Branch v. Grannis, et al.,
Plaintiff: Louis Branch
Defendant: N. Grannis, K. Mendoza-Powers, A. Mancinas and D. Umphenour
Case Number: 1:2008cv01655
Filed: July 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: William M. Wunderlich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Reference and ORDER REGARDING Prior Screening Orders signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/24/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 330 Motion for In Forma Pauperis Request for Trial Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/31/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER to Sustain in part and Overruled in part 329 Motion to Bear their own costs; Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to Issue Taxation of Costs in the amount of $713.00, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/29/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER Requiring Defendants to Supplement Bill of Costs Within Five (5) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 JUDGMENT in Favor of Defendants and Against Plaintiff. (Flores, E)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 307 Request for Injunctive Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/27/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 305 Motion to Exclude Defendants' Out of Court Statements which is Construed as a Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/25/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Re Motions in Limine 272 , 277 , 284 , 288 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/18/17. (Hellings, J)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Granting Defendants' 287 Ex Parte Application to Amend Exhibit List and Amending Pretrial Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/12/2017. (Flores, E)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Louis Branch, CDCR# B-17786 for Trial on January 30, 2017 at 8:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/06/2017. (Flores, E)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 258 Motion for Change of Venue, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/29/16. (Verduzco, M)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER Addressing Plaintiff's Objections to the Pretrial Order and Amending Pretrial Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/28/2016. (Flores, E)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/07/2016. Motions in Limine Hearing set for 1/17/2017 at 2:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set for 1/30/2017 at 8:30 a.m., Courtroom 9.(Flores, E)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Change of Venue signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/06/2016. (Flores, E)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER DENYING 256 and 257 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/1/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER OVERRULING Objection to Order DENYING Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witness and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Forward 251 In Forma Pauperis Application to Ninth Circuit 250 , 252 , 253 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER denying Motion for the attendance of incarcerated witnesses re 243 , 246 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/28/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER Continuing Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/04/2016. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 12/5/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Flores, E)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER Regarding Notice Re Confidential Settlement Conference Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/03/2016. (Flores, E)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER denying as moot Motions for telephonic / video settlement conference re 223 , 231 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/29/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER VACATING 229 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Louis Branch, CDCR# B-17786, on 9/30/2016 at 10:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/30/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/17/2016. (Flores, E)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER Directing Clerk to Terminate 219 Motion and Forward August 3 2016, Motion t the U.S. Court of Appeals signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/09/2016. (Flores, E)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Denying 216 Plaintiff's Motion for Disqualification of the Undersigned, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/21/16. (Gonzalez, R)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/2/16: Telephonic Pretrial Confirmation Hearing set for 12/2/2016 at 9:30 a.m.; Telephonic Motions in Limine Hearing set for 1/17/2017 at 2:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set for 1/30/2017 at 8:30 a.m., Courtroom 9 (SAB); 2-3 Days. (Hellings, J)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/26/2016. Telephonic Scheduling Hearing set for 6/1/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 201 Motion for Reconsideration of the April 1, 2016, ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 203 Motion for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/05/2016. (Flores, E)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to withdraw consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge re 198 , 199 and denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 169 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/1/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER DENYING 182 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER DENYING 183 188 Motions in Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/21/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 172 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DENYING 138 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration re 177 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/4/2015. (Jessen, A)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Re Motion To Strike (ECF No. 156 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/13/2015. (Fahrney, E)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION re 138] MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/12/15. Thirty-Day Deadline. Referred to Judge Ishii. (Gonzalez, R)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Denying 169 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 06/09/2015. (Flores, E)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 154 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/16/2015. (Flores, E)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration 153 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/3/15. (Verduzco, M)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Attach Appendix To Amended Opposition (Doc. 158 ), ORDER For Plaintiff To Either: (1) Notify The Court That He Rests On His Amended Opposition And Motion To Strike Filed On January 29, 2015, Or, (2) Withdraw His Amended Opposition And Motion To Strike, And File A Second Amended Opposition As Instructed By This Order, Thirty Day Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/19/2015. (Fahrney, E)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 141 Motion to Exclude Evidence; ORDER Reopening Discovery, for Limited Purpose Described in this Order; ORDER Holding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance; ORDER for Clerk to Send copy of Amended Complaint Discovery Order of October 21, 2013 to Plaintiff and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/06/2014. (Flores, E)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 137 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Order issued on August 7, 2014, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/30/2014. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 136 Request for Reconsideration as Untimely signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/11/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's 122 Motion to Compel; ORDER for Defendant Umphenour to make Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Set Five, Nos. 37, 40, 41, and 42, Pursuant to this Order, within Thirty Days; ORDER Denying 123 Motion to Extend Discovery; ORDER Denying 125 Motion for In Camara Review signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/06/2014. (Flores, E)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying 133 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/24/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 124 Motion for Court-Ordered Mental Examination signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/29/2014. (Flores, E)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING 118 Plaintiff's Motion and ORDER EXTENDING Application of Discovery/Scheduling Order of October 21, 2013, to Defendants Szalai and Alvarez signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/21/2014. 45-day deadline for plaintiff to respond to defendant Szalai and Alvarez' Discovery Requests. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration 108 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/24/13. (Hellings, J)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 92 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 97 Motion to Compel as Untimely; ORDER Granting Defendant's 100 Motion to Vacate Dispositive Motions Deadline; ORDER Vacating Dispositive Motion Deadline of September 9, 2013, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/15/2013. (Flores, E)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend 85 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to File Third Amended Complaint Lodged on April 22, 2013 86 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/9/13. (Hellings, J)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 90 Motion; ORDER STRIKING Defendant's 87 Answer and 88 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER ADVISING Parties Not to Pursue Discovery on Behalf of Defendants Alvarez and Szalai at This Stage of the Proceedings, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/7/2013. (Marrujo, C)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 76 Motion for Status Conference; ORDER RESPONDING to Plaintiff's Request Regarding Unserved Doe Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/4/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 69 ), ORDER Denying Defendant Umphenour's Motion To Dismiss (Doc. 49 ), signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/20/2012. (Fahrney, E)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendant Umphenour's 49 Motion to Dismiss; Objections, if any, Due in Twenty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/23/2012. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 9/17/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/20/2012. (Flores, E)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 50 , 51 , 52 Request for Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Umphenour signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/22/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Proof of Service as Premature 38 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/22/11. (Hellings, J)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/11/11: This action shall proceed on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, against Defendants Umphenour and Does 1 and 2; Defendants Grannis, Mendoza-Powers and Mancinas are DISMISSED, with prejudice, based upon Plaintiff's failure to state a cognizable claim against them. (Hellings, J)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Denying Motion For Appointment Of Counsel 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/11/2010. (Scrivner, E)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 , 15 Motions to vacate and reopening this action signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/26/2010. Case reopened.(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch v. Grannis, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Mendoza-Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Mancinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Umphenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?