Ernst v. Cate
Plaintiff: Ted Keener Ernst
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Case Number: 1:2008cv01940
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/19/2009. In Parallel Orders All Federal Claims Have Been Dismissed and Supplemental Jurisdiction Declined.(Bradley, A)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That The District Court Grant in Part and Deny in Part Defendant Broncato's 40 Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Strike signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/13/2009. Matter referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 12/16/2009. (Esteves, C)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's motions to dismiss 5 11 13 be DENIED as moot signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/14/2009. Motion referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger, Objections to F&R due by 4/27/2009. (Esteves, C)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER VACATING Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Set for March 27, 2009 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom 10, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/19/09: Opposition Deadline 3/13/2009, Reply Deadline 3/20/09.(Hellings, J)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on STIPULATION to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/5/2009. (Response due by 1/30/2009) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernst v. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Keener Ernst
Represented By: Olaf Arthur Landsgaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Represented By: William P. Brodbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?