April 14, 2016 |
Filing
236
ORDER Giving Full Effect to Stipulation to Dismiss Case, With Prejudice, Under Rule 41; ORDER for Clerk to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/13/16. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
|
April 7, 2016 |
Filing
234
ORDER for Defendants Holland, Gonzalez, Tyree, Gentry, Adame, and Jakabosky to Respond to Plaintiff's 233 Notice of Dismissal, Within Twenty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/7/16. (Marrujo, C)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
231
NOTICE and ORDER That Inmate Sergio Alejandro Gamez is No Longer Needed as Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/18/2016. (Jessen, A)
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing
228
ORDER DENYING Defendants' 227 Request to Reinstate Original Date and Judge for Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/4/16. (Marrujo, C)
|
February 2, 2016 |
Filing
225
ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Sergio Alejandro Gamez, CDC# C-47759, and His Legal Property, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/2/16. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
223
ORDER Regarding Defendants' Request To Withhold Documents On Basis Of Confidentiality Responsive To The Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Documents Responsive To First Set Of Document Requests (ECF No. 201 ), ORDER Requiring Production By All Defendants Of Non-Confidential Documents Within 5 Days Of Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/29/2016. (Fahrney, E)
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing
222
ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference From February 17, 2016 At 10:00 A.M. Before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean To February 18, 2016 At 10:00 A.M. Before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston (Doc. 216 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/27/2016.( Filing Deadline: 2/10/2016., Motions filed by 3/2/2016., Settlement Conference set for 2/18/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.) (Fahrney, E)
|
January 22, 2016 |
Filing
218
ORDER Directing Clerk To File Defendants' Motion And Supporting Declaration Under Seal, And To Lodge Documents For In Camera Review, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/22/2016. (Fahrney, E)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing
216
ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Sergio Alejandro Gamez, CDCR #C-47759, for a Settlement Conference on February 17, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/15/2016. (Flores, E)
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
214
ORDER denying 213 Request to Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/13/2016. ( Briefing Deadline: 1/22/2016). (Lundstrom, T)
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing
212
ORDER Appointing Limited Purpose Counsel For Purposes Of Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/10/2015. (Fahrney, E)
|
December 2, 2015 |
Filing
207
ORDER Denying 204 Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Deadline as Moot; ORDER Denying 205 Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Request for Judicial Notice of Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/1/15. (Gonzalez, R)
|
November 9, 2015 |
Filing
201
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents Responsive to First Set of Document Requests 189 ; ORDER REQUIRING Production By All Defendants of Document Requests 1-6 Within Thirty Days of This Order; or Submission for In Camera Review, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/9/15. (Hellings, J)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing
194
ORDER DENYING Defendants' 188 Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition; ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 188 Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motions Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/16/15. New Dispositive Motions Deadline 08/30/15. (Marrujo, C)
|
January 16, 2015 |
Filing
184
ORDER denying 172 Motion to Compel; denying 174 Motion for Protective Order and denying as moot 178 Motion for Sanctions. Thirty-Day deadline for Plaintiff to renew Motion to Compel as instructed by this order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/15/2015. (Filing Deadline: 2/18/2015). (Lundstrom, T)
|
January 13, 2015 |
Filing
183
ORDER DENYING 180 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and to Conduct Further Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/13/2015. (Jessen, A)
|
May 8, 2014 |
Filing
166
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses 158 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/7/14. (Verduzco, M)
|
February 14, 2014 |
Filing
153
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 152 Motion for Stay of Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/14/14. (Marrujo, C)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing
148
ORDER Adopting 143 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 140 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Defendants to Submit Documents for In Camera Review signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/9/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 30, 2013 |
Filing
144
ORDER granting 136 Motion to stay Discovery and vacating 135 Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/30/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
|
October 28, 2013 |
Filing
143
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Defendants to Submit Documents for in Camera Review, be Denied 140 , 141 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/13. Referred to Judge O'Neill; 20-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing
130
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/8/2013 denying 127 Motion to seal documents and directing Clerk to return documents to plaintiff. (Lundstrom, T)
|
December 3, 2012 |
Filing
126
ORDER DENYING Ex Parte Request to Seal Documents; ORDER for Clerk to Return Documents to Plaintiff and to Send Plaintiff Copy of Local Rule 141 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/30/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
|
October 15, 2012 |
Filing
119
ORDER Requiring Parties To Notify Court Whether A Settlement Conference Would Be Beneficial, Thirty-Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/15/2012. (Responses due by 11/19/2012)(Fahrney, E)
|
October 12, 2012 |
Filing
118
ORDER of Recusal and Reassignment of Case; New Case Number: 1:08-1113 LJO GSA (PC), signed by District Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/11/12. (electronicly served MJL)(Martin-Gill, S)
|
September 1, 2011 |
Filing
109
ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Cross-Motion Summary Judgment 73 & 76 ; DENYING Plaintiff's 72 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/29/2011. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of all Defendants and close the file. The Court also sua sponte DISMISSES Plaintiff's equal protection claim without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
107
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Allen and Wright's 102 Motion to Join, signed by District Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/25/2011. The Clerk of Court is directed to correct the docket to reflect the proper spelling of Defendant Allen's name as K.J. Allen. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 25, 2011 |
Filing
104
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 7/25/2011 continuing Pre-Trial Dates re 64 Order.(Lundstrom, T)
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing
100
ORDER granting 99 Motion for extension of time to file reply and continuing pretrial conference signed by District Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/14/2011. ( Filing Deadline: 8/1/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2011 at 11:00 AM before District Judge M. James Lorenz). (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 11, 2011 |
Filing
97
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 7/11/2011 denying 70 Motion for Default Judgment construed as Motion for Discovery Sanctions. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 30, 2011 |
Filing
89
ORDER Setting Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 6/29/11. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/8/2011 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis. (Verduzco, M)
|
June 21, 2011 |
Filing
88
ORDER (1) DENYING Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Order to File Confidential Documents Under Seal 84 ; and (2) DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 85 , signed by District Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/20/11: No later than June 27, 2011, Defendants shall make arrangements to retrieve the documents they sought to file under seal. (Hellings, J)
|
May 27, 2011 |
Filing
83
ORDER VACATING Hearing Date and RESETTING Hearing Date For July 18, 2011; AND Providing Notice Pursuant to Klingele/Rand to Pro Se Prisoner of Requirements For Opposiing Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/26/2011. (Marrujo, C)
|
March 28, 2011 |
Filing
65
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Meet And Confer (Doc. No. 62 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 3/28/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
March 24, 2011 |
Filing
64
FOURTH AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER REGULATING DISCOVERY AND OTHER PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 3/24/2011. ( All Motions other than motions to amend or join parties or motions in limine filed by 5/23/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2011 at 11:00 AM before District Judge M. James Lorenz). (Lundstrom, T)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing
59
THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Hearing Date signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 2/24/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2011 at 11:00 AM before District Judge M. James Lorenz. (Sant Agata, S)
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing
57
ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (Doc. No. 47 ), signed by District Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/4/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
October 13, 2010 |
Filing
52
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 10/13/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
49
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE,signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 09/15/2010. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/21/2010 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis) (Martin, S)
|
August 20, 2010 |
Filing
46
ORDER Denying 39 41 Motions to Compel; ORDER Denying 40 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; and ORDER Setting Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 08/18/2010. Response to Production of Documents due by 9/13/2010. (Flores, E)
|
August 10, 2010 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 8/10/2010 GRANTING Request for hearing date and AMENDED ORDER setting Motion Hearing. (Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2010 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis). (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 7/14/2010 setting briefing schedule on Plaintiff's 35 MOTION TO COMPEL and MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL. (Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2010 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis). (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing
36
ORDER Vacating June 30, 2010 Status Conference, Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 6/29/2010. Setting New Status Conference, ( Status Conference set for 7/13/2010 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis.)(Marrujo, C)
|
June 8, 2010 |
Filing
33
ORDER SETTING Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 6/8/2010. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/30/2010 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis. (Bradley, A)
|
June 3, 2010 |
Filing
32
ORDER DENYING 26 Motion for Appointment of Expert Witness signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 6/2/2010. (Bradley, A)
|
May 26, 2010 |
Filing
31
ORDER SETTING Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 5/25/2010. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/8/2010 at 10:00 AM. (Bradley, A)
|
May 20, 2010 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting 27 Motion request for discovery conference signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 5/18/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
|
April 15, 2010 |
Filing
25
ORDER GRANTING 24 Plaintiff's Motion for a Motion Hearing Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 4/14/2010. The Court determines that this matter is currently in discovery and a telephonic Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for May 25, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (See Doc. No. 22.) The Court sets this hearing date as the appropriate date for a hearing on Plaintiffs intended Motion. (Jessen, A)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
22
CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER REGULATING DISCOVERY AND OTHER PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 1/22/2010. ( Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/19/2010. Discovery due by 8/20/2010. Filing Deadline: 2/22/2010. Mo tions due by 9/24/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2010 at 11:00 AM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before District Judge M. James Lorenz. Settlement Conference set for 5/25/2010 at 10:00 AM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis.) (Lundstrom, T)
|
December 18, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER Re Notice of Case Management Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis on 12/18/2009. Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2010 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Peter Lewis. (Sondheim, M)
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing
19
ORDER DENYING 18 Motion for Default Judgment signed by District Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/20/2009. (Bradley, A)
|