April 24, 2012 |
Filing
204
ORDER On Satisfaction Of Judgment, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 4/24/2012. (Fahrney, E)
|
April 12, 2012 |
Filing
201
ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 4/11/12: Status Conference set for April 24, 2012 at 11:00 a.m.; The Attorney General's Office shall coordinate the conference call with Kern Valley State Prison. (Hellings, J)
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
194
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO APPEAL to March 11, 2012, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 1/31/2012. (Jessen, A)
|
January 11, 2012 |
Filing
192
JUDGMENT dated *1/11/2012* in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $3,000 pursuant to the Jury Verdict rendered on 1/11/2012. CASE CLOSED. (Krueger, M)
|
December 16, 2011 |
Filing
178
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ORDER, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 12/16/11. (Gonzalez, R)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
173
ORDER Setting Trial and Related Dates, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 10/24/2011. (Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/28/2011 at 10:30 AM; Trial set for 1/9/2012 at 09:30 AM.) (Marrujo, C)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing
172
ORDER Re: Procedure For Obtaining Trial Testimony Of Marshall Lewis, M.D.; ORDER Denying Motion For Reconsideration (Doc. 171 ), signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 10/13/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
August 31, 2011 |
Filing
166
ORDER and WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Plaintiff, Gerald Lee Miller, Jr. CDCR # C-92075, Via Video Conference Before Magistrate Judge Bianchini on September 8, 2011 a 11:00 a.m., signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 8/30/2011. (Marrujo, C)
|
August 30, 2011 |
Filing
165
ORDER Re: Pretrial Matters, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 8/29/2011. (The trial date is VACATED. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Barry T. Moskowitz.) (Marrujo, C)
|
August 23, 2011 |
Filing
162
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Intervene (Doc. No. 152 ), signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 8/23/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
August 22, 2011 |
Filing
161
ORDER Denying Motion For Preliminary Injunction And Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 156 ), signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 8/22/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
August 12, 2011 |
Filing
158
ORDER Requesting Confidential Settlement Statements Re: Case Selection for Prisoner Settlement Program, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 8/11/2011. (Marrujo, C)
|
July 22, 2011 |
Filing
150
ORDER signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 7/22/2011 OVERRULING 147 Objection filed by Gerald L. Miller, Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing
149
ORDER directing perferred Library user status for Plaintiff and setting further telephonic status conference signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 7/14/2011. ( Status Conference set for 7/28/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge Barry T. Moskowitz). (Lundstrom, T)
|
July 13, 2011 |
Filing
148
ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference for 7/14/2011 at 02:30 PM signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 7/13/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 29, 2011 |
Filing
146
ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 6/29/11. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/12/2011 at 04:15 PM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. (Verduzco, M)
|
June 27, 2011 |
Filing
145
ORDER RE: Personal Mail and Legal Books 140 , signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. on 6/27/11: The Court ORDERS the Litigation Coordinator at Calipatria State Prison: (1) to assist Plaintiff pro se in locating all legal mail and (2 ) to report to the Court on the location of Plaintiff's legal mail and Plaintiff's mail status during the June 29, 2011 teleconference; Defense counsel is ORDERED to coordinate Plaintiff's appearance by phone and then contact the Court on the day and at the time listed at (619) 557-6624. (Hellings, J)
|
June 22, 2011 |
Filing
143
ORDER: (1) DENYING Request for Materials and Library Time Without Prejudice; and (2) Setting Telephonic Status Conference 137 , signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 6/21/11: Telephonic Status Conference set for June 29, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. Defense counsel is ORDERED to coordinate Plaintiff's appearance by phone and then contact the Court on the day and at the time listed at (619) 557-6624. (Hellings, J)
|
June 15, 2011 |
Filing
142
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Motion To Suppress, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 6/15/2011. (Fahrney, E)
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
138
ORDER DENYING 134 Request for Court Appointment of Expert Witness signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 5/9/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
|
April 4, 2011 |
Filing
129
ORDER re Objections to Magistrate Judge's Denial of Motion to Compel Discovery 106 , 120 , signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 4/4/11. (Gonzalez, R)
|
March 22, 2011 |
Filing
127
ORDER DENYING 108 Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory Relief signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 3/22/2011. (Jessen, A)
|
March 21, 2011 |
Filing
126
ORDER setting telephonic status conference signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 3/21/2011. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/19/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Barry T. Moskowitz).(Lundstrom, T)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing
123
ORDER signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 3/16/2011 granting 101 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by J. Akanno. Defendant J. Akanno dismissed from action.(Lundstrom, T)
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
122
ORDER signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 3/14/2011 denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment by O. Rufino; granting 101 Motion for Summary Judgment by G Moonga and ordering caption correction. (Lundstrom, T)
|
January 7, 2011 |
Filing
121
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/6/2011 denying 117 MOTION for Ten Hours of Pre-Paid Phone Calls. (Lundstrom, T)
|
January 5, 2011 |
Filing
119
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. on 1/5/2011 regarding 115 Motion request for Status Report. (Lundstrom, T)
|
December 27, 2010 |
Filing
116
ORDER continuing Pretrial Conference and Related Dates signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 12/23/2010. (Lundstrom, T)
|
November 1, 2010 |
Filing
107
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Subpoena 97 , signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/29/2010. (Verduzco, M)
|
October 28, 2010 |
Filing
105
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 101 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT and Providing Plaintiff Klingele/Rand Notice, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 10/27/2010. Plaintiff may serve and file an Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment no later than 11/29/2010. Defendants may serve a Reply to the Opposition no later than 12/13/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing
103
ORDER DENYING 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Court Appointed Investigator signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/22/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing
100
ORDER DENYING 98 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/18/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
August 26, 2010 |
Filing
94
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 08/26/2010. Status Conference set for 9/13/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Flores, E)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing
83
ORDER signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 7/21/2010 setting Status Conference re 79 Request and denying 80 Motion to Stay. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/5/2010 at 03:30 PM in Visiting Judge (TBD) before Judge Barry T. Moskowitz). (Lundstrom, T)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing
75
ORDER DENYING 71 Motion to Stay; ORDERED that Miller's Opposition deadline is extended from July 19, 2010 to August 16, 2010; Defendants' Reply deadline is extended from August 2, 2010 to September 3, 2010; No further extensions of time associated with Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary good cause, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 06/21/2010. (Martin, S)
|
June 14, 2010 |
Filing
73
ORDER Denying: (1) Plaintiff's Motion For Additional Costs And Fees; And (2)Plaintiff's Motion For Reconsideration (Doc. Nos. 69 and 70 ), signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 6/14/2010. (Scrivner, E)
|
June 7, 2010 |
Filing
67
ORDER SETTING Briefing Schedule re 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; and ORDER PROVIDING Plaintiff Klingele/Rand Notice signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 6/7/2010. Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment due by 7/19/2010; Reply to Opposition due by 8/2/2010.(Bradley, A)
|
May 21, 2010 |
Filing
63
ORDER Granting In Part Defendants' Motion For Reconsideration (Doc. No. 60 ), signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 5/20/2010. Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED IN PART. Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiff: (1) to retain a court reporter or other person sanctioned to take any depositions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 28(a); and (2) to conduct any deposition in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 31. Defendants' objection to Plaintiff's subpoena request is DENIED. (Scrivner, E)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing
54
ORDER GRANTING 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Depositions of G. Moonga and O. Rufion; and ORDER GRANTING 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Records Subpoena signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. on 5/10/2010. Th e Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a subpoena duces tecum form, USM-285 form, and a copy of this order. Upon receipt of these forms, the U.S. Marshal is directed to promptly effect service of the Plaintiff's subpoena duces tecum. (Jessen, A)
|
April 13, 2010 |
Filing
52
ORDER CONTINUING Telephonic Mandatory Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 4/13/2010. Telephonic Mandatory Settlement Conference RESET for 4/28/2010 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. (Jessen, A)
|
April 9, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Withdraw Motion To Change Pleadings In Second Amended Complaint (Doc. Nos. 42 , 50 ), signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 4/8/2010. (Scrivner, E)
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing
48
ORDER CONTINUING Telephonic Mandatory Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 3/26/2010. Telephonic Mandatory Settlement Conference RESET for 4/19/2010 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. (Jessen, A)
|
February 24, 2010 |
Filing
44
ORDER RE: Response to 42 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 2/24/2010. Defendants may file a response to Plaintiff's motion on or before 3/11/2010. (Jessen, A)
|
December 2, 2009 |
Filing
33
ORDER Re: Various Motions 30 31 32 signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 12/1/2009. (Figueroa, O)
|
October 20, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER Re: Request For Subpoenas (Doc. 28 ), signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 10/20/2009. (Scrivner, E)
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing
27
ORDER Granting 25 MOTION for Schedule to Conduct Discovery; and Setting Forth Scheduling Deadlines signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 09/04/2009. Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 4/5/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge Barry T. Moskowitz; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2010 at 03:30 PM before Judge Barry T. Moskowitz. (Flores, E)
|
April 8, 2009 |
Filing
23
ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration 22 , signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 4/8/09: Plaintiff may not file any further Motions for Reconsider the Court's February 11, 2009 Order. If he does, the Court may impose sanctions. (Hellings, J)
|
February 11, 2009 |
Filing
19
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause and for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunctive Relief Without Prejudice 12 , signed by Judge Barry T. Moskowitz on 2/11/09. (Hellings, J)
|