Nicholson v. Dossey, Badge #897
Plaintiff: Amyra Nicholson, Christina Watkins, minor R. S. W. and Brittany Williams
Defendant: Dossey, Badge #897, City of Bakersfield, Officer, Bakersfield R. Slayton, Officer, Bakersfield K. Ursery, Officer, Bakersfield J. Cooley, Officer, Bakersfield J. Martin, Officer, Bakersfield Ronnie Dulan, Officer, Bakersfield J. Finney, Officer, Bakersfield Scott Tunnicliffe, Sgt., Bakersfield Matt Pflugh, County of Kern, Dep., County of Kern H. Appleton, Lynn Martinez and Anthony White
Case Number: 1:2008cv01168
Filed: August 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL of All Claims signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/3/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 3, 2013 Filing 125 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING #117 Motion for Approval of Compromise Settlement for Minor R.S.W. The parties' final dismissal documents shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/26/2013. (Timken, A)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE; New case number is: 1:08-cv-1168 SKO, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/22/13. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 22, 2013 Filing 122 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by City of Bakersfield. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Consent Form)(Marderosian, Michael)
August 21, 2013 Filing 121 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Amyra Nicholson, R. S. W., Christina Watkins, Brittany Williams. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 21, 2013 Filing 120 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: HEARING re MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE SETTLEMENT OF CLAIM OF MINOR #117 held on 8/21/2013. Good cause was found for the telephonic appearances by the guardian and minor. No appearance by defense. The Court confirmed with the parties the terms of the settlement - all parties in agreement. Plaintiffs consented to magistrate jurisdiction on the record and will speak with defense counsel re consent. Written order to follow. Plaintiffs' Counsel James Holland present. Defendants' Counsel Not Present present. Court Reporter/CD Number: K. Hooven. (Timken, A)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DISCHARGING #116 Order to Show Cause; ORDER CONTINUING hearing date for Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise #117 . The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise Settlement currently set for 8/8/2013, is CONTINUED to 8/21/2013, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/22/2013. (Timken, A)
July 20, 2013 Filing 118 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion for Approval of Compromise Settlement of Claim of minor Plaintiff R.S.W. re #117 MOTION Approval of Compromise Settlement of Claim of minor Plaintiff R.S.W.. (Holland, James)
July 20, 2013 Filing 117 MOTION Approval of Compromise Settlement of Claim of minor Plaintiff R.S.W. by R. S. W., Christina Watkins. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Holland, James)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE or FILE petition for approval of minor's compromise. Within seven (7) days of the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall: SHOW CAUSE as to why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the Court's June 6, 2013, order; OR FILE a Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise as required in the Court's June 6, 2013, order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/15/2013. (Timken, A)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The parties have filed a Notice of Settlement indicating that settlement has been reached #114 . As Plaintiff R.S.W. is a minor, Plaintiffs must file by no later than June 27, 2013, a Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise complying with the requirements of this Court's Local Rule 202. The parties' final dismissal documents shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of the Court's final approval of the Minor's Compromise. The Court VACATES all currently pending dates and matters, including the pretrial conference set for 6/26/2013, and the trial set for 8/20/2013. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on counsel or parties who contributed to violation of this order. See Local Rule 160 and Local Rule 272. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/6/2013. (Timken, A)
June 5, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by R. S. W., Christina Watkins, Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
May 23, 2013 Filing 113 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/23/2013; CASE NOT SETTLED. Plaintiffs' Counsel Jim Holland present. Defendants' Counsel Heather Cohen present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
May 16, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Dossey, Badge #897. (Marderosian, Michael)
May 14, 2013 Filing 111 NOTICE of Submission of Plaintiffs' Settlement Conference Statement by R. S. W., Christina Watkins, Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Discharging Guardian Ad Litem for Minor Plaintiff C.W.; ORDER to Identify Minor Plaintiff C.W. by her name, Christina Watkins; ORDER Discharging Minor Plaintiff R.S.W.'s Former Guardian Ad Litem and Appointing Christina Watkins as Guardian Ad Litem, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/13/13. (Verduzco, M)
May 8, 2013 Filing 109 PROPOSED ORDER re Discharge of GAL Nicholson, Appointment of new GAL for minor Plaintiff R.S.W. by C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
May 8, 2013 Filing 108 PROPOSED ORDER re Discharge of GAL for Plaintiff C.W. by C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/2/2013. (Timken, A)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiffs to file a motion for guardian ad litem for the minor plaintiffs. No later than May 8, 2013, Plaintiffs shall file a Motion to Appoint a Guardian ad Litem to represent the Minor Plaintiffs. If Minor Plaintiff C.W. no longer requires a Guardian ad Litem, Plaintiffs must explain why the appointment is no longer necessary and inform the Court whether Minor Plaintiff C.W. should then be identified by her full name or why it remains appropriate to continue to identify her by her initials. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/2/2013. (Timken, A)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** With the agreement of counsel, the Settlement Conference currently set for 5/31/2013, is ADVANCED to 5/23/2013, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall submit their confidential settlement statements to the Court by no later than 5/16/2013. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/15/2013. (Timken, A)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Amyra Nicholson, Only, of All Claims and Dismissal of Defendant Anthony White and ORDER Thereon, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2013. (Marrujo, C)
March 22, 2013 Filing 103 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Claims asserted by Plaintiff Amyra Nicholson, Defendant Matt Plugh, and Defendant Anthony White by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The parties have agreed to continue the Settlement Conference currently set for 4/25/2013. The Settlement Conference in CONTINUED to 5/31/2013, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall provide their confidential settlement statements to the Court by no later than May 23, 2013. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/12/2013. (Timken, A)
January 7, 2013 Filing 101 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Michael E Lehman terminated (Marderosian, Michael)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** (TIME CHANGE ONLY). The Settlement Conference set for 4/25/2013, in document #99 is RESET for 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/5/2012. (Timken, A)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED STIPULATION to Modify the Scheduling Order and ORDER Thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/4/2012. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling order be modified as follows: Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff 2/1/2013, Disclosure of Expert Witnesses 2/15/2013, Disclosure of Rebuttal Expert Witnesses 2/28/2013, Expert Discovery Cutoff 3/15/2013, Non-Dispositive Motions 3/15/2013, Hearing on Non-Dispositive Motions 4/17/2013, Settlement Conference continued to 4/25/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, Dispositive Pretrial Motions 3/22/2013, Hearing on Dispositive Motions 5/6/2013, This matter remains set for a Pre-Trial Conference on 6/26/2013, and Trial on 8/20/2013.)(Gaumnitz, R)
August 31, 2012 Filing 98 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for AMENDED STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER re #96 Stipulation and Proposed Order by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/27/12: The Parties' Stipulated Request to Modify the Scheduling Order is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and The parties may renew their request by proposing a schedule that comports with the specifications set forth in this order. (Hellings, J)
August 24, 2012 Filing 96 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed.R.Civ.P 16), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/30/2012. (Initial Disclosures: 6/15/2012, Non Expert Discovery: 10/1/2012, Expert Discovery: 11/16/2012, Non-Dispositive Motion ddl: 11/21/2012, Dispositive Motion ddl: 2/1/2013, Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, and Jury Trial (5-8 Day Est) set for 8/20/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Consolidating Cases, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/25/12. All Future Filings Shall be Made in Lead Case Number: 1:08-cv-01168-AWI-SKO. Member Case Number 1:11-cv-2041-AWI-SKO is CLOSED. Defendants Lynn Martinez and Anthony White added. (Verduzco, M)
May 24, 2012 Filing 93 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/24/2012, in chambers and off the record. The Court to issue order. Plaintiffs' Counsel James Holland, telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Michael Lehman, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
May 17, 2012 Filing 92 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/7/2012. (Kusamura, W)
May 3, 2012 Filing 90 JOINT STATUS REPORT by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Entry Only) In light of the parties' joint status report filed on 4/5/2012, the Status Conference currently set for 4/10/2012, in cases 1:11-cv-2041-AWI-SKO and 1:08-cv-1168-AWI-SKO is CONTINUED to 5/10/2012, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. By no later than 5/3/2012, the parties shall file a joint status report in both cases indicating how the parties plan to proceed in the actions. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/6/2012. (Gaumnitz, R)
April 5, 2012 Filing 88 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The parties have a status conference in this case and related case 1:11-cv-02041 AWI SKO, on 4/10/2012. The parties shall file their joint status report in both cases, by no later than 4/5/2012. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/4/2012. (Timken, A)
February 27, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 1:11CV02041 by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
February 22, 2012 Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Pursuant to the agreement of counsel, a Status Conference is set for 4/10/2012, at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto regarding this case and related case 1:11-cv-02041 to determine the status of these cases and how the parties intend to proceed in these related cases. (Timken, A)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER on Stipulation to Vacate Dates and Order Relating Cases, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/15/12. (Verduzco, M)
February 14, 2012 Filing 83 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for JOINT APPLICATION, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** The settlement conference currently set for Thursday, 2/9/2012, is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 2/21/2012, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The presence of counsel and parties with full settlement authority is REQUIRED as discussed during the telephonic status conference held Wednesday, 2/8/2012. Plaintiff Amyra Nicholson may appear telephonically, as necessary. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/8/2012. (Timken, A)
February 8, 2012 Filing 81 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE re settlement conference held on 2/8/2012, in chambers and off the record. Plaintiffs' Counsel James Holland, telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Michael Lehman, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request that the Pretrial Conference currently noticed for 2/23/2012 be rescheduled. The Pretrial Conference will now be held on 2/22/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii; order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/6/2012. (Rooney, M)
February 2, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
February 2, 2012 Filing 78 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
January 30, 2012 Filing 77 NOTICE of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Holland, James)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/9/2012. (Timken, A)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER on Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment #51 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/19/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING the settlement conference and pretrial conference. The Settlement Conference currently set for 12/20/2011, is CONTINUED to 2/9/2012, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The Pretrial Conference currently set for 1/19/2012, is CONTINUED to 2/23/2012, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/19/2011. (Timken, A)
December 19, 2011 Filing 73 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of the Mandatory Settlement Conference and Pretrial Conference and Order Thereon by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
December 12, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
December 9, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Holland, James)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** The parties in this matter have a settlement conference set for 12/20/2011. In preparing their confidential settlement statements, the parties are reminded they are to comply with the timelines and requirements as set forth in the Court's 10/12/2011, order #60 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/23/2011. (Timken, A)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING #61 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Complaint to Add Doe Defendant signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/15/2011. (Timken, A)
November 15, 2011 Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Court finds #61 the motion to amend the complaint suitable for decision without oral argument, pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the hearing set for November 16, 2011, is VACATED; the parties do not need to appear. The Court to issue order. (Timken, A)
November 9, 2011 Filing 67 REPLY by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams re #62 Declaration, #66 Opposition to Motion, 63 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, #61 MOTION to AMEND the #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to AMEND the #17 Amended Complaint. (Holland, James)
October 28, 2011 Filing 66 OPPOSITION by City of Bakersfield to #61 MOTION to AMEND the #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to AMEND the #17 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael E. Lehman in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A&B to Declaration of Michael E. Lehman)(Marderosian, Michael)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION and ORDER MODIFYING scheduling order. The Settlement Conference currently set for 11/1/2011 is CONTINUED to 12/20/2011, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The Pretrial Conference currently set for 11/18/2011, is CONTINUED to 1/19/2012, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. The Jury Trial currently set for 1/10/2012, is CONTINUED to 4/17/2012, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/24/2011. (Timken, A)
October 24, 2011 Filing 64 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Modifying Scheduling Order re #40 Scheduling Order,, by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
October 18, 2011 Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** As Judge Oberto hears civil motions on Wednesdays, #61 the Motion to Amend the Complaint currently set for 11/14/2011, is RESET for 11/16/2011, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Timken, A)
October 17, 2011 Filing 62 DECLARATION of James C. Holland, Errata on in SUPPORT OF #61 MOTION to AMEND the #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to AMEND the #17 Amended Complaint. (Holland, James)
October 12, 2011 Filing 61 MOTION to AMEND the #17 Amended Complaint by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Holland, Exhibit)(Holland, James)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/12/2011. (Timken, A)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Taking Defendants' Motion Under Submission and ORDER on Plaintiff's Request to Amend Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/7/11. (Hellings, J)
October 3, 2011 Filing 58 REPLY by City of Bakersfield re #57 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Statement Reply to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Michael Lehman in Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Declaration of Michael E. Lehman in Reply, #4 Notice of Lodging of Deposition Transcripts in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Marderosian, Michael)
September 27, 2011 Filing 57 OPPOSITION by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams to #51 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Holland, James)
September 27, 2011 Filing 56 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams in re #51 Motion for Summary Judgment,,,. (Holland, James)
September 27, 2011 Filing 55 OPPOSITION by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams to #51 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Holland, James)
September 26, 2011 Filing 54 OPPOSITION by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams to #51 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Holland, James)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Opposition and Reply and Continuing Hearing Date and Cut off Date Dispositive Motion Hearing signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/20/2011. ( Motion Hearing previously set for 10/3/2011 has been CONTINUED to 10/11/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii ) (Figueroa, O)
September 19, 2011 Filing 52 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuing Dates re #51 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
August 29, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by City of Bakersfield. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support, #3 Declaration of Michael E. Lehman in Support, #4 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of Michael E. Lehman in Support, #5 Exhibit E-K to Declaration of Michael E. Lehman in Support, #6 Declaration of Curtis J. Cope in Support, #7 Declaration of Richard Dossey in Support, #8 Declaration of Ronnie Dulan in Support, #9 Declaration of Joshua Finney in Support, #10 Declaration of Jeffrey Martin in Support, #11 Declaration of Matt Pflugh in Support, #12 Declaration of Ryan Slayton in Support, #13 Declaration of Scott Tunnicliffe in Support, #14 Declaration of Kyle Ursery in Support, #15 Notice of Lodging Deposition Transcripts in Support)(Marderosian, Michael)
August 29, 2011 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Deposition Transcripts. (Sant Agata, S)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER extending non-dispositive motion filing cutoff as to requested internal affairs materials. Any motion to compel regarding Defendant City of Bakersfield's Internal Affairs materials shall be filed on or before August 9, 2011; The opposition to such a motion to compel must be filed on or before August 15, 2011; An optional reply brief may be filed on or before August 17, 2011. The Motion to Compel shall be heard on shortened time on 8/24/2011, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/3/2011. (Timken, A)
August 2, 2011 Filing 49 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Non-Dispositive Motion Filing as to Requested Internal Affairs Materials by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
July 21, 2011 Filing 48 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE held on 7/21/2011 in chambers and off the record. The parties are in agreement that a settlement conference at this time will not be productive and request a continuance. The Settlement Conference currently set for 7/26/2011 is CONTINUED to 11/1/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties further informed the Court of an unresolved discovery issue relating to an Internal Affairs file. The parties are to file a stipulation and proposed order by no later than 7/22/2011, requesting a continuance of the non-dispositive motion filing date as to this issue only, to be heard on shortened time. Plaintiff's Counsel James Holland present. Defendant's Counsel Michael Lehman present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
July 19, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
July 14, 2011 Filing 46 NOTICE of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/6/2011. (Timken, A)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Defendants County of Kern and H. Appleton, with Prejudice signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/27/2011. H. Appleton and County of Kern terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
April 26, 2011 Filing 43 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL Stipulation Of Dismissal and Order Thereon by H. Appleton, County of Kern. (Thomson, Andrew)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART parties' stipulated request for amendment to the schedule. The following dates and deadlines are extended as follows: Non-Expert Discovery May 25, 2011; Expert Disclosure June 1, 2011; Supp. Expert Disclosures June 20, 2011; Expert Discovery July 11, 2011; the Settlement Conference currently set for 5/25/2011 is CONTINUED to 7/26/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. All other dates remain unchanged. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/20/2011. (Timken, A)
January 19, 2011 Filing 41 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Cutoff Dates re #40 Scheduling Order,, by Amyra Nicholson, C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams. (Holland, James)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER : Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures: 5/26/2010; Non Expert: 3/25/2011; Expert: 6/27/2011. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filing: 7/22/2011; Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filing: 8/29/2011. Settlement Conference set for 5/25/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial, (estimate 5-8 days), set for 1/10/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/27/2010. (Timken, A)
April 26, 2010 Filing 39 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/26/2010. The Court to issue order. Plaintiffs Counsel J. Holland, telephonically present. Defendants Counsel M. Lehman, personally present; A. Thomson, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
April 15, 2010 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** Due to the reassignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Oberto, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 4/19/2010 before Magistrate Judge Snyder has been RESET to 4/26/2010 at 09:30 PM in Courtroom 8 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Timken, A)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii: Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is REASSIGNED from Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder for all further proceedings. (Jessen, A)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISQUALIFYING MAGISTRATE JUDGE and REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston no longer assigned to case, Initial Scheduling Conference reset from 3/17/2010 to 4/19/2010 at 09:30 AM in Fresno, Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder - signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/16/2010. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 15, 2010 Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER (Text only) by Deputy Clerk: Plaintiff counsels request for telephonic appearance for the 3/17/2010 Scheduling Conference is granted. Please dial 661-326-6620/1 at 3:00 pm. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
March 9, 2010 Filing 33 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
February 11, 2010 Filing 32 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF KERN AND H. APPLETON TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by County of Kern, H. Appleton. Attorney Thomson, Andrew C. added.(Thomson, Andrew)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) TIME CHANGE ONLY Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2010 IS NOW AT 3:00 P.M. in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/9/2010. (Telephonic appearances are encourage please call the Court at 661-326-6620 to arrange)(Kusamura, W)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the courts unavailability the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/10/2010 has been moved to 3/17/2010 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/10/2010. (Kusamura, W)
February 1, 2010 Filing 29 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Virginia Anne Gennaro and Michael G. Marderosian for City of Bakersfield, Michael Edward Lehman and Michael G. Marderosian for City of Bakersfield. (Marderosian, Michael)
February 1, 2010 Filing 28 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by City of Bakersfield, Bakersfield Police Department, Bakersfield Police Officers Dossey, Slayton, Ursery, Cooley, Martin, Dulan, Finney, Tunicliffe and Sgt. Pflugh by City of Bakersfield. Attorney Marderosian, Michael G. added.(Marderosian, Michael)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the current status of the case, the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/9/2010 has been moved to 3/10/2010 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at Truxtun (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/29/2010. (Kusamura, W)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii: Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is REASSIGNED to Judge Thurston for all further proceedings. (Hutcheson, C)
November 13, 2009 Filing 25 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *J. Finney, Scott Tunnicliffe, Matt Pflugh, County of Kern, H. Appleton, Dossey, Badge #897, City of Bakersfield, R. Slayton, K. Ursery, J. Cooley, J. Martin, Ronnie Dulan* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *James C. Holland* *Law Office of James C. Holland* *134 N Conyer Avenue* *Fresno, CA 93291*. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPOINTING Amyra Nicholson Guardian ad Litem for Minor Plaintiff R.S.W. re #21 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/26/2009. (Jessen, A)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPOINTING Amyra Nicholson Guardian ad Litem for Minor Plaintiff C.W. re #19 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 10/26/2009. (Jessen, A)
October 25, 2009 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER granting re #21 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM for R.S.W., minor, by Amyra Nicholson. (Holland, James)
October 25, 2009 Filing 21 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM for R.S.W., minor, by Amyra Nicholson. (Holland, James)
October 25, 2009 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER granting re #19 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM for plaintiff C.W., minor by Amyra Nicholson. (Holland, James)
October 25, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM for plaintiff C.W., minor by Amyra Nicholson. (Holland, James)
October 25, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Errata on Third Amended Complaint by all plaintiffs re #17 Amended Complaint. (Holland, James)
October 19, 2009 Filing 17 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants by C. W., R. S. W., Brittany Williams, Amyra Nicholson. Attorney Holland, James C added.(Holland, James)
October 14, 2009 Filing 16 MINUTES (Text Only Entry) for proceedings held before Judge Sandra M. Snyder: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/14/09. Plaintiffs' counsel James Holland substituted in on 6/5/09 #12 , so no defendants served yet. Court deems motion/leave to file second (sic) amended complaint #15 to be a status conference statement, allowing plaintiff to file third amended complaint by 10/19/09. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is SET 2/9/10 @ 9:30am before new Bakersfield magistrate judge, Jennifer L. Thurston (JLT), not Judge Snyder. MOTION TO AMEND #15 TERMINATED as MOOT. Plaintiff's Counsel James Holland telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel: None to date. Court Reporter/CD Number: N/A - in chambers; off record. (Robles, F.)
October 13, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION to AMEND the #6 Amended Complaint by Amyra Nicholson. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. (Holland, James)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (AMENDED) ORDER DENYING #7 Motion for Limited Pre-Trial Discovery, ORDER SETTING Further Status Conference, Signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/9/2009. (Arellano, S.)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #7 Motion for Limited Pre-Trial Discovery, ORDER SETTING Further Status Conference, Signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/8/2009. Status Conference set for 10/14/2009 at 11:00 a.m. in Ctrm. 7 before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. (Arellano, S.)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY. Added attorney James C Holland for Amyra Nicholson signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/4/09. (Gil-Garcia, A)
May 12, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 MINUTES served on Amyra Nicholson. (Robles, F.)
May 11, 2009 Filing 11 MINUTES (Text Only Entry) for proceedings held before Judge Sandra M. Snyder: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/11/09 per order of the Court #10 , in light of Judge Goldner's resignation #8 , and due to the inability to contact plaintiff by telephone. Pro se plaintiff personally appeared, with husband Marcus, as required. Court gave plaintiff list of attorneys, and granted plaintiff until 6/15/09 to find counsel, after which Court will rule on pending motion for limited pre-trial discovery #7 , and order complaint be served on sole identified Bakersfield Police Officer Dossey. Case Management Deadline: 6/15/09. (Robles, F.)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Personally Appear in Fresno Court for Status Conference. STATUS CONFERENCE set for 5/11/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Judge Sandra M. Snyder. ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Serve Pro Se Plaintiff at Current Address of Record. signed by Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/1/2009. (Herman, H)
May 4, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Requiring Plaintiff to Personally Appear in Fresno Court for Status Conference, served on Amyra Nicholson, 3204 Cornell Street, Bakersfield, California 93306. (Herman, H)
April 20, 2009 Filing 9 RESERVICE OF DOCUMENT #8 due to incorrect address. Address corrected and updated this date. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
April 17, 2009 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, (Return to Sender - No Such Street - Unable to Forward): #8 Notice TAG Reassignment sent to Amyra Nicholson. (Notice of Change of Address due by 6/24/2009) (Martin, S)
April 3, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ASSIGNMENT: Due to the resignation of Magistrate Judge Theresa A. Goldner, this action is temporarily assigned to Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. (Hutcheson, C)
April 3, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Notice TAG Reassignment served on Amyra Nicholson. (Hutcheson, C)
February 3, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION and Notice of Motion for Limited Pre-Trial Discovery, by Amyra Nicholson. (Sondheim, M)
January 29, 2009 Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dossey, Badge #897 by Amyra Nicholson.(Flores, E)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #4 , and ORDER (filing due by 2/3/2009) signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa A. Goldner on 1/14/2009. (Leon-Guerrero, A)
January 14, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Screening Order Dismissing Claims with Leave to Amend, and Order Directing Plaintiff to File (Leon-Guerrero, A)
September 29, 2008 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dossey, Badge #897 by Amyra Miles.(Gil-Garcia, A)
August 25, 2008 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, and Order Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend. The case number indicated on page one of the order should read: 1:08-cv-01168-AWI-TAG instead of 1:08-cv-01168-OWW-TAG. (Leon Guerrero, A)
August 25, 2008 SERVICE BY MAIL: Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction, served on Amyra Miles (Leon Guerrero, A)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, and ORDER dismissing #1 Complaint with LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa A. Goldner on 8/22/2008. (Leon Guerrero, A)
August 22, 2008 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, and Order Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend served on Amyra Miles (Leon Guerrero, A)
August 18, 2008 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Amyra Miles. (Gil-Garcia, A)
August 18, 2008 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Gil-Garcia, A)
August 11, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dossey, Badge #897 by Amyra Miles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gil-Garcia, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholson v. Dossey, Badge #897
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amyra Nicholson
Represented By: James C Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Watkins
Represented By: James C Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: minor R. S. W.
Represented By: James C Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Williams
Represented By: James C Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dossey, Badge #897
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bakersfield
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer, Bakersfield R. Slayton
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer, Bakersfield K. Ursery
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer, Bakersfield J. Cooley
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer, Bakersfield J. Martin
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer, Bakersfield Ronnie Dulan
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer, Bakersfield J. Finney
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer, Bakersfield Scott Tunnicliffe
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt., Bakersfield Matt Pflugh
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep., County of Kern H. Appleton
Represented By: Andrew C. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Martinez
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony White
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Michael E. Lehman
Represented By: Michael G. Marderosian
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?