORDER GRANTING Defendants National Railroad Passenger Corporation's, BNSF Railway Company's, and State of California, Department of Transportation's 224 Motion in Limine No. 3 to Limit the Testimony of Charles Culver, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/9/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
December 8, 2010 |
Filing
364
ORDER Re: Stanislaus County's Motion in Limine signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/8/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing
268
ORDER on Plaintiff's 264 Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time For Motions in Limine, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/12/2010. (Motions In Limine previously set for 11/19/2010 have been CONTINUED to 11/24/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
|
November 5, 2010 |
Filing
258
ORDER on Plaintiff's Ex Parte application for an Extension of time for designation of deposition testimony, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/5/2010. (Kusamura, W)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing
209
SUMMARY DECISION Following Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Plaintiff's 159 Motion For Issue And Evidentiary Sanctions, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 11/1/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing
208
FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/26/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
207
ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Reasonable Attorneys Fees and Costs Following Defendants' Motion to Compel re 168 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/26/2010. (Bradley, A)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing
191
ORDER Regarding Plaintiff Lucio Corral Rodriguez's 159 Motion For Issue and Evidentiary Sanctions Against The County of Stanislaus signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/28/2010. Evidentiary Hearing SET FOR 10/13/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Esteves, C)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
190
ORDER Regarding Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Inspection Video, Documents Relating to Decedent's College Attendance, and The Deposition of The Custodian of Records For CPS Security Solutions, Inc. 168 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/16/2010. (Esteves, C)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
189
ORDER Regarding The Parties' 188 Stipulation to Extend The Expert Discovery Deadline Filed September 14, 2010 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/15/2010. (Esteves, C)
|
August 27, 2010 |
Filing
187
Courtroom Decorum. (Gaumnitz, R)
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing
176
STIPULATION and ORDER Re Extension of The Expert Discovery Cutoff signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/19/2010. (Esteves, C)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing
174
STIPULATION and ORDER Shortening Time to Hear Defendants National Railroad Passenger Corporation, BNSF Railway Company and State of California, Department of Transporation's Motion to Compel Production of Inspection Video and Documents Relating Decedent's Attendance at Modesto Junior College, and Deposition of CPS Security Solutions, Inc. signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/16/2010. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Esteves, C)
|
July 13, 2010 |
Filing
164
STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant City of Riverbank signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/12/2010. (Figueroa, O)
|
July 8, 2010 |
Filing
161
ORDER Regarding Defendants National Railroad Passenger Corporation, BNSF Railway Company and California Department of Transportation's 147 Motion For Protective Order Limiting Number of Plaintiff's Experts and to Extend Deadline For Expert Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/7/2010. Expert Discovery Cutt Off is EXTENDED to 7/30/2010. (Esteves, C)
|
June 21, 2010 |
Filing
155
STIPULATION regarding confidentiality of BNSF signal engineering standards: calculations for highway grade crossing warning times and approach lengths (standard no. SES 10.00), and safetran model 3000 GCP application guidelines: ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/18/2010. (Figueroa, O)
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing
154
STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Action With Prejudice as to Defendant City of Modesto only, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/18/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
June 17, 2010 |
Filing
152
ORDER Re Stipulation Shortening Time to Hear Defendants National Railroad Passenger Corporation, BNSF Railway Company and State of California, Department of Transportation's Motion For Protective Order Limiting The Number of Plaintiff Lucio Corr al Rodriguez' Disclosed Experts and to Extend The Deadline For Expert Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/16/2010. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. (Esteves, C)
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing
143
ORDER Regarding Plaintiff Lucio Corral Rodriguez's 129 Motion for Issue and Evidentiary Sanctions Against The County of Stanislaus signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/14/2010. (Esteves, C)
|
April 29, 2010 |
Filing
117
STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Confidentiality of Agreement Between National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Burlington Northern Railroad Company and The Atchison, Topeka and Santa Fe Railway Company signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/29/2010. (Esteves, C)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing
115
Stipulation and ORDER Re Defendant State of California's 87 Motion For Partial Summary Judgment signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 4/27/2010. (Esteves, C)
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing
112
ORDER on Plaintiff Lucio Corral's 103 Motion to Compel Certain Discovery and to Allow The Completion of All Outstanding Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/20/2010. (Esteves, C)
|
February 2, 2009 |
Filing
58
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/30/2009.(Discovery due by 6/1/2010, Non-Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2010., Dispositive Motion due by 7/1/2010, Settlement Conference set for 6/10/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GSA) before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin, Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger., Jury Trial set for 10/19/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger) (Martin, S)
|