Team Enterprises, LLC v. Western Investment Real Estate Trust et al
Plaintiff: Team Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Western Investment Real Estate Trust, WPT, Inc., PK II Century Center LP, Pan Pacific Retail Properties, Inc., Kimco Realty Corporation, Prudential Real Estate Investors, John A. Branagh, Lynette F. Branagh, Gaylon C. Patterson, Marla J. Patterson, Modesto Center Investors, LP and MC II, LP
Case Number: 1:2008cv00872
Filed: June 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER DISMISSING REMAINING CLAIMS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/19/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/28/2011 regarding court's intent to dismiss remaining claims. Filing Deadline: 1/17/2012.(Lundstrom, T)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER adopting 385 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/22/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 385 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending the Determination of Good Faith Settlement Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 877.6 and Issuance of an Order Barring Contribution Pusuant to 42 U.S.C. 9613(f) (CERCLA 113(f)(2)) re 379 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/7/2011, referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 367 AMENDED JUDGMENT dated *8/24/2011* in favor of Multimatic Corporation, Multimatic LLC, and The Kirrberg Corporation against Team Enterprises, LLC pursuant to order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/23/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff and Plaintiff's Primary Insurer to Participate in Further Mediation Session 363 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/29/2011. (Herman, H)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Joint Request for Withdrawal Without Prejudice of PK Defendants' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer with Cross-Claims against Street [Doc. 333] ; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/9/2010. (Herman, H)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 JOINT Request for Continuance of Hearing on PK Defendants' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer with Cross-Claims Against Street; ORDER - 333 MOTION For Leave to File an Amended Joint Answer to Third Amended Complaint with Crossclaims Against RR Street HEARING is continued from 9/17/2010 to THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 23, 2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/2/2010. (Herman, H)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Legacy Vulcan Corp. Third Party Claims Against the City of Modesto, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/30/2010. (Jessen, A)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Joint STIPULATION For Voluntary Dismissal; ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/19/2010. Multimatic, PKII, and Modesto Center Investors stipulate and respectfully request that this Court enter an order dismissing without prejudice Multimatics crossclaims against PKII and Modesto Center Investors filed March 13, 2009 (Doc. 139 ). Each party to pay its own costs.(Scrivner, E)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Joint Request For Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Of The Modesto Center Investors' Cross-Claims Against Defendant R.R. Street Co. Ince., ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/17/2010. (Scrivner, E)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER GRANTING 299 Defendant R.R. Street & Co., Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/9/2010. (Jessen, A)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 329 JOINT STIPULATION For Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Of The Modesto Center Investors' Cross Claims Against Legacy Vulcan Corp.; ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/5/2010. (Scrivner, E)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 318 JOINT STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of Team Enterprises, LLC's Third Amended Complaint Against the Dow Chemical Company and ORDER, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/21/2010. (Martin, S)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 JOINT STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of Team Enterprises, LLC's Third Amended Complaint against Vulcan Materials Company and Legacy Vulcan Corp;ORDER VACATING 307 08/03/2010 Hearing on Motion for Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/20/2010. (Martin, S)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER for Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Vulcan Materials Company and Legacy Vulcan Corp.'s Crossclaims Against Multimatic Corporation, Multimatic LLC, and the Kirrberg Corporation signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/21/2010. (Flores, E)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Hearing and Pleading Deadlines on R.R. Street's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff Team Enterprises, LLC, Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/21/2010. This Court: (1) VACATES the 7/14 /2010 motion hearing; (2) ORDERS opposing parties, no later than 7/21/2010, to file and serve papers to oppose Street's summary judgment motion; and (3) ORDERS Street no later than 8/4/2010, to file and serve reply papers. (Arellano, S.) (Arellano, S.)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER on Multimatic's 288 Motion for Judgment on Pleadings signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/09/2010. Multimatic Corporation, now known as Kirrberg Corporation and Multimatic LLC terminated from action. (Flores, E)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Denying Pan Pacific Retail Properties LLC's 252 Motion For Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/25/2009. (Esteves, C)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time on Motion for Stay of Discovery Pending Mediation 263 , signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/10/2009. (Herman, H)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 STIPULATION and ORDER between Multimatic Corporation, Multimatic LLC and the Kirrberg Corporation and Plaintiff regarding plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/19/2009. (Kusamura, W)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 STIPULATION and ORDER for Joinder of Pan Pacific Retail Properties, LLC, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/21/09. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Team Enterprises, LLC v. Western Investment Real Estate Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Team Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jan A. Greben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Investment Real Estate Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PK II Century Center LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Pacific Retail Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimco Realty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Real Estate Investors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Branagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette F. Branagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon C. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla J. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modesto Center Investors, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MC II, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?